Teressa Anne Kelley v. Commissioner of Social Security
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Patricia Donahue |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01802 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2023 |
Terminated: | Sep 27, 2023 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, January 08, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
order
Attorney Fees
Wed 01/10 1:25 PM
FOR COURT USE ONLY: STATISTICAL CORRECTION Granting19 MOTION for Attorney Fees re:22 Order Granting Motion (es) |
|
22 | 22
order
Awarding EAJA Fees
Wed 01/10 11:27 AM
ORDER AWARDING EAJA FEES by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Fees Re: Stipulation for Award of EAJA Fees,21 IT IS ORDERED that EAJA fees are awarded in the amount of eleven thousand seven hundred fifty dollars [$11,750.00], plus $405.00 costs and expenses, subject to the terms of the Stipulation. IT IS ORDERED that EAJA fees are awarded to Plaintiff in the amount of eleven thousand seven hundred fifty dollars [$11,750.00], plus $405.00 costs and expenses, subject to any federal debt owed by the Plaintiff. [See document for additional information.] (es) |
|
Friday, January 05, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
stip
Award of EAJA Fees
Fri 01/05 1:41 PM
STIPULATION FOR AWARD of EAJA Fees in the amount of $11,750.00. Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act 19 filed by Plaintiff Teressa Anne Kelley.(Agharkar, Nikhil) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, January 02, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Tue 01/02 3:03 PM
MINUTES [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER RE SUBMISSION OF MEMORANDUM AND DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES [Dkt. No.19 ]] AND DEADLINE FOR RESPONSE by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue: Plaintiff shall file the memorandum of points and authorities and declarations in support of the motion by January 5, 2024. However, if the government has a specific objection or other information to present to the Court in this case, it may submit its position by January 26, 2024. After that, the matter will be under submission. [See document for further information.] (es) |
|
Thursday, December 28, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Attorney Fees
Thu 12/28 4:47 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Plaintiff Teressa Anne Kelley. (Agharkar, Nikhil) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Tue 12/19 4:08 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael K Marriott counsel for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Michael Marriott is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by DEFENDANT Commissioner of Social Security. (Marriott, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, September 27, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
order
Remand Case to US Agency
Thu 09/28 5:14 PM
ORDER OF REMAND by Judge Andre Birotte Jr, Based upon the parties Stipulation to Voluntary Remand Pursuant to Sentence 4 of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) and to Entry of Judgment ("Stipulation of Remand"), IT IS ORDERED that the above-captioned action is remanded to the Commissioner of Social Security for further proceedings consistent with the terms of the Stipulation of Remand16 . (MD JS-6. Case Terminated). (es) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
stip
Remand Case to US Agency
Mon 09/25 3:51 PM
STIPULATION to Remand Case to US Agency Social Security Administration filed by defendant Commissioner of Social Security.(Sachelari, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, August 04, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 08/04 3:47 PM
ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue, Based upon the parties' Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule14 , IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall have until September 25, 2023, to file her Brief. Plaintiff's optional Reply Brief will be due 14 days after Defendant files her Brief, or October 9, 2023. (es) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Wed 08/02 12:55 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Brief filed by defendant Commissioner of Social Security.(Attorney Paul H. Sachelari added to party Commissioner of Social Security(pty:dft))(Sachelari, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, July 12, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Brief (non-motion non-appeal)
Wed 07/12 4:13 PM
BRIEF filed by Plaintiff Teressa Anne Kelley. (Agharkar, Nikhil) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Tue 07/11 5:39 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO FILE OVERSIZE BRIEF [Dkt. No. 11] by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue: re: Stipulation to Exceed Page Limitation11 . Plaintiffs request is granted. Plaintiffs Brief may not exceed 35 pages or 9,000 words. This Order applies only to Plaintiffs Brief, and not to Plaintiffs optional Reply Brief. The Court encourages both parties to set forth their positions succinctly. [SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION.] (es) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
stip
Exceed Page Limitation
Mon 07/10 2:42 PM
STIPULATION to Exceed Page Limitation as to Plaintiff's Brief filed by plaintiff Teressa Anne Kelley.(Agharkar, Nikhil) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, May 19, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 05/19 10:50 AM
ORDER TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue, re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days)8 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant shall have a first extension of 30 days to serve the Certified Administrative Record, until June 12, 2023. Plaintiff's merits brief shall be due July 12, 2023, Defendant's response by August 11, 2023, and Plaintiff's optional reply by August 25, 2023. (es) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 05/15 2:36 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 AS LIMITED TO THE ELECTRONIC FILING AND SERVICE OF THE CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD, PURSUANT TO SUPPLEMENTAL FEDERAL RULES FOR SOCIAL SECURITY REVIEW ACTIONS UNDER 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), RULE 4(b) (cu) filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security.(Marriott, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Certification Page, | ||
Att: 2 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 3 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, | ||
Att: 4 Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 5 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices Part 1, | ||
Att: 6 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices Part 2, | ||
Att: 7 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 8 Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 9 Medical Records Part 1, | ||
Att: 10 Medical Records Part 2, | ||
Att: 11 Medical Records Part 3, | ||
Att: 12 Medical Records Part 4, | ||
Att: 13 Medical Records Part 5, | ||
Att: 14 Medical Records Part 6, | ||
Att: 15 Medical Records Part 7, | ||
Att: 16 Medical Records Part 8, | ||
Att: 17 Medical Records Part 9, | ||
Att: 18 Medical Records Part 10, | ||
Att: 19 Medical Records Part 11, | ||
Att: 20 Medical Records Part 12, | ||
Att: 21 Medical Records Part 13, | ||
Att: 22 Medical Records Part 14, | ||
Att: 23 Medical Records Part 15, | ||
Att: 24 Medical Records Part 16, | ||
Att: 25 Medical Records Part 17, | ||
Att: 26 Medical Records Part 18, | ||
Att: 27 Medical Records Part 19, | ||
Att: 28 Medical Records Part 20 | ||
Thursday, May 11, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Thu 05/11 11:02 AM
First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to June 12, 2023 filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security.(Marriott, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 17, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Statement
Mon 04/17 12:13 PM
STATEMENT Briefing Calendar filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Marriott, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only)
Tue 03/21 12:20 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Attorney Michael K Marriott added to party Commissioner of Social Security(pty:dft))(Marriott, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 03/15 9:22 AM
ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS FILED ON OR AFTER DECEMBER 1, 2022 by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (See document for further details). (et) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form
Mon 03/13 4:34 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (jtil) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/10 10:31 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Teressa Anne Kelley, (Agharkar, Nikhil) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/10 10:28 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Teressa Anne Kelley. (Agharkar, Nikhil) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/10 10:27 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34933147 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Teressa Anne Kelley. (Attorney Nikhil Shreeram Agharkar added to party Teressa Anne Kelley(pty:pla))(Agharkar, Nikhil) |