Paull Quiroa v. IKEA North America Services, LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Percy Anderson |
Referred: | Alka Sagar |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01825 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 14, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Superior Court of California, County of Los Angele, 20STCV37442 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 06, 2023 2:10 AM PDT |
Defendant
Dorel Home Furnishings, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
IKEA Distributions Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
IKEA North America Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paull Quiroa
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 2:33 PM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court, 111 N. Hill St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (bm) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
minutes
Status Conference - optional html form ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Wed 03/15 2:30 PM
MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE by ZOOM held before Judge Percy Anderson: Because the initial pleading filed on September 30, 2020, was not removable, the removal of this action on March 10, 2023, was untimely under the 1-year removal limitation contained in 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1446(c)(1). The Court therefore concludes that Removing Defendant's Notice of Removal is procedurally defective. See Sec. 1446(b)(1). At the status conference, the Court waived the requirements of Local Rule 6-1 and Plaintiff's counsel moved to remand the action to the Los Angeles Superior Court based on Removing Defendant's failure to timely file the Notice of Removal. The Court grants Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Accordingly, this action is remanded to the Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 20STCV37442, as a result of the procedural defect. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) Court Reporter: Phyllis Preston (video). (bm) |
|
6 | 6
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 03/14 11:44 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Percy Anderson Status Conference by ZOOM is set for 3/14/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kss) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Mon 03/13 4:58 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment 4 Civil Cover Sheet should be e-filed separately. The correct event category is located under Civil Events - Other Filings - Miscellaneous Filings. Attachment 5 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties should be e-filed separate. The event is located under Civil Events Other Filings Notices. and Attachment 6, the event is located under Civil Events Other Filings Miscellaneous Filings. (car) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Mon 03/13 2:30 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) |
|
3 | 3
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/13 2:30 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/13 2:29 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (car) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/10 4:14 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, case number 20STCV37442 Receipt No: ACACDC-34937801 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Dorel Home Furnishings, Inc.. (Attorney Brian James Hamilton added to party Dorel Home Furnishings, Inc.(pty:dft))(Hamilton, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Registrar of Actions Superior Court, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit DRAFT Notice of Removal to Superior Court, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Motion to Intervene, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties, | ||
Att: 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Mon 03/13 2:39 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Prime Wheel Corporation and Does 1 to 100, filed by Plaintiff Paull Quiroa. Filed in State Court on 9/30/2020 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit A pg 6 to Notice of Removal1 (car) |
||
othcmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 03/13 2:42 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 to 100, Dorel Home Furnishings, Inc., IKEA Distributions Services, Inc., IKEA North America Services, LLC amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff Paull Quiroa. Filed in State Court on 10/5/2020 Submitted with Attachment 1 pg 20 to Notice of Removal1 (car) |
||
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 03/13 2:49 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Paull Quiroa, upon Defendant IKEA Distributions Services, Inc. served on 3/29/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, Process Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 4/7/2021 Submitted with Attachment 1 pg 41 to Notice of Removal1 (car) |
||
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 03/13 2:58 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Paull Quiroa, upon Defendant IKEA North America Services, LLC served on 3/30/2021, answer due 4/20/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, Process Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 4/7/2021 Submitted with Attachment 1 pg 42 to Notice of Removal1 (car) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Mon 03/13 4:24 PM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Defendants IKEA Distributions Services, Inc., IKEA North America Services, LLC. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/14/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A PAGE 64 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ]. (et) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Mon 03/13 4:28 PM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Defendant Dorel Home Furnishings, Inc. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/10/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A PAGE 110 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ]. (et) |
||
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 03/13 4:50 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Paull Quiroa, upon Defendant Dorel Asia dba Dorel Distribution Asia, Inc.. served on 3/29/2021, answer due 4/19/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, Process Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 4/7/2021 Submitted with Attachment 1 pg 40 to Notice of Removal1 (car) |