Arutyvan Fitilchyan v. Kiololo Kijakazi
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpo |
Referred: | Alka Sagar |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01816 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2023 |
Terminated: | May 16, 2023 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, May 16, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
judgmentCV
Judgment
Tue 05/16 11:53 AM
JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar, Related to: Stipulation to Remand Case to US Agency8 , Order to Remand Case to US Agency10 . The Court having approved the parties' stipulation to remand this case pursuant to Sentence 4 of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) for further proceedings consistent with that stipulation and for entry of judgment for Plaintiff, judgment is hereby entered for Plaintiff. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (hr) |
|
10 | 10
order
Remand Case to US Agency
Tue 05/16 11:50 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. IT IS ORDERED that the above-captioned action is remanded to the Commissioner of Social Security for further proceedings consistent with the terms of the Stipulation for Remand. (hr) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
order
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Tue 05/16 10:58 AM
ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong: granting5 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (yl) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
stip
Remand Case to US Agency
Thu 05/11 12:49 PM
STIPULATION to Remand Case to US Agency Social Security Administration filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi.(Tarn, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Judgment | ||
Wednesday, April 05, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only)
Wed 04/05 3:22 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attorney Jennifer Lee Tarn added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Tarn, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 9:07 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and referred to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (car) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Wed 03/15 4:21 PM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Arutyvan Fitilchyan. (Aghai, Sima) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Mon 03/13 10:46 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 . The following error(s) was found: A case-initiating document was submitted without payment of the full filing fee. Within two business days of this notice, counsel must pay the filing fee or file a request to proceed in forma pauperis;otherwise, the docket for this case number will be closed and no further filings will be permitted under this case number. The filing fee may be paid online by docketing the event Pay Filing Fee. (car) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/10 2:33 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Arutyvan Fitilchyan, (Aghai, Sima) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/10 2:27 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Arutyvan Fitilchyan. (Aghai, Sima) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/10 2:24 PM
COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by plaintiff Arutyvan Fitilchyan. (Attorney Sima G Aghai added to party Arutyvan Fitilchyan(pty:pla))(Aghai, Sima) |