Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada and California Glaziers, Fabricators, Painters and Floorcoverers Pension Trust Fund v. Decor Interior Design, Inc. et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Jennifer A Dorsey |
Referred: | Nancy J Koppe |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00383 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 06, 2023 2:40 AM PDT |
Defendant
Decor Interior Design, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The North River Insurance Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada and California Glaziers, Fabricators, Painters and Floorcoverers Pension Trust Fund
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, December 21, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 12/21 3:24 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada and California Glaziers, Fabricators, Painters and Floorcoverers Pension Trust Fund. . (Archibald, Kevin) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2023 | ||
minord
Minute Order
Thu 12/07 12:41 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/7/2023. By Deputy Clerk: Danielle Cacciabaudo. Re:7 Order Staying Case. The Court granted the plaintiffs' request to stay this case until 12/1/2023. Nothing has been filed since. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiffs file a Status Report by 12/22/2023. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC) |
||
Monday, October 02, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
4
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation Order Staying Case
Mon 10/02 2:46 PM
ORDER Granting6 Stipulation to Stay Case. Case is stayed until further order of this court. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/2/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) |
|
Friday, September 29, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Stipulation
Fri 09/29 2:00 PM
STIPULATION TO STAY CASE with Proposed Order by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada and California Glaziers, Fabricators, Painters and Floorcoverers Pension Trust Fund. (Archibald, Kevin) (stay) (dispositive) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 07/07 4:13 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada and California Glaziers, Fabricators, Painters and Floorcoverers Pension Trust Fund. Decor Interior Design, Inc. served on 4/7/2023; The North River Insurance Company served on 3/27/2023. (Archibald, Kevin) |
|
misc
Notice 4m Dismissal
Fri 07/07 9:39 AM
NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The * Complaint * in this action was filed on * 03/10/2023. * To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to * Decor Interior Design, Inc. and The North River Insurance Company. * FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 8/6/2023. (HAM) |
||
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/13 9:08 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Decor Interior Design, Inc., The North River Insurance Company re1 Complaint (HAM) |
|
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Mon 03/13 9:04 AM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (HAM) |
||
Friday, March 10, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Fri 03/10 3:54 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada and California Glaziers, Fabricators, Painters and Floorcoverers Pension Trust Fund. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Archibald, Kevin) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/10 3:51 PM
COMPLAINT against Decor Interior Design, Inc., The North River Insurance Company (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7232950) by Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada and California Glaziers, Fabricators, Painters and Floorcoverers Pension Trust Fund. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/20/2023. Proof of service due by 6/8/2023. (Archibald, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons |