Jeff Bloom et al v. State Farm General Insurance Company
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John W Holcomb |
Referred: | John D Early |
Case #: | 8:23-cv-00442 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2023 |
Terminated: | Feb 26, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Orange County Superior Court, 30-02023-01303060-CU- |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 06, 2023 2:07 AM PDT |
Defendant
State Farm General Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DOES
|
|
Plaintiff
Devon Bloom
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeff Bloom
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
43 | 43
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 03/19 3:53 PM
ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Judge John W. Holcomb, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case42 .(SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (et) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
42 | 42
stip
Dismiss Case
Mon 03/18 1:51 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant State Farm General Insurance Company.(McKeon, Heather) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, February 26, 2024 | ||
41 | 41
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Mon 02/26 10:03 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: In light of the Notice of Settlement filed February 26, 2024 [ECF No. 40], indicating that the case has settled, this action is placed in inactive status. By March 26, 2024, the parties shall file either (1) a Stipulation of Dismissal under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i); (2) a Stipulation for an Order of Dismissal under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2); or (3) a motion to reopen if settlement has not been consummated. Upon the failure to comply with this Order in a timely manner, this action shall be deemed dismissed as of March 27, 2024. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party. All previously set deadlines and dates are hereby VACATED. (JS-6) THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cla) |
|
40 | 40
notice
Settlement
Mon 02/26 8:23 AM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Defendant State Farm General Insurance Company.(McKeon, Heather) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, February 16, 2024 | ||
39 | 39
19
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Fri 02/16 6:15 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment 32 PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Plaintiffs Devon Bloom, Jeff Bloom. (Furtado, David) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2024 | ||
38 | 38
respm
Motion Related Document
Fri 02/09 7:18 PM
PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment 32 filed by Plaintiffs Devon Bloom, Jeff Bloom.(Furtado, David) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | ||
37 | 37
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Fri 02/09 2:10 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court has received and reviewed (1) Plaintiffs' "Motion for Leave for Plaintiffs to Respond on February 9, 2024, to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment with Extensions of Deadlines for Defendant's Reply (February 16, 2024) and the Hearing (March 1, 2024)" the ("Motion") [ECF No. 34], which the Court has construed as an ex parte application under L.R 7-19; and (2) Defendant's Response thereto [ECF No. 36]. After considering those papers, the Court GRANTS the Motion and CONTINUES the hearing on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment ("MSJ") [ECF No. 32] to March 8, 2024, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 9D of the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 411 W. 4th Street, Santa Ana, California. In accordance with L.R. 7-9, 7-10, and 7-11, Plaintiffs' Opposition to the MSJ is due no later than February 16, 2024, and Defendant's Reply is in support of the MSJ due no later than February 23, 2024. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cla) |
|
36 | 36
misc
Response
Fri 02/09 11:08 AM
RESPONSE filed by Defendant State Farm General Insurance Companyto Motion Related Document,,34 (McKeon, Heather) |
|
Thursday, February 08, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Thu 02/08 10:19 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court has received and reviewed Plaintiffs' "Motion for Leave for Plaintiffs to Respond on February 9, 2024, to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment with Extensions of Deadlines for Defendants Reply (February 16, 2024) and the Hearing (March 1, 2024)" (the "Motion") [ECF No. 34]. The Court construes the Motion as an ex parte application under L.R. 7-19. The Court DIRECTS Defendant to file its response to Plaintiffs' Motion no later than February 9, 2024, at 12:00 noon P.S.T. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cla) |
|
Wednesday, February 07, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
respm
Motion Related Document
Wed 02/07 3:16 PM
MOTION FOR LEAVE FOR PLAINTIFFS TO RESPOND ON FEBRUARY 9, 2024 TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITH EXTENSIONS OF DEADLINES FOR DEFENDANT'S REPLY (FEBRUARY 16, 2024) AND THE HEARING (MARCH 1, 2024) re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment 32 filed by Plaintiffs Devon Bloom, Jeff Bloom. |
|
Att: 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF DAVID J. FURTADO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO RESPOND, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order (PROPOSED) ORDER RE MOTION FOR LEAVE FOR PLAINTIFFS TO RESPOND ON FEBRUARY 9, 2024 TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITH EXTENSIONS OF DEADLINES FOR DEFENDANT'S REPLY (FEBRUARY 16, 2024) AND THE HEARING (MARCH 1, 2024)(Furtado, David | ||
Thursday, February 01, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Thu 02/01 11:39 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice (Other)31 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) |
|
Friday, January 26, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Summary Judgment
Fri 01/26 7:45 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant State Farm General Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 2/23/2024 at 09:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (McKeon, Heather) |
|
Att: 1 Defendant State Farm General Insurance Companys Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment Pursuant to F.R.CP. 56, | ||
Att: 2 Joint Statement of Undisputed Facts and Genuine Disputes, | ||
Att: 3 Table of Contents re Joint Exhibits, | ||
Att: 4 Joint Exhibits, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Order | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 01/26 11:30 AM
Notice WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY filed by PLAINTIFFS Devon Bloom, Jeff Bloom. (Furtado, David) |
|
Friday, December 08, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 12/11 1:59 PM
ORDER GRANTING IN PART, AND DENYING IN PART, JOINT STIPULATION FOR ORDER MODIFYING COURTS CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER29 by Judge John W. Holcomb. The Court, having reviewed the Joint Stipulation for Order Modifying the Court's Civil Trial Scheduling Order and finding good cause, hereby issues the following Order: The discovery cutoff currently scheduled for December 15, 2023, is CONTINUED to January 19, 2024. The settlement conference cutoff date of January 12, 2024, is CONTINUED to February 26, 2024. All other case calendar dates remain unchanged. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl) Modified on 12/11/2023 (yl) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
stip
Amend/Correct
Thu 12/07 2:08 PM
Joint STIPULATION to AMEND Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only,23 filed by Defendant State Farm General Insurance Company.(McKeon, Heather) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, September 07, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
order
Protective Order
Thu 09/07 4:55 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. re Stipulation for Protective Order27 (mba) |
|
27 | 27
stip
Protective Order
Thu 09/07 4:37 PM
Amended STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant State Farm General Insurance Company.(McKeon, Heather) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 24, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Thu 08/24 5:24 PM
MINUTE (In Chambers) Order Denying Stipulation for Protective Order by Magistrate Judge John D. Early, re: Stipulation for Protective Order25 . The Proposed Protective Order suffers from several defects. The Proposed Protective Order (Dkt. 25) is DENIED without prejudice to the parties submitting a new stipulation and proposed protective order (see document for further details). (hr) |
|
25 | 25
stip
Protective Order
Thu 08/24 2:58 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant State Farm General Insurance Company.(McKeon, Heather) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, June 28, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)
Wed 06/28 10:51 AM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge John W. Holcomb. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 1/12/2024. (cla) |
|
23 | 23
order
Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
Wed 06/28 10:49 AM
CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: Discovery cut-off 12/15/2023, Last date to conduct settlement conference is 1/12/2024, Dispositive Motions cut-off 2/23/2024, Motions in Limine cut-off 3/29/2024, Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/5/2024 at 1:00 PM, Jury Trial set for 4/22/2024 at 9:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (cla) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 05/30 10:47 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE OFF CALENDAR by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court has considered the parties' Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report with respect to the Scheduling Conference and has concluded that the hearing on June 2, 2023, is not necessary. Accordingly, the Scheduling Conference is taken off calendar. No appearance by counsel is necessary. A separate order will issue setting the deadlines and dates for this case. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ev) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 05/10 5:38 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John W. Holcomb. Upon consideration of Plaintiffs Jeff Bloom & Devon Bloom and Defendant State Farm General Insurance Companys Joint Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Conference and good cause showing, it is hereby ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference currently set for May 19, 2023, is CONTINUED to June 2, 2023, at 11:00 a.m in Courtroom 9D of the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and US Courthouse, 411 W. 4th Street, Santa Ana, CA 92701. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
stip
Continue
Tue 05/09 8:34 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from May 15, 2022 to June 2, 2023 filed by Plaintiffs Devon Bloom, Jeff Bloom.(Furtado, David) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Conference | ||
Friday, May 05, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Report
Fri 05/05 11:24 AM
Joint Rule 26(f) Conference Report REPORT of RULE 26(f) filed by Plaintiffs Devon Bloom, Jeff Bloom.(Furtado, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet | ||
Tuesday, April 11, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Tue 04/11 8:19 AM
Text Only ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Carl J. Snider to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Devon Bloom, Jeff Bloom17 by Judge John W. Holcomb. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cla) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Tue 04/04 10:23 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Carl J. Snider to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Devon Bloom, Jeff Bloom (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 3/31/2023, Receipt No. ACACDC-35057311) filed by Plaintiffs Devon Bloom, Jeff Bloom. (Furtado, David) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice | ||
Monday, April 03, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
Mon 04/03 4:42 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Carl J. Snider to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Devon Bloom, Jeff Bloom (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35057311)15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed for either applicant or local counsel. See Instructions for Applicants (1). (lt) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Fri 03/31 11:00 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Carl J. Snider to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Devon Bloom, Jeff Bloom (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35057311) filed by Jeff Bloom and Devon Bloom Devon Bloom, Jeff Bloom. (Furtado, David) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice | ||
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Fri 03/17 3:55 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David J. Furtado counsel for Plaintiffs Devon Bloom, Jeff Bloom. Adding David J. Furtado as counsel of record for Jeff Bloom and Devon Bloom for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Jeff Bloom and Devon Bloom. (Furtado, David) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Declaration
Fri 03/17 3:49 PM
DECLARATION of Declaration of Lead Trial Counsel filed by Plaintiffs Devon Bloom, Jeff Bloom. (Furtado, David) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/17 3:46 PM
Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Furtado, David) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Thu 03/16 10:16 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John W. Holcomb. Scheduling Conference set for 5/19/2023 at 11:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (cla) |
|
10 | 10
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Thu 03/16 10:14 AM
STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (cla) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
cs_rasgn
Reassign Case - Self -Recusal --pursuant GO 21-01 (CV-52)
Wed 03/15 3:01 PM
ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 21-01 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Case transferred from Judge Cormac J. Carney to the calendar of Judge John W. Holcomb for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 8:23-cv-00442-JWH-JDEx. (aco) |
|
8 | 8
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 03/15 10:41 AM
NOTICE OF INTENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on May 11, 2023. (rrp) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Tue 03/14 4:10 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/14 4:09 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/14 4:09 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (jtil) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/10 5:41 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant State Farm General Insurance Company, identifying STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, with its principal place of business in Illinois. (McKeon, Heather) |
|
3 | 3
trial
Jury Demand
Fri 03/10 5:38 PM
DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant State Farm General Insurance Company.. (McKeon, Heather) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/10 5:37 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant State Farm General Insurance Company. (McKeon, Heather) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/10 5:36 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2023 01303060-CU-BC-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-34939239 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant State Farm General Insurance Company. (Attorney Heather Mason McKeon added to party State Farm General Insurance Company(pty:dft))(McKeon, Heather) |
|
Att: 1 10 pgs Exhibit A - Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Answer, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Claim File Notes | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Tue 03/14 3:50 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs Jeff Bloom and Devon Bloom in Orange county Superior Court on 1/19/2023, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Tue 03/14 3:52 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant State Farm General Insurance Company, attached as Exhibit D. (jtil) |