Robert Larry Hogan v. Kilolo Kijakazi
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Stephanie S Christensen |
Referred: | Rozella A Oliver |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01855 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 21, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
judgmentCV
Judgment
Thu 03/21 8:33 AM
JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (tsn) |
|
21 | 21
order
For Order re Discovery Matter
Thu 03/21 8:26 AM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen. IT IS ORDERED that Judgment shall be entered AFFIRMING the decision of the Commissioner. (tsn) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Reply
Mon 08/28 2:40 PM
REPLY filed by Plaintiff Robert Larry Hogan to Brief (non-motion non-appeal)11 / In Support of Opening Brief (Rohlfing, Lawrence) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Brief (non-motion non-appeal)
Mon 08/14 9:21 AM
BRIEF filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. regarding Brief (non-motion non-appeal)11 . (Smith, Susan) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Tue 07/11 2:33 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Geralyn A Gulseth counsel for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. Geralyn Gulseth is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Gulseth, Geralyn) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Tue 07/11 1:54 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sharon Lahey counsel for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. Adding Sharon Lahey as counsel of record for Commissioner of Social Security for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Attorney Sharon Lahey added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Lahey, Sharon) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA)
Fri 07/07 11:42 AM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Robert Larry Hogan. (Rohlfing, Lawrence) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
cs_rasgn
Chief Magistrate Judge Transferring Case (non-consent)
Thu 07/06 12:48 PM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF MAGISTRATE JUDGE - OCMJ# 23-066 by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF THE CALENDAR of Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen, this case is transferred from the calendar of Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver to the calendar of Magistrate Judge Stephanie S Christensen for all further proceedings authorized by statute, local rules and general orders. All documents subsequently filed shall bear this new case designation 2:23-cv-01855-SSC absent further order of the Court. (aco) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 06/30 9:10 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,12 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Defendant shall file her response to Plaintiff's Opening Brief on or before August 14, 2023. Plaintiff shall file any reply on or before August 28, 2023. (dml) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 06/28 1:53 PM
Notice of New Authority filed by Plaintiff Robert Larry Hogan. (Rohlfing, Lawrence) |
|
12 | 12
stip
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 06/28 12:46 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Brief (non-motion non-appeal)11 filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi.(Attorney Susan Leah Smith added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Smith, Susan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, June 14, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Brief (non-motion non-appeal)
Wed 06/14 3:27 PM
BRIEF filed by Plaintiff Robert Larry Hogan. (Rohlfing, Lawrence) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 05/15 12:14 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 AS LIMITED TO THE ELECTRONIC FILING AND SERVICE OF THE CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD OF ROBERT LARRY HOGAN (mj), PURSUANT TO SUPPLEMENTAL FEDERAL RULES FOR SOCIAL SECURITY REVIEW ACTIONS UNDER 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), RULE 4(b) filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi.(Gulseth, Geralyn) |
|
Att: 1 Certification Page, | ||
Att: 2 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 3 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, | ||
Att: 4 Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 5 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 6 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 7 Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 1, | ||
Att: 9 Medical Records Part 2, | ||
Att: 10 Medical Records Part 3, | ||
Att: 11 Medical Records Part 4, | ||
Att: 12 Medical Records Part 5, | ||
Att: 13 Medical Records Part 6, | ||
Att: 14 Medical Records Part 7, | ||
Att: 15 Medical Records Part 8, | ||
Att: 16 Medical Records Part 9, | ||
Att: 17 Medical Records Part 10, | ||
Att: 18 Medical Records Part 11 | ||
Thursday, April 06, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice from Clerk re Final Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge
Thu 04/06 9:04 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV23-1855 RAO on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only)
Wed 04/05 11:03 AM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attorney Geralyn A Gulseth added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Gulseth, Geralyn) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA)
Fri 03/24 8:48 AM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Robert Larry Hogan. (Rohlfing, Lawrence) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
order
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Thu 03/23 9:19 AM
ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Granting2 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Non-Prisoner Case). (twdb) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form
Tue 03/14 1:52 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (car) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/13 1:59 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Robert Larry Hogan, (Rohlfing, Lawrence) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/13 1:58 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Robert Larry Hogan. (Rohlfing, Lawrence) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Mon 03/13 1:57 PM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Robert Larry Hogan. (Rohlfing, Lawrence) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/13 1:54 PM
COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Robert Larry Hogan. (Attorney Lawrence D Rohlfing added to party Robert Larry Hogan(pty:pla))(Rohlfing, Lawrence) |