Beerpartners.LV, LLC v. The Shoppes at the Palazzo, LLC
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Gloria M Navarro |
Referred: | Brenda Weksler |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00387 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2023 |
Terminated: | Feb 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2023 2:26 AM PDT |
Defendant
The Shoppes at the Palazzo, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Beerpartners.LV, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, February 09, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation Order Dismissing Case
Fri 02/09 10:09 AM
ORDER Granting19 Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice. This action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/9/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ) |
|
Friday, February 02, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Stipulation
Fri 02/02 3:57 PM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL with Prejudice by Defendant The Shoppes at the Palazzo, LLC. (Daniels, Ryan) (dismissal) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
4
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Thu 11/16 9:45 AM
ORDER Granting17 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines (First Request) re13 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 2/5/2024. Motions due by 3/6/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/5/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/15/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Stipulation
Tue 11/14 3:29 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines (First Request) re13 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order, by Plaintiff Beerpartners.LV, LLC. (Edwards, F.) (extend) (discovery) |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Tue 10/03 5:05 PM
ANSWER to8 Amended Complaint filed by The Shoppes at the Palazzo, LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/13/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/17/2023.(Daniels, Ryan) |
|
Tuesday, September 12, 2023 | ||
minord
Minute Order Order on Motion to Dismiss
Tue 09/12 12:02 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/12/2023. Pending before the Court is the 6 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Defendant The Shoppes at Palazzo, LLC ("Defendant") on June 9, 2023. On June 22, 2023, Plaintiff Beerpartners.LV, LLC ("Plaintiff") filed the 8 First Amended Complaint. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P 15(a)(1)(b), Plaintiff amended their Complaint as a matter of course within "21 days after service of a motion under Rule 12(b)." Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the 6 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot . Defendant may file a new Motion to Dismiss by October 3, 2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CMD) |
||
Friday, July 14, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
4
pgs
order
Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order
Fri 07/14 1:43 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER Granting12 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 12/6/2023. Motions due by 1/5/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/5/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/14/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) |
|
notice
Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge
Fri 07/14 1:44 PM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (JQC) |
||
Thursday, July 13, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order
Thu 07/13 10:03 AM
Joint Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Beerpartners.LV, LLC.. (Edwards, F.) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Fri 06/30 3:54 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by The Shoppes at the Palazzo, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Brookfield Corporation, Other Affiliate Grand Canal Shoppes Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate grand canal shoppes newco, llc, Other Affiliate GGPLP Real Estate LLC, Other Affiliate BPR Nimbus LLC, Other Affiliate BPR OP, LP, Other Affiliate BPR Real Estate Holding II LLC, Other Affiliate BPR Real Estate Holding I, LLC, Other Affiliate Brookfield Properties Retail Holding LLC, Other Affiliate Brookfield Property Partners LP for The Shoppes at the Palazzo, LLC added.. (Daniels, Ryan) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2023 | ||
minord
Minute Order Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time
Thu 06/29 5:59 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/29/2023. Pending before the Court is Defendant The Shoppes at the Palazzo's 7 Motion to Extend the Deadline for Filing FRCP 7.1 Disclosure Statement. Plaintiff BeerPartners LV did not file a response, and the deadline to do so has passed. "The failure of an opposing party to file points and authorities in response to any motion, except a motion under Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 or a motion for attorney's fees, constitutes a consent to the granting of the motion." D. Nev. LR 7-2(d). Accordingly, the Court GRANTS the 7 Motion as unopposed. Defendant shall have until June 30, 2023, to file its required disclosure pursuant to FRCP 7.1. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CMD) |
||
Thursday, June 22, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
respm
Response
Thu 06/22 3:02 PM
RESPONSE to6 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Beerpartners.LV, LLC. Replies due by 6/29/2023. (Edwards, F.) |
|
8 | 8
cmp
Complaint Amended
Thu 06/22 2:35 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Shoppes at the Palazzo, LLC by Beerpartners.LV, LLC. No changes to parties. (Edwards, F.) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Motion Extend/Shorten Time
Thu 06/15 3:50 PM
MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) Filing FRCP 7.1 Disclosure Stmt re6 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant The Shoppes at the Palazzo, LLC. Responses due by 6/29/2023. (Daniels, Ryan) (amend) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Motion Dismiss
Fri 06/09 3:48 PM
MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint,, by Defendant The Shoppes at the Palazzo, LLC. Responses due by 6/23/2023. (Daniels, Ryan) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 05/30 2:07 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beerpartners.LV, LLC re1 Complaint,,. The Shoppes at the Palazzo, LLC served on 5/19/2023. (Lujan, Jessica) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Fri 03/17 9:49 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Beerpartners.LV, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent MCCHG LV Management, LLC, Corporate Parent HGI Social XXI, LLC, Corporate Parent M-M USA Investments, LLC, Other Affiliate Casola Family Trust, Other Affiliate Charles A. Pastron Trust, Other Affiliate Salvatore J. and Jennifer Cole Casola Revocable Family Trust, Other Affiliate Williamson Family Trust U/D/T, Other Affiliate Awan Family Trust, Other Affiliate Suria Kuning, Other Affiliate Jonathan Suriawijaya, Other Affiliate Nathaniel Suriawijaya for Beerpartners.LV, LLC added.. (Edwards, F.) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/13 1:28 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Shoppes at the Palazzo, LLC re1 Complaint. (TRW) |
|
2 | 2 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW) | |
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/13 12:32 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7233827) by Beerpartners.LV, LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/23/2023. Proof of service due by 6/11/2023. (Edwards, F.) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Mon 03/13 1:26 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (TRW) |
||
order
Standing Order
Mon 03/13 1:26 PM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW) |