United African-Asian Abilities Club et al v. Sylvan Property, LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Otis D Wright, II |
Referred: | Alexander F Mackinnon |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01876 |
Nature of Suit | 443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations |
Cause | 42:405 Fair Housing Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2023 |
Terminated: | May 12, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2023 2:29 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Sylvan Property, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Lee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
United African-Asian Abilities Club
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 83 minutes ago |
Friday, May 12, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Fri 05/12 1:19 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Pursuant to Plaintiffs Notice of Voluntary Dismissal13 , and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1): IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The entire action and all claims asserted therein are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. All dates and deadlines in this action are VACATED and taken off calendar. The Clerk of the Court shall close this case. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Thu 05/11 11:36 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs James Lee, United African-Asian Abilities Club. Dismissal is WITH PREJUDICE. (Wakefield, David) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 04/28 1:43 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: In light of Plaintiffs Notice of Settlement11 , indicating that the case has settled in its entirety, this action is placed on inactive status. By May 30, 2023, the parties shall file a dismissal that complies with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41. Failure to timely comply with this order shall result in the dismissal of this action. All other dates and deadlines in this action are VACATED and taken off calendar. (lc) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Settlement
Thu 04/27 4:15 PM
NOTICE of Settlement OF THE CASE IN ITS ENTIRETY filed by Plaintiffs James Lee, United African-Asian Abilities Club. (Wakefield, David) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Fri 04/07 2:46 PM
Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Sylvan Property, LLC answer now due 4/27/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Sylvan Property, LLC.(Attorney Craig D McMahon added to party Sylvan Property, LLC(pty:dft))(McMahon, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Wed 03/15 10:09 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. EFFECTIVE IMMEDIATELY- No mandatory chambers copies required, EXCEPT FOR EXCEPT FOR motions for summary judgment and any other evidence-heavy motions. The Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who have pending cases in the US District Court for the Central District of California to submit documents electronically to the Clerk's Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Court's Website and Judge's procedures for information as applicable. (lc) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 4:53 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Sylvan Property, LLC. (car) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Tue 03/14 4:53 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/14 4:52 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/14 4:52 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (car) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/13 8:02 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs James Lee, United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members. (Wakefield, David) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/13 8:01 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying SYLVAN PROPERTY, LLC. (Wakefield, David) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/13 8:00 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs James Lee, United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members. (Wakefield, David) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/13 8:00 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34948518 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members, James Lee. (Attorney David C Wakefield added to party James Lee(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wakefield added to party United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members(pty:pla))(Wakefield, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Civil Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Civil Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C to Civil Complaint |