April George v. Staffmark Investment LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Sunshine Suzanne Sykes |
Referred: | Kenly Kiya Kato |
Case #: | 5:23-cv-00425 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jun 20, 2023 |
Case in other court: | San Bernardino Superior Court, CIVSB2220514 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 06, 2023 2:26 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Geodis Logistics LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Staffmark Investment LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
April George
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, June 20, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 06/20 4:29 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Sunshine S. Sykes: In light of the Notice of Settlement filed June 14, 2023 [Dkt.19 ], indicating that the case has settled, this action is placed in inactive status. By July 20, 2023, the parties shall file either (1) a Stipulation of Dismissal under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); (2) a Stipulation for an Order of Dismissal under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2); or (3) a motion to reopen if settlement has not been consummated. Upon the failure to comply with this Order in a timely manner, this action shall be deemed dismissed as of July 21, 2023. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party. All previously set deadlines and dates are hereby VACATED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JS-6) THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
stip
Settlement
Wed 06/14 3:33 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Settlement Entire Action filed by Plaintiff's Attorney April George.(Smaili, Jihad) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 05/16 3:26 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Sunshine S. Sykes: On its own motion, the Court hereby CONTINUES the Scheduling Conference from May 19, 2023, to June 23, 2023, at 2:00 p.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Thu 05/04 3:52 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Defendants Geodis Logistics LLC, Staffmark Investment LLC..(Platt, Taylor) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet | ||
Friday, April 21, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Fri 04/21 2:20 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Fed. R. Civ. P. 5 no proof of service attached. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Compel Arbitration
Thu 04/20 12:19 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by defendant Staffmark Investment LLC. Motion set for hearing on 6/23/2023 at 02:00 PM before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (Steward, Susan) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Suzanne Perry, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Emily Giltner, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Martin Li, | ||
Att: 4 Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Mon 03/27 11:51 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Scheduling Conference set for 5/19/2023 at 01:00 PM before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Mon 03/20 4:15 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Fri 03/17 1:44 PM
ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Staffmark Investment LLC.(Steward, Susan) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/16 4:20 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Staffmark Investment LLC, (Steward, Susan) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Appearance
Thu 03/16 3:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Susan M Steward on behalf of Defendant Staffmark Investment LLC (Attorney Susan M Steward added to party Staffmark Investment LLC(pty:dft))(Steward, Susan) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/16 3:57 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Staffmark Investment LLC identifying RGF Staffing USA, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Steward, Susan) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Mon 03/13 12:03 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/13 12:02 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/13 12:02 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (car) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/10 5:24 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Geodis Logistics LLC (Sweiss, Hannah) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 03/10 5:20 PM
Notice of Related Cases filed by Defendant Geodis Logistics LLC. (Sweiss, Hannah) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/10 5:16 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Geodis Logistics LLC, identifying April George, Geodis Logistics, LLC, Staffmark Investment LLC, Hannah Sweiss, Esq., of Fisher & Phillips LLP, Taylor R. Platt, Esq., of Fisher & Phillips LLP, Jihad M. Smaili, Esq., of Smaili & Associates, PC, Stephen D. Counts, Esq. of Smaili & Associates, PC. (Sweiss, Hannah) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/10 5:01 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Geodis Logistics LLC. (Sweiss, Hannah) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/10 4:59 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino, case number CIVSB2220514 Receipt No: ACACDC-34938817 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Geodis Logistics LLC. (Attorney Hannah Sweiss added to party Geodis Logistics LLC (pty:dft))(Sweiss, Hannah) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 24 pgs Complaint | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Mon 03/13 12:07 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-50, inclusive, Geodis Logistics LLC, Staffmark Investment LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff April George. Filed in State Court on 10/17/2022 Submitted with Attachment 3 to Notice of Removal1 (car) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Mon 03/13 12:14 PM
NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Geodis Logistics LLC. Submitted with Declaration of Hannah Sweiss Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal1 (car) |