Fitzgerald v. Reno Police Department et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Miranda M Du |
Case #: | 3:23-cv-00100 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2023 |
Terminated: | May 08, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 06, 2023 2:17 AM PDT |
Defendant
Doe Police Officers
|
|
Defendant
Reno Police Department
|
|
Plaintiff
Marty Fitzgerald
73049 Northern Nevada Correctional Center PO Box 7000
Carson City, NV 89702 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, May 08, 2023 | ||
minord
Minute Order Order on Motion for Appointment of Counsel Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis ~Util - Terminate Case
Mon 05/08 10:13 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/8/2023. Plaintiff initiated this action with the filing of an application to proceed in forma pauperis and a proposed complaint. Because the Court has not yet decided Plaintiff's motion and the complaint has not been filed, Plaintiff's motion for voluntary dismissal (ECF No.7 ) is granted. It is therefore ordered that this case is dismissed, in its entirety, without prejudice. It is further ordered that Plaintiff's motions to proceed in forma pauperis and for appointment of counsel (ECF Nos.1 ,4 ) are denied as moot. Case terminated. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV) |
||
Thursday, May 04, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Motion Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 05/05 9:06 AM
MOTION to Withdraw Complaint Without Prejudice, by Plaintiff Marty Fitzgerald. (DRM) (misc) (dispositive) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Notice to Clerk - Consent or Declination
Tue 03/14 2:06 PM
NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Case to Magistrate Judge. (Document restricted under General Order 2021-03.) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Motion Appointment of Counsel
Tue 03/14 1:44 PM
MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Marty Fitzgerald. (HKL) |
|
notice
Clerks Notice Assign District Judge to Civil Case
Tue 03/14 2:31 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (WJ) |
||
Friday, March 10, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas
Fri 03/10 11:41 AM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (LG) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice Assignment of Case to MJ & Consent Form
Fri 03/10 11:39 AM
NOTICE of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to General Order 2021-03. Attached is a form to indicate whether you consent or decline to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Please submit your consent or declination form within 21 days of filing your complaint or appearing as a defendant. See notice for details. Consent or declination is due by 3/31/2023. Please file the completed form under the filing event called Notice to Clerk - Consent or Declination in the Representation and Appearances civil menu category. (LG) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 03/10 11:29 AM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Marty Fitzgerald.(LG) |
|
Att: 1 financial certificate, | ||
Att: 2 complaint | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Fri 03/10 11:31 AM
Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. (LG) |