Barak Federman v. Cerebral, Inc.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Fernando M Olguin |
Referred: | Maria A Audero |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01803 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 06, 2023 2:27 AM PDT |
Consol Plaintiff
Attiya Awadallah
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Jane Doe
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
John Doe
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
David Gould
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Lyndell Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Dawn Pittinger
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Rita Sanders
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Cherri Thomas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cerebral, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barak Federman
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
68 | 68
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Fri 04/12 6:46 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Motion to Dismiss or Compel Arbitration59 is taken off the 4/18/2024 calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on 4/18/2024. An order with the court's ruling will issue.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
67 | 67
5
pgs
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 04/09 11:52 AM
ORDER RE: MOTIONS FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr) |
|
66 | 66
6
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings
Tue 04/09 11:39 AM
SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: CLASS ACTIONS & REPRESENTATIVE ACTIONS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Scheduling Conference is deemed unnecessary and hereby vacated. *See order for case deadlines and requirements imposed.* (vdr) |