Soledad Aguirre-Martinez v. Walmart, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Wesley L Hsu |
Referred: | Charles F Eick |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01819 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2023 |
Terminated: | Dec 20, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Los Angeles Superior Court, 22CMCV00134 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 06, 2023 2:44 AM PDT |
Defendant
Walmart, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Soledad Aguirre-Martinez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Wednesday, December 20, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Thu 12/21 4:07 PM
ORDER REGARDING STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL21 by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. IT IS ORDERED THAT THIS ACTION BE, AND HEREBY IS, DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to all claims, causes of action, and parties, with each party bearing that party's own attorney's fees and costs. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) |
|
Tuesday, December 12, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
stip
Dismiss Case
Tue 12/12 8:31 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(ii) filed by Defendant Walmart, Inc..(McDonald, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Re Dismissal | ||
Thursday, August 31, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
13
pgs
order
Order
Thu 08/31 12:10 PM
STANDING ORDER FOR MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. When filing or opposing a motion for summary judgment, a party must comply with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 56, Local Civil Rule 56 of the Central District of California, this Order, and the Court's Standing Order for Civil Cases. Because summary judgment motions are fact-dependent, parties should prepare papers in a fashion that clearly identifies the facts material to the motion for summary judgment (e.g., generous use of tabs, tables of contents, headings, indices, etc.). (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm) |
|
19 | 19
20
pgs
order
Order
Thu 08/31 12:04 PM
CIVIL PRETRIAL SCHEDULE AND TRIAL ORDER by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. The pretrial schedule governing this case is set forth in the Court's July 31, 2023 Order. If the parties wish to set additional or alternative dates, they must file a stipulation and proposed order setting forth the dates requested and demonstrating good cause. Setting additional or alternative dates may be especially appropriate in class actions, patent cases, or cases for benefits under the Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 ("ERISA"). (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm) |
|
18 | 18
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Thu 08/31 11:39 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE WESLEY L. HSU. (hc) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Hearings
Wed 08/02 10:08 AM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION CONTINUING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE AND REQUESTING ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER [DOCKET NO. 16] by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. The Court hereby GRANTS the Stipulation and ORDERS as follows: (1) The Civil Trial Preparation Order (Docket No. 14) is vacated. (2) The deadlines set forth in Exhibit A will govern. Additional continuances will not be granted absent exceptional circumstances See attached Exhibit A: CIVIL PRETRIAL SCHEDULE AND TRIAL ORDER for Schedule of Pretrial And Trial Dates Worksheet for deadlines and other information. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/1/2024 03:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 3/19/2024 09:00 AM. (lom) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, July 21, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
stip
Continue
Fri 07/21 12:22 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue CONTINUING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE AND REQESTING ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER from August 22, 2023 to March 1, 2024 Re: Text Only Scheduling Notice, 13 filed by Defendant Walmart, Inc..(McDonald, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A TO JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE AND REQUESTING ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER M. McDONALD IN SUPPORT OF JOINT STIPULATION CONTINUING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE AND REQUESTING ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION CONTINUING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE AND REQESTING ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER [ECF NO. #___] | ||
Friday, May 19, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
cs_rasgn
Chief District Judge Transferring Case
Mon 05/22 10:05 AM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#23-056) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Wesley L. Hsu, this case is transferred from Judge Stephen V. Wilson to the calendar of Judge Wesley L. Hsu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-01819-WLH (Ex). (et) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
order
Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
Thu 04/13 9:37 AM
CIVIL TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) |
|
13 | 13
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 04/13 9:34 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The initial status conference scheduled for 04/17/2023 at 3:00 p.m. is vacated and off-calendar. A jury trial is set for 08/22/2023 at 9:00 a.m., with a pretrial conference on 08/14/2023 at 3:00 p.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Wed 04/05 10:17 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Walmart, Inc., served on April 5, 2023. (McDonald, Christopher) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 9:47 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Miscellaneous Document10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Proof of Service (subsequent documents). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (aco) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Miscellaneous Document
Fri 03/17 2:53 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Walmart, Inc. (McDonald, Christopher) |
|
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Fri 03/17 2:21 PM
ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Walmart, Inc..(McDonald, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Tue 03/14 2:43 PM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 4/17/2023 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) |
|
7 | 7
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 03/14 2:41 PM
NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Fri 03/10 4:16 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) |
|
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 03/10 4:15 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 03/10 4:15 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (lh) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/10 2:54 PM
NOTICE/AND CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Walmart, Inc., identifying Walmart, Inc.. (McDonald, Christopher) |
|
2 | 2
4
pgs
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/10 2:50 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Walmart, Inc.. (McDonald, Christopher) |
|
1 | 1
23
pgs
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/10 2:45 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 22CMCV00134 Receipt No: ACACDC-34936794 - Fee: $402, filed by DEFENDANT Walmart, Inc.. (Attorney Christopher M McDonald added to party Walmart, Inc.(pty:dft))(McDonald, Christopher) |
|
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Fri 03/10 4:20 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Walmart, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Soledad Aguirre-Martinez. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 2/01/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ) (lh) |