Fahimeh Robatian et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Cormac J Carney |
Referred: | Autumn D Spaeth |
Case #: | 8:23-cv-00457 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2023 |
Terminated: | May 04, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2023 2:44 AM PDT |
Defendant
Matthew D. Emrich
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ur M. Jaddou
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ted H. Kim
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Los Angeles Asylum Office
PO BOX 65015
Anaheim, CA 92815 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David Radel
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Department of Homeland Security
United States Attorney's Office 300 N. Los Angeles Street 7th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90012 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Christopher A. Wray
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arshia Nazerani Houshmand
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fahimeh Robatian
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, February 01, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Thu 02/01 12:33 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Arshia Nazerani Houshmand, Fahimeh Robatian. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Khatib, Salah) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2023 | ||
35 | 35
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Thu 05/04 2:30 PM
ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney, Granting Joint Stipulation to Stay Case Pending Adjudication of Application34 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the instant action shall be stayed until 2/27/24. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (twdb) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2023 | ||
34 | 34
stip
Stay Case
Wed 05/03 4:39 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Adjudication of Application filed by Adjudication of Application Matthew D. Emrich, Ur M. Jaddou, Ted H. Kim, Los Angeles Asylum Office, Alejandro Mayorkas, David Radel, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, Christopher A. Wray.(Attorney Joanne I. Osinoff added to party Matthew D. Emrich(pty:dft), Attorney Joanne I. Osinoff added to party Ur M. Jaddou(pty:dft), Attorney Joanne I. Osinoff added to party Ted H. Kim(pty:dft), Attorney Joanne I. Osinoff added to party Los Angeles Asylum Office(pty:dft), Attorney Joanne I. Osinoff added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft), Attorney Joanne I. Osinoff added to party David Radel(pty:dft), Attorney Joanne I. Osinoff added to party United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Joanne I. Osinoff added to party United States Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Joanne I. Osinoff added to party Christopher A. Wray(pty:dft))(Osinoff, Joanne) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 23, 2023 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Thu 03/23 9:55 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed as to USA 25-32.25 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed as to USA32 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 11-3.8 title page is missing, incomplete, or incorrect. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
service
Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA
Wed 03/22 2:45 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Arshia Nazerani Houshmand, Fahimeh Robatian, upon Defendant Christopher A. Wray served on 3/20/2023, answer due 5/19/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Khatib, Salah) |
|
31 | 31
service
Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA
Wed 03/22 2:43 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Arshia Nazerani Houshmand, Fahimeh Robatian, upon Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 3/20/2023, answer due 5/19/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Khatib, Salah) |
|
30 | 30
service
Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA
Wed 03/22 2:41 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Arshia Nazerani Houshmand, Fahimeh Robatian, upon Defendant David Radel served on 3/20/2023, answer due 5/19/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Khatib, Salah) |
|
29 | 29
service
Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA
Wed 03/22 2:40 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Arshia Nazerani Houshmand, Fahimeh Robatian, upon Defendant Los Angeles Asylum Office served on 3/20/2023, answer due 5/19/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Khatib, Salah) |
|
28 | 28
service
Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA
Wed 03/22 2:30 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Arshia Nazerani Houshmand, Fahimeh Robatian, upon Defendant Ted H. Kim served on 3/20/2023, answer due 5/19/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Khatib, Salah) |
|
27 | 27
service
Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA
Wed 03/22 2:28 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Arshia Nazerani Houshmand, Fahimeh Robatian, upon Defendant Ur M. Jaddou served on 3/20/2023, answer due 5/19/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Khatib, Salah) |
|
26 | 26
service
Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA
Wed 03/22 2:26 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Arshia Nazerani Houshmand, Fahimeh Robatian, upon Defendant Matthew D. Emrich served on 3/20/2023, answer due 5/19/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Khatib, Salah) |
|
25 | 25
service
Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA
Wed 03/22 2:24 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Arshia Nazerani Houshmand, Fahimeh Robatian, upon Defendant United States Department of Homeland Security served on 3/20/2023, answer due 5/19/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Khatib, Salah) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/13 5:26 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Christopher A. Wray. (lh) |
|
23 | 23
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/13 5:25 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Matthew D. Emrich. (lh) |
|
22 | 22
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/13 5:24 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Ted H. Kim. (lh) |
|
21 | 21
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/13 5:23 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Ur M. Jaddou. (lh) |
|
20 | 20
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/13 5:22 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Alejandro Mayorkas. (lh) |
|
19 | 19
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/13 5:21 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant David Radel. (lh) |
|
18 | 18
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/13 5:19 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Los Angeles Asylum Office. (lh) |
|
17 | 17
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/13 5:15 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (lh) |
|
16 | 16
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/13 5:14 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant United States Department of Homeland Security. (lh) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Mon 03/13 4:59 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) |
|
14 | 14
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/13 4:59 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/13 4:58 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (lh) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/13 4:26 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by plaintiff Arshia Nazerani Houshmand, Fahimeh Robatian. (Khatib, Salah) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/13 4:25 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by plaintiff Arshia Nazerani Houshmand, Fahimeh Robatian. (Khatib, Salah) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/13 4:24 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by plaintiff Arshia Nazerani Houshmand, Fahimeh Robatian. (Khatib, Salah) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/13 4:24 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by plaintiff Arshia Nazerani Houshmand, Fahimeh Robatian. (Khatib, Salah) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/13 4:23 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by plaintiff Arshia Nazerani Houshmand, Fahimeh Robatian. (Khatib, Salah) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/13 4:22 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by plaintiff Arshia Nazerani Houshmand, Fahimeh Robatian. (Khatib, Salah) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/13 4:22 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by plaintiff Arshia Nazerani Houshmand, Fahimeh Robatian. (Khatib, Salah) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/13 4:21 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by plaintiff Arshia Nazerani Houshmand, Fahimeh Robatian. (Khatib, Salah) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/13 4:19 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by plaintiff Arshia Nazerani Houshmand, Fahimeh Robatian. (Khatib, Salah) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/13 4:17 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Arshia Nazerani Houshmand, Fahimeh Robatian, (Khatib, Salah) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/13 4:16 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Arshia Nazerani Houshmand, Fahimeh Robatian. (Khatib, Salah) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/13 4:14 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34946945 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Arshia Nazerani Houshmand, Fahimeh Robatian. (Attorney Salah O. Khatib added to party Arshia Nazerani Houshmand (pty:pla), Attorney Salah O. Khatib added to party Fahimeh Robatian (pty:pla))(Khatib, Salah) |