Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 104.32.161.120
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Terry J Hatter, Jr |
Referred: | Sheri Pym |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01838 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2023 |
Terminated: | Aug 22, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2023 2:36 AM PDT |
Defendant
John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 104.32.161.120
|
|
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, August 22, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121)
Tue 08/22 2:22 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (shb) |
|
Att: 1 Ntc Vol Dism | ||
Monday, August 21, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Mon 08/21 9:20 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Fri 08/18 3:44 PM
Second NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File within which to effectuate service on defendant filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 9/18/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in support of motion to extend time to serve defendant, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, July 14, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
order
Extension of Time to File
Mon 07/17 12:41 PM
ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE ON JOHN DOE DEFENDANT12 by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: ORDER AND ADJUDGE: Plaintiffs motion is granted. Plaintiff shall have until August 18, 2023 to effectuate service of a summons and Complaint on Defendant. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Fri 06/02 4:47 PM
First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File within which to effectuate service on defendant filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 7/10/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in support of motion to extend time to serve defendant, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 30, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
order
Leave re Discovery Matter
Fri 03/31 7:34 AM
ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym: Granting10 Ex Parte Application for Leave. Plaintiff may immediately serve a Rule 45 subpoena on Spectrum to obtain the Doe defendant's true name and address. The subpoena must include a copy of this order. [See Order for further details.] (et) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Leave re Discovery Matter
Mon 03/27 4:49 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A-D Declarations in Support, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
order
Transferring Case purs GO 21-01 (Related Case)(CV-34)
Tue 03/14 4:40 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:18-cv-00787 TJH(SPx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner and Judge Stephen V. Wilson to Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-01838 TJH(SPx). Signed by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr (rn) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Mon 03/13 5:42 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/13 5:42 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/13 5:41 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (car) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121)
Mon 03/13 1:04 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/13 1:03 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying General Media Systems, LLC as Corporate Parent. (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/13 1:02 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC, identifying General Media Systems, LLC (Corporate Parent) and John Doe (Defendant). (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/13 1:01 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/13 1:01 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34944071 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attorney Lincoln D Bandlow added to party Strike 3 Holdings, LLC(pty:pla))(Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |