Michael Wayne Gordon v. Kilolo Kijakazi
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Christina A Snyder |
Referred: | Brianna Fuller Mircheff |
Case #: | 5:23-cv-00433 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2023 |
Terminated: | May 12, 2023 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, June 09, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
order
Awarding EAJA Fees
Fri 06/09 1:49 PM
ORDER AWARDING EAJA FEES by Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. Fees awarded to Plaintiff in the amount of $1,412.00 and zero costs, subject to the terms of the stipulation. Re: Stipulation for Award of EAJA Fees,13 (es) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
stip
Award of EAJA Fees
Thu 06/08 5:45 PM
First STIPULATION FOR AWARD of EAJA Fees in the amount of $1,412.. Re: Judgment,12 filed by plaintiff Michael Wayne Gordon.(Attorney Jessica Elizabeth Warren added to party Michael Wayne Gordon(pty:pla))(Warren, Jessica) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
Friday, May 12, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
judgmentCV
Judgment
Tue 05/16 9:52 AM
JUDGMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder, Related to: Order,11 , Stipulation to Remand Case to US Agency10 . The Court having approved the parties' stipulation to remand this case pursuant to Sentence 4 of 42 U.S.C. section 405(g) for further proceedings consistent with that stipulation and for entry of judgment for Plaintiff, judgment is hereby entered for Plaintiff. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (es) |
|
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 05/16 9:40 AM
ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder, re Stipulation to Remand Case to US Agency10 . IT IS ORDERED that the above-captioned action is remanded to the Commissioner of Social Security for further proceedings consistent with the terms of the Stipulation for Remand. (es) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
stip
Remand Case to US Agency
Thu 05/11 12:46 PM
STIPULATION to Remand Case to US Agency Social Security Administration filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi.(Tarn, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Judgment | ||
Tuesday, April 25, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only)
Tue 04/25 12:28 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Tarn, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
cs_rasgn
Chief Magistrate Judge Transferring Case (non-consent)
Fri 04/21 9:14 AM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF MAGISTRATE JUDGE - OCMJ# 23-022 by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Magistrate Judge Brianna F. Mircheff, this case is transferred from the calendar of Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo to the calendar of Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff for all further proceedings authorized by statute, local rules and general orders. All documents subsequently filed shall bear this new case designation 5:23-cv-00433 CAS(BFM) absent further order of the Court. (rn) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only)
Wed 04/05 3:27 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attorney Jennifer Lee Tarn added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Tarn, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
order
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Fri 03/31 4:19 PM
ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Granting4 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Non-Prisoner Case). (gk) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 9:01 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and referred to Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (ghap) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Mon 03/13 2:49 PM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Michael Wayne Gordon. (Panutich, Alex) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/13 2:42 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Michael Wayne Gordon, (Panutich, Alex) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/13 2:37 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Michael Wayne Gordon. (Panutich, Alex) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/13 2:21 PM
COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Michael Wayne Gordon. (Attorney Alex Panutich added to party Michael Wayne Gordon(pty:pla))(Panutich, Alex) |