Kimberly Frazier v. American Commercial Properties II, LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Rozella A Oliver |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01854 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2023 |
Terminated: | Aug 25, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2023 2:00 AM PDT |
Defendant
American Commercial Properties II, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly Frazier
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
American Commercial Propreties II LLC
Terminated: 06/21/2023
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, August 25, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Fri 08/25 5:41 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Frazier. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Kim, Jason) |
|
19 | 19
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Fri 08/25 3:35 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kimberly Frazier, upon Defendant American Commercial Properties II, LLC served on 8/25/2023, answer due 9/15/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon TOM HALLCOZAY, person authorized to receive documents, packages and mail for the party, in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Kim, Jason) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Financial Entry
Wed 08/23 9:28 AM
FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $300.00 from So Cal Equal Access Group, FOB Kimberly Frazier. Re: Order to Show Cause,16 . Receipt number 6601. (fa) |
|
Thursday, August 17, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 08/17 10:35 AM
Notice OF COMPLIANCE filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Frazier. (Kim, Jason) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 08/15 4:23 PM
MINUTES [In Chambers] ORDER TO SANCTIONING PLAINTIFF AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Plaintiff is SANCTIONED in the amount of $300 for failing to timely seek entry of default. Payment shall be made to the Clerk's Office within 7 days of this Order. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to show cause by August 25, 2023 why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The case will be dismissed if Plaintiff fails to timely respond. (rolm) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))
Wed 06/21 9:35 AM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Frazier pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to American Commercial Propreties II LLC. (Kim, Jason) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/27 10:00 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition12 as to Defendant American Commercial Properties II, LLC. (rolm) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Summons Request
Mon 04/24 11:03 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition12 filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Frazier. (Kim, Jason) |
|
12 | 12
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Mon 04/24 11:02 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant American Commercial Properties II, LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Frazier(Kim, Jason) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
adr
Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20)
Tue 03/14 12:25 PM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (dbe) |
|
10 | 10
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 03/14 12:25 PM
Order re Prosecution of Certain Cases upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (dbe) |
|
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 03/14 12:24 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (dbe) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 10:19 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant American Commercial Properties II, LLC. (et) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Tue 03/14 10:17 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/14 10:16 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/14 10:16 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (et) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/13 1:30 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Kimberly Frazier. (Kim, Jason) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/13 1:29 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/13 1:29 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Frazier. (Kim, Jason) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/13 1:28 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34944357 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Kimberly Frazier(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason) |