Mohammad Reza Oskounejad v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Consuelo B Marshall |
Referred: | A Joel Richlin |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01853 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2023 2:25 AM PDT |
Defendant
Ted H. Kim
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Los Angeles Asylum Office
PO BOX 65015
Anaheim, CA 92815 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
David Radel
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ur M Jaddou
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Department of Homeland Security
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mohammad Reza Oskounejad
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Salar Oskounejad
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Seyedeh Nasim Ziya
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
transfer
Reassignment of Case Due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer (MJ) (G-74) - optional html form
Wed 03/13 3:24 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer filed. The previously assigned Magistrate Judge is no longer available. Pursuant to directive of the Chief Magistrate Judge and in accordance with the rules of this Court, the case has been returned to the Clerk for reassignment. This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin for any discovery and/or post-judgment matters that may be referred. Case number will now read as 2:23-cv-01853-CBM-AJRx. (cbr) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Thu 09/07 11:23 AM
RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY CASE PENDING ADJUDICATION OF ASYLUM APPLICATION21 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the instant action shall be stayed until November 29, 2024. (lom) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
stip
Stay Case
Thu 08/31 3:29 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending adjudication of asylum application filed by defendants United States Department of Homeland Security.(Attorney Siu P. Wong added to party United States Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft))(Wong, Siu) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, July 31, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 08/02 3:46 PM
ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING SERVICE OF COMPLAINT AND SUMMONS ON DEFENDANTS19 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Defendants and each of them are deemed served on July 5, 2023. It is further ordered that Defendants response(s) to the Complaint shall be due on September 5, 2023. (shb) |
|
19 | 19
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Mon 07/31 1:34 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 09/05/2023 filed by Plaintiffs Mohammad Reza Oskounejad, Salar Oskounejad, Seyedeh Nasim Ziya.(Meserkhani, Seroj) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, July 25, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Order to Show Cause
Wed 07/26 3:29 PM
IN CHAMBERS - Order To Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: The court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before AUGUST 20, 2023 why this action should not bedismissed for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiff(s), the Court will consider the filing of one of the following, as anappropriate response to this Order To Show Cause, on or before the above date, as evidence that the matter is being prosecuted diligently: An answer by the following defendant(s): In cases removed from State Court, responsive pleadings filed by all defendants; Plaintiff's application for entry of default pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; Plaintiff's request that the clerk enter default judgment or plaintiff's noticed motion for entry of default judgment pursuant to Rule 55b of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.This action will be dismissed if the above mentioned documents are not filed by the date indicated above. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See order for more information.) (shb) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Fri 07/21 9:20 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Oil Appellate counsel for Defendants Ur M Jaddou, Ted H. Kim, Los Angeles Asylum Office, Alejandro Mayorkas, David Radel, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. Filed by Defendants DHS, et al. (Attorney Oil Appellate added to party Ur M Jaddou(pty:dft), Attorney Oil Appellate added to party Ted H. Kim(pty:dft), Attorney Oil Appellate added to party Los Angeles Asylum Office(pty:dft), Attorney Oil Appellate added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft), Attorney Oil Appellate added to party David Radel(pty:dft), Attorney Oil Appellate added to party United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (pty:dft), Attorney Oil Appellate added to party United States Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft))(Appellate, Oil) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Mon 07/10 9:23 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Mohammad Reza Oskounejad, Salar Oskounejad, Seyedeh Nasim Ziya, served on 07/05/2023.(Meserkhani, Seroj) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Proof of service | ||
Wednesday, May 24, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
service
Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA
Wed 05/24 8:48 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Salar Oskounejad, Mohammad Reza Oskounejad, Seyedeh Nasim Ziya, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Front Desk. The Attorney Generals Office of the United States was NOT served. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Front Desk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached.(Meserkhani, Seroj) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Amended Proof of Service, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement Amended Proof of Service, | ||
Att: 3 Supplement Amended Proof of Service, | ||
Att: 4 Supplement Amended Proof of Service, | ||
Att: 5 Supplement Amended Proof of Service, | ||
Att: 6 Supplement Amended Proof of Service | ||
Tuesday, May 02, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
service
Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA
Tue 05/02 10:26 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Salar Oskounejad, Mohammad Reza Oskounejad, Seyedeh Nasim Ziya, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Front Desk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Front Desk. The officer agency or corporation was NOT served. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached.(Meserkhani, Seroj) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Proof of service, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement Proof of service, | ||
Att: 3 Supplement Proof of service, | ||
Att: 4 Supplement Proof of service, | ||
Att: 5 Supplement Proof of service, | ||
Att: 6 Supplement Proof of service | ||
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 03/14 3:25 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall.READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (See order for details.) (ys) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Tue 03/14 12:23 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet, 2 Notice of Interested parties, 3 Summons, 4 Summons, 5 Summons, 6 Summons, 7 Summons, 8 Summons, 9 Summons are attached to the Complaint. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap) |
|
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 12:17 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Ted H. Kim. (ghap) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 12:16 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Alejandro Mayorkas. (ghap) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 12:15 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant David Radel. (ghap) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 12:14 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Los Angeles Asylum Office. (ghap) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 12:13 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Ur M Jaddou. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 12:12 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (ghap) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 12:09 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant United States Department of Homeland Security. (ghap) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Tue 03/14 11:25 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) |
|
3 | 3
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/14 11:24 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/14 11:24 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (ghap) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/13 1:08 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34943979 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Mohammad Reza Oskounejad. (Attorney Seroj Meserkhani added to party Mohammad Reza Oskounejad(pty:pla))(Meserkhani, Seroj) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Interested parties, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Summons, | ||
Att: 9 Summons |