Haoyu Lei v. Los Angeles Asylum Office et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Michael W Fitzgerald |
Referred: | Alka Sagar |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01869 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2023 |
Terminated: | May 10, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2023 2:56 AM PDT |
Defendant
Ur M. Jaddou
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
USCIS Los Angeles Asylum Office
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Haoyu Lei
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Monday, January 29, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Mon 01/29 11:25 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Haoyu Lei Haoyu Lei. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Fu, Xuehui) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
order
Staying Case
Wed 05/10 1:29 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY THE CASE PENDING ADJUDICATION OF APPLICATION9 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The instant action shall be stayed until February 28, 2024. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (iv) |
|
9 | 9
stip
Stay Case
Wed 05/10 9:14 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Adjudication of Application filed by Defendants Ur M. Jaddou, USCIS Los Angeles Asylum Office.(Attorney Joanne I. Osinoff added to party Ur M. Jaddou(pty:dft), Attorney Joanne I. Osinoff added to party USCIS Los Angeles Asylum Office(pty:dft))(Osinoff, Joanne) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
service
Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA
Mon 03/20 2:56 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Haoyu Lei, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. (Fu, Xuehui) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 12:02 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Ur M. Jaddou, USCIS Los Angeles Asylum Office. (lh) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Tue 03/14 11:54 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/14 11:54 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (lh) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/13 4:50 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Haoyu Lei Haoyu Lei. (Fu, Xuehui) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/13 4:47 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Haoyu Lei Haoyu Lei, (Fu, Xuehui) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/13 4:45 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Haoyu Lei. (Fu, Xuehui) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/13 4:40 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34947336 - Fee: $402, filed by Haoyu Lei Haoyu Lei. (Attorney Xuehui Fu added to party Haoyu Lei(pty:pla))(Fu, Xuehui) |