United African Asian Abilities Club et al v. 17351 Vanowen LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Michael W Fitzgerald |
Referred: | Margo A Rocconi |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01881 |
Nature of Suit | 443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations |
Cause | 42:405 Fair Housing Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2023 |
Terminated: | Aug 03, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2023 3:47 AM PDT |
Defendant
17351 Vanowen LLC
|
|
Defendant
DOES
|
|
Plaintiff
James Lee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
United African-Asian Abilities Club
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, August 03, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Thu 08/03 12:48 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs United African-Asian Abilities Club, James Lee. Dismissal is WITH PREJUDICE. (Wakefield, David) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Fri 07/07 10:47 AM
COURT ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Show Cause Hearing set for 8/7/2023 at 11:30 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (rs) |
|
Monday, July 03, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
order
Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form
Mon 07/03 3:42 PM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to 17351 Vanowen LLC (bm) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Response
Fri 06/30 12:32 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs United African-Asian Abilities Club, James Leeto Order to Show Cause,10 PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO OSC DATED 06/20/2023 (Wakefield, David) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Clerk to Enter Default
Fri 06/30 12:30 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant 17351 Vanowen LLC filed by Plaintiffs United African-Asian Abilities Club, James Lee. (Wakefield, David) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Wakefield In Support of Default | ||
Tuesday, June 20, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 06/20 4:19 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to show cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. Failure to respond to the Order to Show Cause by JUNE 30, 2023 will result in the dismissal of this action. (iv) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program
Thu 06/15 3:03 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:23-cv-01881 MWF(MARx). (rn) |
|
Saturday, June 03, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Sat 06/03 9:15 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff United African-Asian Abilities Club, James Lee, upon Defendant 17351 Vanowen LLC served on 4/17/2023, answer due 5/8/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Wakefield, David) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 05/04 2:24 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: STATUS REPORT ON SERVICE OF PROCESS IN CIVIL ACTION by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero: In order to properly administer the Direct Assignment Program and advance this action in compliance with this Court's deadlines, Plaintiffs hereby are ORDERED to submit a report regarding the status of service of process in the action. Plaintiff may discharge this order by filing a statement regarding progress with service of process (not to exceed 3 pages) or a proof of service of process by no later than June 3, 2023. Failure to respond to this Order may lead the Court to recommend dismissal of the action for failure to prosecute or return the case to the civil wheel for reassignment to a District Judge. [See document for additional information.] (es) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 1:18 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant 17351 Vanowen LLC. (jtil) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form
Tue 03/14 1:15 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (jtil) |
|
Att: 1 CV11C | ||
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/13 8:26 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs James Lee, United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members. (Wakefield, David) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/13 8:26 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying 17351 VANOWEN LLC. (Wakefield, David) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/13 8:25 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs James Lee, United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members. (Wakefield, David) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/13 8:25 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34948614 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members, James Lee. (Attorney David C Wakefield added to party James Lee(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wakefield added to party United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members(pty:pla))(Wakefield, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Civil Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Civil Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C to Civil Complaint |