Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 70.95.245.85
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Terry J Hatter, Jr |
Referred: | Sheri Pym |
Case #: | 8:23-cv-00449 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jun 13, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2023 3:17 AM PDT |
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Tuesday, June 13, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121)
Tue 06/13 4:58 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (shb) |
|
Att: 1 Ntc Vol Dism | ||
Monday, June 12, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Mon 06/12 1:47 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
order
Leave re Discovery Matter
Fri 03/31 7:13 AM
ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym: Granting10 Ex Parte Application for Leave. Plaintiff may immediately serve a Rule 45 subpoena on Spectrum to obtain the Doe defendant's true name and address. The subpoena must include a copy of this order. [See Order for further details.] (et) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Leave re Discovery Matter
Mon 03/27 5:52 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A-D Declarations in Support, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
order
Transferring Case purs GO 21-01 (Related Case)(CV-34)
Fri 03/17 2:16 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:18-cv-00787 TJH(SPx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge John D. Early and Judge Fred W. Slaughter to Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:23-cv-00449 TJH(SPx). Signed by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr (rn) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Tue 03/14 3:28 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/14 3:28 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/14 3:27 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fred W. Slaughter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (lh) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121)
Mon 03/13 7:51 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/13 7:50 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying General Media Systems, LLC as Corporate Parent. (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/13 7:49 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC, identifying General Media Systems, LLC (Corporate Parent) and John Doe (Defendant). (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/13 7:49 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/13 7:48 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34948489 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attorney Lincoln D Bandlow added to party Strike 3 Holdings, LLC(pty:pla))(Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |