Adam Ghadiri v. Main Auto Care Inc et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Fred W Slaughter |
Referred: | Autumn D Spaeth |
Case #: | 8:23-cv-00446 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 11, 2023 |
Terminated: | May 03, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2023 3:10 AM PDT |
Defendant
Anny Bitar
|
|
Defendant
Bitar Gary TR
|
|
Defendant
Main Auto Care Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Adam Ghadiri
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 17, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Wed 05/17 10:37 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Adam Ghadiri. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Bakhos, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
order
Dismissing Case
Wed 05/03 12:58 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION ON NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The Court, having been notified by a Notice of Settlement13 that the case settled, hereby orders this action dismissed without prejudice. The Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case vacated and taken off calendar. The Court retains jurisdiction for thirty (30) days to vacate this order and to reopen the action upon showing of good cause that the settlement has not been completed. Any outstanding Orders to Show Cause are discharged. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Settlement
Tue 05/02 1:48 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by plaintiff Adam Ghadiri. (Bakhos, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines
Tue 03/28 4:53 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S STATE LAW CLAIM11 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. Before the court is Plaintiff Adam Ghadiri's (Plaintiff) Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause why the court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's state law claims . (Dkt.11 .) Thus, the court concludes that this case presents exceptional circumstances and that compelling reasons warrant declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's claims brought under state law. Accordingly, the court DISMISSES Plaintiff's state law claims WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to any action filed in state court. (lom) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Response
Thu 03/23 1:48 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Adam Ghadirito Order to Show Cause,9 (Bakhos, Joseph) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 03/17 10:38 AM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Thu 03/16 1:30 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: the court ORDERS Plaintiff to show cause in writing why this court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim and any other state law claim asserted in the Complaint on or before March 23, 2023, at 5:00 p.m. [See document for further information.] (es) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 5:27 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Anny Bitar, Bitar Gary TR, Main Auto Care Inc. (car) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Tue 03/14 5:25 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/14 5:25 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/14 5:24 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fred W. Slaughter and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (car) |
|
Saturday, March 11, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Sat 03/11 5:52 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Adam Ghadiri.(Bakhos, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 As to Main Auto, | ||
Att: 2 As to Gary Bitar Trust | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Sat 03/11 5:51 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Adam Ghadiri, identifying MAIN AUTO CARE INC, a corporation; ANNY BITAR, an individual; BITAR GARY TR, a trust. (Bakhos, Joseph) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Sat 03/11 5:50 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Adam Ghadiri. (Bakhos, Joseph) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Sat 03/11 5:50 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34939723 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Adam Ghadiri. (Attorney Joseph Bakhos added to party Adam Ghadiri(pty:pla))(Bakhos, Joseph) |