Johnson v. Arnold
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Andrew P Gordon |
Referred: | Brenda Weksler |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00395 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2023 |
Terminated: | Oct 13, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2023 2:58 AM PDT |
Defendant
Carl Arnold
|
|
Plaintiff
Charles A. Johnson
1264576 High Desert State Prison PO Box 650
Indian Springs, NV 89070 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, October 18, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 10/18 11:39 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable (Offender is paroled) re ECF No.15 Judgment, addressed to Charles A. Johnson. (GA) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 10/18 11:37 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable (Offender is paroled) re ECF No.14 Order, addressed to Charles A. Johnson. (GA) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
order
Judgment
Fri 10/13 1:40 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of Carl Arnold against Charles A. Johnson Re14 Order on Motion/Application to Proceed in forma pauperis. Case dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 10/13/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH) (Main Document 15 replaced on 10/13/2023) (CAH) |
|
14 | 14
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 10/13 1:34 PM
ORDER. This action is dismissed without prejudice based on Charles Johnsons failure to file an amended complaint in compliance with my September 4, 2023, order and for failure to state a claim. No other documents may be filed in this now-closed case. If Charles Johnson wishes to pursue his claims, he must file a complaint in a new case and either pay the required filing fee or apply for in forma pauperis status. It is further ordered that Johnsons application to proceed in forma pauperis for an inmate6 is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/13/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
cmp
Complaint
Wed 09/06 10:09 AM
COMPLAINT against Carl Arnold, by Charles A. Johnson. (Filed and dismissed without prejudice and with leave to amend pursuant to ECF No.12 order). (DLS) |
|
Monday, September 04, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
7
pgs
order
Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Screening Order
Wed 09/06 10:05 AM
SCREENING ORDER - A decision of the IFP application (ECF No.6 ) is DEFERRED . The complaint (ECF No.1 -1) is DISMISSED without prejudice and with leave to amend . Johnson has until October 9, 2023 to file an amended complaint. The motion to withdraw counsel (ECF No.10 ) is DENIED . The petition for writ of habeas corpus (ECF No.11 ) is DENIED without prejudice but without leave to amend in this action . The Clerk of Court is directed to file the complaint (ECF No.1 -1) and send Plaintiff a copy of the complaint (ECF No.1 -1), the approved form for filing a 42 U.S.C. § 1983 complaint and instructions for the same, and a blank 28 U.S.C. § 2254 habeas corpus form and instructions for the same. (ATTACHED HERETO FOR DISTRIBUTION TO P VIA HDSP LAW LIBRARY) . Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/4/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint for P, | ||
Att: 2 1983 Complaint form and Instructions, | ||
Att: 3 Habeas Corpus form and Instructions | ||
Tuesday, June 13, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
cmp
Petition Writ of Habeas Corpus
Tue 06/13 2:46 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Charles A. Johnson. (DRM) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Motion Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 06/13 2:36 PM
MOTION to Withdraw Counsel, by Plaintiff Charles A. Johnson. (DRM) (misc) (nondispositive) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 05/03 11:36 AM
ORDER denying as moot7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and granting8 Motion to disregard motion to withdraw counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 5/3/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Motion Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 05/02 3:22 PM
MOTION Request to Dismiss Motion to Withdraw Counsel re ECF No.7 Motion by Plaintiff Charles A. Johnson. Responses due by 5/16/2023. (CJS) (misc) (nondispositive) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Motion Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 04/25 10:25 AM
MOTION to Withdraw Counsel by Plaintiff Charles A. Johnson. Responses due by 5/9/2023. (CJS) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/17 9:26 AM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Charles A. Johnson. (CJS) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/12 12:39 PM
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Notice (ECF No.4 ) is construed as a motion for extension of time and GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for Plaintiff to either file a complete application to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the full $402 filing fee is EXTENDED to 5/30/2023. Plaintiff is advised that failure to comply with this order will result in a recommendation that this case be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 4/12/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice Other
Fri 03/31 1:29 PM
NOTICE re status of financial statement by Charles A. Johnson re3 Order. (LG) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 03/15 8:44 AM
ORDER. The Clerk of Court is Ordered to send the Plaintiff the approved IFP Application and Instructions. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that by 4/14/2023, Plaintiff must either file a complete IFP Application with the Court or pay the $402 filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 3/14/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) |
|
Att: 1 IFP Application and Instructions | ||
2 | 2
notice
Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas
Tue 03/14 10:16 AM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (TRW) |
|
Att: 1 Inmate IFP Application and Instructions, | ||
Att: 2 1983 Inmate Complaint and Instructions | ||
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Receipt Initiating Documents
Tue 03/14 10:15 AM
RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (TRW) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Mon 03/13 4:24 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (HAM) |