Paul Sapan v. Liberty Bankers Life Insurance Company
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Wesley L Hsu |
Referred: | Autumn D Spaeth |
Case #: | 8:23-cv-00435 |
Nature of Suit | 485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act |
Cause | 47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2023 |
Terminated: | Oct 06, 2023 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 15, 2024 5:11 PM PDT |
Defendant
Liberty Bankers Life Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Sapan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, October 06, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
stip
Dismiss Case
Fri 10/06 11:31 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Settlement filed by Defendant Liberty Bankers Life Insurance Company.(Forman, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, September 27, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
13
pgs
order
Order
Wed 09/27 1:11 PM
STANDING ORDER FOR MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom) |
|
25 | 25
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 09/27 12:50 PM
ORDER ADOPTING PARTIES ADDITIONAL PROPOSED DATES FOR SCHEDULING ORDER21 by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. In addition to the schedule set by the Court in the Worksheet, the Court hereby adopts the parties'proposed deadlines for the Class Certification Motion: Class Certification Motion Due: January 5, 2024; Opposition Brief Due: February 2, 2024; Reply Brief Due: February 16, 2024; Hearing: March 8, 2024. (lom) |
|
24 | 24
21
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 09/27 12:46 PM
CIVIL PRETRIAL SCHEDULE AND TRIAL ORDER by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. The pretrial schedule governing this case is set forth in the far right column labeled "Court Order" located on the parties' Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet, which accompanies this Order. If the parties wish to set additional or alternative dates, they must file a stipulation and proposed order setting forth the dates requested and demonstrating good cause. Setting additional or alternative dates may be especially appropriate in class actions, patent cases, or cases for benefits under the Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 ("ERISA"). Please refer to the Courts Standing Order for Newly Assigned Civil Cases for requirements for specific motions, discovery, certain types of filings, courtesy copies, emailing signature items to chambers, settlement, and other matters pertaining to all civil cases. Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/10/2025 03:00 PM; Jury Trial set for 1/28/2025 09:00 AM. See order for additional deadlines and information. (lom) |
|
23 | 23
order
Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)
Wed 09/27 11:05 AM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 12/6/2024. (hc) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 08/31 10:15 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Wesley L. Hsu: The Court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) Report submitted by the parties and determines that an in-person scheduling conference is unnecessary. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the 9/08/2023, Scheduling Conference. No appearance by counsel is necessary. A separate order will issue setting the deadlines and dates for this case. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (hc) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Fri 08/25 12:25 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4, filed by Plaintiff Paul Sapan.. |
|
Att: 1 Scheduling Worksheet | ||
Friday, July 21, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 07/21 11:51 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Liberty Bankers Life Insurance Company, identifying Heritage Guaranty Holdings, Inc. and HGH Group, Inc.. (Forman, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
10
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 07/19 7:09 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. Scheduling Conference set for September 8, 2023 at 1:00 PM. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom) |
|
18 | 18
order
Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form
Tue 07/18 4:52 PM
ORDER IN RESPONSE TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Answer to Complaint15 by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. A notice of interested parties shall be filed no later than 5 days from entry of this Order. (lom) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Mon 07/17 5:20 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Answer to Complaint15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom) |
|
16 | 16
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Mon 07/17 3:18 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE WESLEY L. HSU. (hc) |
|
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 07/17 1:59 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Liberty Bankers Life Insurance Company.(Forman, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Tue 05/30 4:48 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT FOR MORE THAN 30 DAYS13 by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. The time for Defendant to respond to the Complaint is extended until June 23, 2023. (lom) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Wed 05/24 9:29 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to June 23, 2023 filed by Defendant Liberty Bankers Life Insurance Company.(Saba, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, May 19, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
cs_rasgn
Chief District Judge Transferring Case
Mon 05/22 11:34 AM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#23-040) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Wesley L. Hsu, this case is transferred from Judge David O. Carter to the calendar of Judge Wesley L. Hsu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:23-cv-00435 WLH(ADSx). (rn) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Appearance
Mon 04/24 3:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael Forman on behalf of Defendant Liberty Bankers Life Insurance Company (Forman, Michael) |
|
10 | 10
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Mon 04/24 9:37 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Liberty Bankers Life Insurance Company answer now due 5/24/2023, filed by Defendant Liberty Bankers Life Insurance Company.(Attorney Ryan D Saba added to party Liberty Bankers Life Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Saba, Ryan) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 03/21 10:55 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kdu) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/13 10:22 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Liberty Bankers Life Insurance Company. (car) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Mon 03/13 10:06 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/13 10:06 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/13 10:05 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (car) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/10 10:38 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Paul Sapan, (Prato, Justin) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/10 10:37 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Paul Sapan. (Prato, Justin) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Fri 03/10 10:36 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Paul Sapan. (Prato, Justin) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/10 10:36 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34933250 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Paul Sapan. (Attorney Justin Prato added to party Paul Sapan(pty:pla))(Prato, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 |