Milledge v. Roman Catholic Diocese of Las Vegas et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Cristina D Silva |
Referred: | Daniel J Albregts |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00385 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2023 |
Terminated: | Dec 29, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 06, 2023 1:51 AM PDT |
Defendant
Roman Catholic Diocese of Las Vegas
336 Cathedral Way
Las Vegas, NV 89109 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
St. Joseph Husband of Mary Parish
7260 W, Sahara Ave.
Las Vegas, NV 89117 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anna Milledge
8945 W. Russell Road Suite 300
Las Vegas, NV 89148 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, December 29, 2023 | ||
34 | 34
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation Order Dismissing Case
Tue 01/02 10:28 AM
ORDER Granting33 Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED, WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear its own fees and costs. The Clerk of Court is kindly instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 12/29/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RGDG) |
|
Thursday, December 28, 2023 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Stipulation
Thu 12/28 2:19 PM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL with Prejudice by Defendants Roman Catholic Diocese of Las Vegas, St. Joseph Husband of Mary Parish. (Berrios, Jerrell) (dismissal) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Wed 12/13 2:46 PM
ORDER granting30 Stipulation for Partial Voluntary Dismissal. Based upon the above and foregoing, the claims and allegations relating to any alleged discrimination or retaliation against plaintiff on the basis of her sex are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 12/13/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH) |
|
Tuesday, December 12, 2023 | ||
minord
Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 12/12 3:46 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 12/12/2023. By Deputy Clerk: E. Garcia. The Telephonic Status Conference set for Wednesday, December 13, 2023 at 1:00 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah is VACATED . Parties filed the stipulation for dismissal in this case. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EMG) |
||
Monday, December 11, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Stipulation
Mon 12/11 8:03 PM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL Stipulation and Order for Partial Voluntary Dismissal re1 Complaint,, by Defendants Roman Catholic Diocese of Las Vegas, St. Joseph Husband of Mary Parish. (Hendricks, Kara) (dismissal) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2023 | ||
minord
Minute Order Setting Hearing
Mon 12/04 2:38 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 12/4/2023. By Deputy Clerk: E. Garcia. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a telephonic status hearing with counsel is scheduled for December 13, 2023 at 1:00 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. If dismissal papers are lodged with the Court by or before this date, the telephonic status hearing will be automatically vacated. The Parties are instructed to call the Audio Conference Line at (888) 251-2909, access code 7771745 , five (5) minutes prior to the hearing time. Please remain on the line until such time as the Court joins the call and convenes the proceedings. The use of a cell phone or speaker phone during the call is prohibited. The call must be made using a land line. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EMG) |
||
Monday, October 30, 2023 | ||
minutes
Status Conference
Mon 10/30 10:30 AM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/30/2023 before Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. Crtrm Administrator: E. Garcia ; Pla Counsel: Christina Mundy ; Def Counsel: Jerrell Berrios ; Recording start and end times: 10:05a.m. - 10:14a.m. ; Courtroom: 3A ; All parties appeared telephonically. The Court makes preliminary remarks and hears representation of counsel regarding settlement of this case. Parties advise the Court that they are in the process of finalizing needed paperwork. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EMG) |
||
Wednesday, October 04, 2023 | ||
minord
Minute Order Terminate Motion Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 10/04 10:54 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva on 10/4/2023. On September 7, 2023, Magistrate Judge Elayna Youchah conducted an Early Neutral Evaluation session between plaintiff Anna Milledge and defendants Roman Catholic Diocese of Las Vegas, and St. Joseph Husband of Mary Parish. ECF No. 26. On the second day of discussions, Judge Youchah issued the minutes of proceedings, which indicate that the parties reached a settlement. Id. In light of this, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the defendants' motion to dismiss (ECF No. 11 ) is DENIED without prejudice as moot. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JLB) |
||
Friday, September 08, 2023 | ||
minutes
Early Neutral Evaluation
Fri 09/08 3:18 PM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Early Neutral Evaluation session held on 9/7/2023 before Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. Pla Counsel: Brett Schwarts, Plaintiff Anna Milledge ; Def Counsel: Jerrel Berrios, Anne Levin, Defendant Representatives Judith Kohl, Lisa Stewart, Rick Gianficaro ; Time of Hearing: 9:00 a.m. ; An Early Neutral Evaluation was conducted before Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah commencing at 9:00 a.m. on September 7, 2023. Initial discussions concluded at approximately 12:45 p.m. Discussions continued and settlement was reached on September 8, 2023 at 3 p.m. The terms of the settlement are confidential. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a telephonic status hearing with counsel is scheduled for October 30, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. If dismissal papers are lodged with the Court by or before this date, the telephonic status hearing will be automatically vacated. The Parties are instructed to call the Audio Conference Line at (888) 251-2909, access code 7771745 , five (5) minutes prior to the hearing time. Please remain on the line until such time as the Court joins the call and convenes the proceedings. The use of a cell phone or speaker phone during the call is prohibited. The call must be made using a land line. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES) |
||
Tuesday, September 05, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Tue 09/05 9:34 AM
ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Stipulation and Order Regarding Remote Appearance at Early Neutral Evaluation (ECF No.24 ) is GRANTED . IT IS FURTHER HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' counsel must bring to the ENE a computer with the necessary programming or application to allow counsel to connect by zoom or other video conference platform with its insurance representative for the entirety of the ENE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 9/5/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Stipulation
Thu 08/31 4:23 PM
STIPULATION and Order Regarding Remote Appearance at Early Neutral Evaluation by Defendants Roman Catholic Diocese of Las Vegas, St. Joseph Husband of Mary Parish. (Berrios, Jerrell) (other) (presiding) |
|
23 | 23
notice
Notice Appearance of Counsel
Thu 08/31 3:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christina Mundy on behalf of Plaintiff Anna Milledge. Notice of Appearance of Brett J. Schwartz, Esq. (Mundy, Christina) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2023 | ||
minord
Minute Order Order on Stipulation Order Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Session
Wed 08/23 10:54 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 8/23/2023. By Judicial Assistant: E. Santiago. Before the Court is the Stipulation and Order to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation Session (ECF No. 21 ). The parties seek to continue the Early Neutral Evaluation ("ENE") due to a medical emergency arising for Plaintiff's counsel. Good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Stipulation and Order to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation Session (ECF No. 21 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the ENE currently scheduled for August 29, 2023 is VACATED and is rescheduled to September 7, 2023 . Plaintiff must report to the chambers of the undersigned United States Magistrate Judge at 9:00 a.m. Defendant must report to the chambers of the undersigned at 9:30 a.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the confidential ENE briefs shall be due in chambers on August 31, 2023 . Delivery shall be made electronically to Emily_Santiago@nvd.uscourts.gov. Except as stated herein, the prior terms of the Order (ECF No. 17 ) issued on June 1, 2023 remain in full force and effect. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES) |
||
Tuesday, August 22, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Stipulation
Tue 08/22 5:06 PM
STIPULATION TO CONTINUE (First Request) by Plaintiff Anna Milledge. (Martinez, Jason) (continue) (ene) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
6
pgs
order
Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order
Thu 06/15 10:53 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER Granting18 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 10/17/2023. Motions due by 11/16/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/18/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 6/15/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) |
|
notice
Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge
Thu 06/15 10:54 AM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (JQC) |
||
Wednesday, June 14, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order
Wed 06/14 11:40 AM
Proposed Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Anna Milledge.. (Mundy, Christina) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
3
pgs
order
Order
Thu 06/01 11:38 AM
ORDER Early Neutral Evaluation set for 8/29/2023 at 09:00 AM in Room 4068 before Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 6/1/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Reply
Fri 05/26 1:08 PM
REPLY to Response to11 Motion to Dismiss,, by Defendants Roman Catholic Diocese of Las Vegas, St. Joseph Husband of Mary Parish. (Miltenberger, Christopher) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Response
Fri 05/19 3:01 PM
RESPONSE to11 Motion to Dismiss,, by Plaintiff Anna Milledge. Replies due by 5/26/2023. (Mundy, Christina) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings (non motion deadlines)
Tue 05/02 9:49 AM
ORDER Granting13 Stipulation to extend deadline to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss. Responses due by 5/19/2023. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 5/1/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Stipulation
Mon 05/01 4:15 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re11 Motion to Dismiss,, by Plaintiff Anna Milledge. (Mundy, Christina) (extend) (sumjgm) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Wed 04/26 4:22 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Roman Catholic Diocese of Las Vegas, St. Joseph Husband of Mary Parish. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Miltenberger, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Motion Dismiss
Thu 04/20 5:37 PM
MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint,, by Defendants Roman Catholic Diocese of Las Vegas, St. Joseph Husband of Mary Parish. Responses due by 5/4/2023. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/30/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 6/4/2023. (Miltenberger, Christopher) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Fri 04/07 1:08 PM
ORDER Granting9 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Answer1 Complaint. Roman Catholic Diocese of Las Vegas answer due 4/20/2023; St. Joseph Husband of Mary Parish answer due 4/20/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 4/7/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Stipulation
Thu 04/06 2:39 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) [and Order] to Extend Deadline to Respond to re1 Complaint,, by Defendant Roman Catholic Diocese of Las Vegas. (Berrios, Jerrell) (extend) (answer) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Affidavit
Mon 03/27 10:17 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Roman Catholic Diocese of Las Vegas re4 Summons Issued by Plaintiff Anna Milledge.. (Mundy, Christina) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Affidavit
Mon 03/27 10:15 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of St. Joseph Husband of Mary Parish re4 Summons Issued by Plaintiff Anna Milledge.. (Mundy, Christina) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Wed 03/15 4:19 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Anna Milledge. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Mundy, Christina) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/13 6:35 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Roman Catholic Diocese of Las Vegas, St. Joseph Husband of Mary Parish re1 Complaint. (KF) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
misc
QC Notice
Mon 03/13 11:23 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). Attorney Christina Mamer aka Christina Mundy is required to update her contact information in the court's electronic filing system. Please visit the PACER website www.pacer.gov to complete the registration. Ad Hoc: cmundy@messner.com (no image attached) (DRS) |
||
Friday, March 10, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
9
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/10 9:39 PM
COMPLAINT against Roman Catholic Diocese of Las Vegas, St. Joseph Husband of Mary Parish (Filing fee $402 receipt number BNVDC-7233112) by Anna Milledge. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/20/2023. Proof of service due by 6/8/2023. (Mamer, Christina) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Right to Sue Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Roman Catholic Diocese of Las Vegas, | ||
Att: 4 Summons St. Joseph Husband of Mary Parish | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Mon 03/13 6:32 AM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (KF) |
||
notice
ENE Notice
Mon 03/13 6:33 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (KF) |
||
order
Standing Order
Mon 03/13 6:33 AM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva. Judge Silva's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) |