Irene Gonzalez v. Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpo |
Referred: | Steve Kim |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01866 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Los Angeles Superior Court, 23PSCV00220 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2023 2:45 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Roes
|
|
Plaintiff
Irene Gonzalez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
3
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Mon 03/25 8:16 AM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO AMEND CIVIL TRIAL ORDER [ECF NO.24 ] by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Having considered the request of the parties for an order to amend the existing Civil Trial Order, and good cause appearing, the parties joint stipulation is granted. The Civil Trial Order [Dkt. 23] is amended as follows: The final pretrial conference is set for 4/23/2025 at 9:00 AM. The jury trial is set for 5/12/2025 at 8:30 AM. The last date to hear motion to amend pleadings or add parties is September 12, 2025. (See document for further details) (yl) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
order
Protective Order
Wed 03/20 4:12 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim re Stipulation for Protective Order27 . (see document for details) (hr) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Tue 03/19 1:51 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: Stipulation for Protective Order27 . The following error(s) was/were found: Judge Kim requires a redline version in Microsoft Word format to be emailed to Chambers. The parties are directed to provide the required redline as soon as possible. Further details regarding Judge Kim's procedures can be found here: http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-steve-kim. (hr) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
stip
Protective Order
Mon 03/18 3:12 PM
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc..(Granata, Valeria) |
|
Thursday, March 14, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
order
Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106)
Thu 03/14 4:48 PM
ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. The following document is STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Court's Case Management Order: Stipulation for Protective Order25 , for the following reasons: Judge Frimpong refers all discovery matters to the assigned Magistrate Judge. The parties are to re-file the stipulation for protective order in compliance with Judge Kim's procedures. Please refer to: http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-steve-kim. (hr) |
|
Wednesday, March 13, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
stip
Protective Order
Wed 03/13 4:59 PM
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc..(Granata, Valeria) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Protective Order | ||
24 | 24
5
pgs
stip
Order
Wed 03/13 4:43 PM
STIPULATION for Order Amend Scheduling Order filed by Defendant Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc..(Granata, Valeria) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Scheduling Order | ||
Saturday, September 23, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Sat 09/23 1:25 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court takes the Scheduling Conference off calendar, with no appearances necessary on September 28, 2023. The Court will issue the Scheduling Order based solely on the parties filings pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b). IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
19
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Hearings
Mon 09/25 4:50 PM
CIVIL TRIAL ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 11/13/2024 at 9:00 AM. The Jury Trial is set for 12/2/2024 at 8:30 AM. The last date to file motions is due by 8/22/2024.The last date to conduct settlement conference is 9/4/2024. Stipulations extending dates set by the Court are not effective unless approved by the Court, and without compelling factual support and a showing of due diligence, stipulations continuing dates set by the Court will be denied. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details) (yl) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Fri 09/15 8:32 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7 to 10 Days, filed by Plaintiff Irene Gonzalez.. (Novak, Sean) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Tue 08/01 9:43 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Scheduling Conference set for 9/28/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (kd) |
|
19 | 19
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 08/01 11:53 AM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition18 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc..(Granata, Valeria) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Wed 07/19 4:12 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Amended Complaint,, Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiff Irene Gonzalez(Novak, Sean) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
order
Dismiss
Mon 06/26 5:20 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS AND DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE [ECF NO. 8] by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. For the foregoing reasons, the Court hereby ORDERS as follows: GEA's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND Counts 4 and 5; GEA's Motion to Strike is DENIED as MOOT; and Gonzalez is ORDERED to file a First Amended Complaint within twenty-eight (28) days of the date of this Order if she still desires to pursue any of the claims being dismissed with leave to amend. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details) (yl) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 06/22 12:20 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. For good cause, this Court adopts its June 22, 2023 tentative ruling on GEA's Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike as the Order of the Court, and takes the hearing scheduled on June 22, 2023 at 1:30 p.m. off-calendar. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) |
|
15 | 15
respm
Motion Related Document
Thu 06/22 11:30 AM
[PROPOSED] ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION REQUESTING TO TAKE THE HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS OFF-CALENDAR re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Irene Gonzalez's fourth cause of action for "Gross Negligence/Reckless Misconduct/Violations of Civil Code Section 1714," pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. Rule 12(b)(6), for failure to sta8 filed by Defendant Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc.. (Granata, Valeria) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 06/21 9:47 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court hereby re-sets the time of the Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fourth Cause of Action for "Gross Negligence/Reckless Misconduct/Violations of Civil Code Section 1714," pursuant to FRCvP Rule 12(b)(6), for Failure to State a Claim upon which Relief May Be Granted filed by Defendant8 to 1:30 PM on 06/22/2023. The Court, having considered Defendant's Request [ECF No.13 ] and finding good cause therefor, hereby GRANTS the Request and ORDERS Defendant is permitted to appear via Zoom at the hearing set on June 22, 2023, at 1:30 p.m. The Zoom link is found on the Court's website: https://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-maame-ewusi-mensah-frimpong.Prior to the hearing, the parties must consult the Guidelines for Zoom Courtroom Proceedings found on the Court's website. Failure to comply with the Guidelines may result in future requests for Zoom appearances being denied. If Plaintiff also wishes to appear via Zoom, the Court requests that they provide email notice prior to the hearing at MEMF_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov, by no later than June 21, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Miscellaneous Document
Fri 06/16 5:39 PM
Request for Zoom Appearance at Hearing of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss re: Text Only Scheduling Notice,,, 9 (Granata, Valeria) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Wed 04/05 3:27 PM
REPLY in support of Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Irene Gonzalez's fourth cause of action for "Gross Negligence/Reckless Misconduct/Violations of Civil Code Section 1714," pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. Rule 12(b)(6), for failure to sta8 filed by Defendant Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc.. (Granata, Valeria) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Mon 04/03 4:56 PM
OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF IRENE GONZALEZS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT HAIER US APPLIANCE SOLUTIONS, INC.S MOTION TO DIMISS; DECLARATION OF FARBOD YOUMTOBIAN re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Irene Gonzalez's fourth cause of action for "Gross Negligence/Reckless Misconduct/Violations of Civil Code Section 1714," pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. Rule 12(b)(6), for failure to sta8 filed by Plaintiff Irene Gonzalez. (Novak, Sean) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Mon 03/27 4:58 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: This matter has been assigned to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's website under Judge Frimpong's Procedures and Schedules. Please read the Standing Order carefully. It is the responsibilities of the parties to maintain familiarly with the Standing Order and any future amendments that the Court may issue by periodically checking the Courts website for the operative version of the Standing Order. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 03/21 4:26 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong: The moving party has filed a motion for a date that has been closed by this Court. The Court hereby continues the Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Irene Gonzalez's Fourth Cause of Action for "Gross Negligence/Reckless Misconduct/Violations of Civil Code Section 1714," pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(b)(6), for Failure to State a Claim upon which Relief May Be Granted filed by Defendant Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc.8 06/22/2023, at 10:00 am. Counsel shall take notice of this new date. Closed motion dates can be found on the Court's website at http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-maame-ewusi-mensah-frimpong. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss (cause or other)
Mon 03/20 3:14 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Irene Gonzalez's fourth cause of action for "Gross Negligence/Reckless Misconduct/Violations of Civil Code Section 1714," pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. Rule 12(b)(6), for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted filed by Defendant Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/20/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (Granata, Valeria) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss and to Strike Pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rule 12 Filed by Defendant Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc. dba GE Appliances | ||
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Tue 03/14 2:45 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/14 2:44 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/14 2:44 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (car) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Mon 03/13 7:16 PM
DECLARATION OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc. DBA GE Appliances, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 served on 03/13/2023. (Granata, Valeria) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/13 5:23 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc. DBA GE Appliances (Granata, Valeria) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/13 5:22 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc. DBA GE Appliances. (Granata, Valeria) |
|
1 | 1
9
pgs
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/13 5:21 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court of California, case number 22AHCV01034 Receipt No: ACACDC-34947845 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc. DBA GE Appliances. (Attorney Valeria Granata added to party Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc. DBA GE Appliances(pty:dft))(Granata, Valeria) |
|
Att: 1 18 pgs Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Tue 03/14 3:02 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 to 99, General Electric, Roes 1 to 99, inclusive. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Irene Gonzalez. Filed in State Court on 1/25/2023 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal1 (car) |
||
othcmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 03/14 4:19 PM
NON-CONFORMED COPY OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT against Defendant Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc. amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiff Irene Gonzalez. Upon the filing of the complaint, the plaintiff, being ignorant of the true name of the defendant and having designated the defendant in the complaint by the fictitious name of: Doe 1 and having discovered the true name of the defendant to be: Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc. d/b/a GE Appliances. Submitted with Attachment 4 to Notice of Removal1 (car) |