Hee Soon Park v. 170 S. Beverly LLC
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Otis D Wright, II |
Referred: | Steve Kim |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01811 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2023 |
Terminated: | May 05, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 06, 2023 2:30 AM PDT |
Defendant
170 S. Beverly LLC
|
|
Defendant
DOES
|
|
Plaintiff
Hee Soon Park
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Friday, May 05, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Fri 05/05 9:58 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Hee Soon Park. (Kim, Jason) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Tue 04/04 10:56 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Court has reviewed the Response filed by Plaintiff and Plaintiffs counsel to the Court's Order to Show Cause13 . The Court, in its discretion, declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs Unruh Act, California Disabled Persons Act,California Health and Safety Code, and negligence claims. The Court therefore DISMISSES these claims WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (lc) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Response
Fri 03/31 9:43 AM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Hee Soon Parkto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,,12 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction(Kim, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration | ||
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 03/16 1:49 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE IN WRITING NO LATER THAN MARCH 31, 2023 why the Court shouldexercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim and any other state law claim asserted in the Complaint. Failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order to Show Cause may, without further warning, result in the dismissal of the entire action without prejudice or the Court declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act and other state law claims, if any, and the dismissal of that claim pursuant to 28 USC 1367(c). (lc) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 12:05 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant 170 S. Beverly LLC. (jtil) |
|
10 | 10
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Tue 03/14 10:45 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: ORDER REGARDING PROSECUTION OF CERTAIN CASES UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT. The Court finds that there is good cause to institute a limited scheduling order concerning basic case prosecution for cases under the Americans With Disabilities Act involving physical barriers in places of public accommodation. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC ENUMERATED REQUIREMENTS AND DEADLINES THEREIN). The failure to comply with this Order in a particular case will result in a sanction of $300.00 payable to the clerk of the court within two weeks of Plaintiff being given notice of noncompliance and dismissal for lack of prosecution. The Court finds these sanctions sufficient and necessary to deter violations of the Order and to achieve timely prosecution of these cases without unnecessary intervention by the Court. (lc) |
|
9 | 9
adr
Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20)
Tue 03/14 10:43 AM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (lc) |
|
8 | 8
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Tue 03/14 10:41 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. EFFECTIVE IMMEDIATELY- No mandatory chambers copies required, EXCEPT FOR EXCEPT FOR motions for summary judgment and any other evidence-heavy motions. The Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who have pending cases in the US District Court for the Central District of California to submit documents electronically to the Clerks Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Court's Website and Judge's procedures for information as applicable. (lc) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Mon 03/13 5:13 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/13 5:12 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/13 5:12 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (jtil) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Fri 03/10 12:33 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Hee Soon Park. (Kim, Jason) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/10 12:33 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/10 12:32 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Hee Soon Park. (Kim, Jason) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/10 12:32 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34934926 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Hee Soon Park(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason) |