Kristina Marris v. Flagstar Bank, N.A. et al
California Central District Court | |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01826 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1444 Notice of Removal - Foreclosure |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 13, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Orange County Superior Court, 30-02023-01305266 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 06, 2023 1:59 AM PDT |
Defendant
Aurora Financial Group, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Flagstar Bank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kristina Marris
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
transfer
Intradistrict Transfer - Clerical Error (G-73) - optional html form
Mon 03/13 11:22 AM
NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Karen E. Scott. New Case Number 8:23-cv-00447-DOC-KESx. (car) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Fri 03/10 4:18 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Flagstar Bank, N.A. (erroneously sued as Flagstar Bank, F.S.B.) and Aurora Financial Group, Inc. (erroneously sued as New York Aurora Financail Group, Inc.), re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Corporate Disclosure Statement,3 served on 03/10/2023. (Bhasker, Shalini) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/10 4:14 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Flagstar Bank, N.A. (erroneously sued as Flagstar Bank, F.S.B.) and Aurora Financial Group, Inc. (erroneously sued as New York Aurora Financail Group, Inc.) identifying New York Community Bancorp Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Bhasker, Shalini) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/10 4:04 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Flagstar Bank, N.A. (erroneously sued as Flagstar Bank, F.S.B.) and Aurora Financial Group, Inc. (erroneously sued as New York Aurora Financail Group, Inc.). (Bhasker, Shalini) |
|
1 | 1
8
pgs
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/10 4:03 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2023 01305266-CU-OR-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-34937987 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Flagstar Bank, N.A. (erroneously sued as Flagstar Bank, F.S.B.) and Aurora Financial Group, Inc. (erroneously sued as New York Aurora Financail Group, Inc.). (Attorney Shalini Bhasker added to party Flagstar Bank, N.A. (erroneously sued as Flagstar Bank, F.S.B.) and Aurora Financial Group, Inc. (erroneously sued as New York Aurora Financail Group, Inc.)(pty:dft))(Bhasker, Shalini) |
|
Att: 1 49 pgs Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal |