Latanya Williams v. James F. Hundshamer et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Hernan D Vera |
Referred: | Patricia Donahue |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01858 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jul 06, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2023 2:57 AM PDT |
Defendant
James F. Hundshamer
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Latanya Williams
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, July 06, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Thu 07/06 3:04 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Latanya Williams. (Kim, Jason) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
3
pgs
order
Order
Fri 06/23 12:10 PM
REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Hernan D. Vera: Please refer to Order for complete details. (cbr) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
cs_rasgn
Chief District Judge Transferring Case
Tue 06/20 3:21 PM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#OCJ 23-078) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Hernan D. Vera, this case is transferred from Judge John F. Walter to the calendar of Judge Hernan D. Vera for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-01858-HDV-PDx. (sn) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Declaration
Wed 03/22 3:59 PM
DECLARATION of JASON J. KIM re: Lead Trial Counsel filed by Plaintiff Latanya Williams. (Kim, Jason) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 03/14 9:46 AM
STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/13 5:45 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant James F. Hundshamer. (car) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Mon 03/13 5:45 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/13 5:44 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/13 5:44 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (car) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/13 2:17 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Latanya Williams. (Kim, Jason) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/13 2:17 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/13 2:17 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Latanya Williams. (Kim, Jason) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/13 2:16 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34944887 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Latanya Williams(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason) |