Douglas B. Croxall et al v. M2B Funding Corp. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:23-cv-00606
Lead case: 2:23-cv-00606
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | George H Wu |
Referred: | Rozella A Oliver |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01884 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2023 |
Terminated: | Aug 21, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Los Angeles Superior Court, 22SMCV02369 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2023 3:28 AM PDT |
Counter Claimant
M2B Funding Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Odin Associates LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Natasha Allas
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Douglas B. Croxall
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
M2B Funding Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Odin Associates LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Natasha Allas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Douglas B. Croxall
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
48 | 48
appeal
USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order
Thu 04/18 10:27 AM
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,46 filed by M2B Funding Corp., Odin Associates LLC. CCA # 23-3740 Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties (Docket Entry No. 16 in 23-55794 Docket Entry No. 11 in 23-3740 , these appeals are voluntarily dismissed. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys fees on appeal. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. (mat) |
|
Friday, December 01, 2023 | ||
47 | 47
3
pgs
appeal
USCA Notification of Case Number
Sun 12/03 1:22 PM
NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 23-3740 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,46 as to Defendants M2B Funding Corp., Odin Associates LLC. (car) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2023 | ||
46 | 46
appeal
Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals
Tue 11/21 1:58 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Defendants and Cross Complainants M2B FUNDING CORP. & ODIN ASSOCIATES, LLC M2B Funding Corp.(a Florida Corpooration), Odin Associates LLC(a Florida limited liability company). Appeal of Order on Motion to Dismiss Case,,,, Motion Hearing,,,39 , Order on Motion to Certify,44 , Order,45 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. BCACDC-36448551.) (Brandon, David) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2023 | ||
45 | 45
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 11/06 12:54 PM
ORDER CERTIFYING ORDER DISMISSING FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM FOR APPEAL PURSUANT TO FRCP 54(b) by Judge George H. Wu. PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 54(b), this Court certifies the following order for appeal: the August 21, 2023 order granting the motion to dismiss the first amended counterclaim with prejudice (ECF No. 39), for the following reasons: (See document for further details). (aco) |
|
44 | 44
order
Certify
Mon 11/06 12:51 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CERTIFY ISSUE FOR APPEAL; VACATING HEARING by Judge George H. Wu. As such, the Court grants the motion without need for oral argument, and vacates the November 9, 2023, hearing date set for the motion. (See document for further details).; granting41 MOTION to Certify Issue for Appeal. (aco) |
|
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
43 | 43
transcript
-Transcript Order Form (G-120)
Tue 10/17 7:48 AM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Court of Appeals case number 23-55794 as to Defendants M2B FUNDING CORP. & ODIN ASSOCIATES, LLC M2B Funding Corp., Odin Associates LLC for Court Reporter. Court will contact Mary Pillars at Mpillars@clarkhill.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Brandon, David) |
|
Thursday, October 12, 2023 | ||
42 | 42
respm
Non-Opposition to Motion
Thu 10/12 11:13 AM
NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Issue for Appeal41 filed by Plaintiffs Natasha Allas, Douglas B. Croxall, Counter Defendants Natasha Allas, Douglas B. Croxall, Douglas B. Croxall. (Gorry, Timothy) |
|
41 | 41
6
pgs
motion
Certify
Thu 10/12 9:52 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Issue for Appeal filed by Defendants and Counterclaimants M2B Funding Corp., Odin Associates LLC(a Florida limited liability company). Motion set for hearing on 11/9/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Brandon, David) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of David L. Brandon in Support of Motion to Certify Issue for Appeal, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 8 Proposed Order Certifying Order Dismissing First Amended Counterclaim for Appeal Pursuant to FRCP 58(b) | ||
Tuesday, October 10, 2023 | ||
40 | 40
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Tue 10/10 2:48 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David L Brandon counsel for Defendants M2B Funding Corp., Odin Associates LLC, Counter Claimants M2B Funding Corp., Odin Associates LLC. Adding David L. Brandon as counsel of record for M2B Funding Corporation and Odin Associates LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants and Counterclaimants M2B Funding Corporation and Odin Associates LLC. (Attorney David L Brandon added to party M2B Funding Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney David L Brandon added to party M2B Funding Corp.(pty:cc), Attorney David L Brandon added to party Odin Associates LLC(pty:cc), Attorney David L Brandon added to party Odin Associates LLC(pty:dft))(Brandon, David) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2023 | ||
39 | 39
1
pgs
minutes
Motion Hearing Dismiss Case
Mon 08/21 3:14 PM
MINUTES OF COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS FILED BY M2B FUNDING CORP. AND ODIN ASSOCIATES, LLC PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6)30 Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. The Court's Tentative Ruling on Counter-Defendant's Motion30 was issued on August 18, 202338 . Oral argument is held. The Tentative Ruling is adopted as the Court's Final Ruling. The Court incorporates by reference the contents of its ruling on the companion Rule 12(b)(6) motion filed in the M2B Action, in conjunction with the foregoing additional comments pertaining to this particular action. For the same reasons as addressed in the M2B Action, the First Amended Counterclaims, and each of the counterclaims contained therein, are dismissed without leave to amend.; granting30 MOTION to Dismiss Case. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (aco) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2023 | ||
38 | 38
2
pgs
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Sun 08/20 7:58 PM
MINUTE ORDER - IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu: Attached hereto is the Courts Tentative Ruling on Counter-Defendants Motion30 set for hearing on August 21, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. (jag) |
|
Thursday, August 17, 2023 | ||
37 | 37
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 08/17 8:40 AM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: The parties are advised that the Motion Hearing30 , set for Monday, August 21, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. will be held in-person and not by telephone. Masks are required. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY |
|
Monday, August 07, 2023 | ||
36 | 36
21
pgs
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Mon 08/07 2:45 PM
REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 30 AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS FILED BY M2B FUNDING CORP. AND ODIN ASSOCIATES, LLC PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6) filed by Counter Defendants Natasha Allas, Douglas B. Croxall. (Gorry, Timothy) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2023 | ||
35 | 35
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Mon 07/17 3:39 PM
OPPOSITION Opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 30 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss THE COUNTERCLAIMS FILED BY M2B FUNDING CORP. AND ODIN ASSOCIATES, LLC PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT 19 PLAINTIFFS M2B FUNDING CORP.S AND ODIN ASSOCIATES LLCS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DOUGLAS CROXALLS AND NATASHA ALLAS CROXALLS MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND THE FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS IN RELATED CASE filed by Counter Claimants M2B Funding Corp., Odin Associates LLC. (Frisch, Wendi) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2023 | ||
34 | 34
1
pgs
minutes
Scheduling Conference - optional html form ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Create Case Association
Mon 07/10 3:13 PM
MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. Court and counsel confer. The Court consolidated with M2B Funding Corp., et al. v. Douglas B Croxall, et al., CV 23-606-GW-RAOx for all pretrial purposes. Counter-Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Counterclaims filed by M2b Funding Corp. and Odin Associates, LLC Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6)30 filed on June 28, 2023, and set for hearing on August 7, 2023 is continued to August 21, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. The scheduling conference is continued to August 21, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. The Court will allow discovery to be proferred but parties need not respond at this time. Court Reporter: Terri A. Hourigan. (aco) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2023 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Thu 07/06 11:21 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Dean A. Olson counsel for Counter Claimants M2B Funding Corp., M2B Funding Corp., Odin Associates LLC, Odin Associates LLC, Defendants M2B Funding Corp., Odin Associates LLC. Adding Randolf W. Katz as counsel of record for M2B Funding Corp. and Odin Associates, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant M2B FUNDING CORP. & ODIN ASSOCIATES, LLC. (Olson, Dean) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 07/05 2:34 PM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Counsel may appear telephonically for the scheduling conference set on Monday, July 10, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY |
|
Monday, July 03, 2023 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Mon 07/03 12:41 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Defendants M2B Funding Corp., Odin Associates LLC.. (Frisch, Wendi) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Dismiss Case
Wed 06/28 11:44 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Natasha Allas(individually and as co-trustee of The Croxall Family Revocable Trust Dated February 20, 2004), Douglas B. Croxall(individually and as co-trustee of The Croxall Family Revocable Trust Dated February 20, 2004). Motion set for hearing on 8/7/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Gorry, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration OF TIMOTHY J. GORRY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS FILED BY M2B FUNDING CORP. AND ODIN ASSOCIATES, LLC PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6), | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order GRANTING NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS FILED BY M2B FUNDING CORP. AND ODIN ASSOCIATES, LLC PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6) | ||
Tuesday, June 06, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Tue 06/06 12:45 PM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for July 10, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than July 3, 2023. See Local Rule 26-1. (aco) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Counterclaim
Mon 06/05 4:04 PM
ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Answer to Complaint (Discovery),, Counterclaim,13 with JURY DEMAND M2B Funding Corp.s and Odin Associates LLCs Verified Answer, Affirmative Defenses and First Amended Counterclaims; Demand for Jury Trial , Sixth COUNTERCLAIM against Natasha Allas, Douglas B. Croxall filed by Defendants and Counterclaimants Odin Associates LLC, M2B Funding Corp..(Frisch, Wendi) |
|
Att: 1 A, | ||
Att: 2 B, | ||
Att: 3 C, | ||
Att: 4 D, | ||
Att: 5 E, | ||
Att: 6 F | ||
Monday, May 22, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
minutes
Motion Hearing ~Util - Terminate Hearings Dismiss
Mon 05/22 3:10 PM
MINUTES OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE COUNTERCLAIMS FILED BY M2B FUNDING CORP. AND ODIN ASSOCIATES, LLC PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6)19 ; and SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. The Court's Tentative Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion19 was issued on May 18, 202326 . Oral argument is held. Counterclaimants' counterclaims are dismissed with leave to amend, with the exception of the two specific performance counterclaims, which are dismissed without leave to amend (as causes of action, not if appropriate as remedies). Counterclaimants will have until June 6, 2023 to file an amended counterclaim. The scheduling conference is vacated and taken off-calendar.; granting19 MOTION to Dismiss THE COUNTERCLAIMS. Court Reporter: Terri A. Hourigan. (aco) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Thu 05/18 4:09 PM
MINUTE IN CHAMBERS - TENTATIVE RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE COUNTERCLAIMS FILED BY M2B FUNDING CORP. AND ODIN ASSOCIATES, LLC PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6)19 by Judge George H. Wu: Attached hereto is the Court's Tentative Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion19 set for hearing on May 22, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. (et) |
|
25 | 25
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 05/18 9:22 AM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: The parties are advised that the Motion Hearing19 and Scheduling Conference, set for Monday, May 22, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. will be held in-person and not by telephone. Masks are required. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Appearance
Wed 05/10 2:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jane M Kutepova on behalf of Plaintiffs Natasha Allas, Douglas B. Croxall (Attorney Jane M Kutepova added to party Natasha Allas(pty:pla), Attorney Jane M Kutepova added to party Douglas B. Croxall(pty:pla))(Kutepova, Jane) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 05/08 9:38 AM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DISMISS THE COUNTERCLAIMS FILED BY M2B FUNDING CORP. AND ODIN ASSOCIATES, LLC PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6)19 and the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE previously scheduled for 05/11/2023 to 5/22/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Thu 04/27 4:40 PM
REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THE CROXALLS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss THE COUNTERCLAIMS FILED BY M2B FUNDING CORP. AND ODIN ASSOCIATES, LLC PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT 19 filed by Counter Defendants Natasha Allas, Douglas B. Croxall. (Gorry, Timothy) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Thu 04/20 9:20 PM
Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss THE COUNTERCLAIMS FILED BY M2B FUNDING CORP. AND ODIN ASSOCIATES, LLC PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT 19 filed by Defendants M2B Funding Corp., Odin Associates LLC.(Frisch, Wendi) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Randolf Katz In Support Oppositon, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Daniel Kordash in Support of Opposition | ||
Wednesday, April 12, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 04/12 9:52 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) Order by Judge George H. Wu: A Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) scheduling conference is currently set for April 13, 2023 in these two related cases M2B Funding v. Croxall, No. CV-23-606 and Croxall v. M2B Funding, No. CV 23-1884 Motions to dismiss have been filed in both cases with a hearing date set for May 11, 2023. In light thereof and to avoid multiple appearances for the parties, the Court continues the April 13, 2023 scheduling conferences in both cases to May 11, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dbe) TEXT ONLY ENTRY |
|
Monday, April 10, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
23
pgs
motion
Dismiss (cause or other)
Mon 04/10 4:22 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss THE COUNTERCLAIMS FILED BY M2B FUNDING CORP. AND ODIN ASSOCIATES, LLC PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT filed by Plaintiffs Natasha Allas Croxall and Douglas B. Croxall. Motion set for hearing on 5/11/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Gorry, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration OF TIMOTHY J. GORRY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS THE COUNTERCLAIMS FILED BY M2B FUNDING CORP. AND ODIN ASSOCIATES, LLC PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6), | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order GRANTING NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS THE COUNTERCLAIMS FILED BY M2B FUNDING CORP. AND ODIN ASSOCIATES, LLC PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6) | ||
Friday, April 07, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Fri 04/07 8:58 AM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Counsel may appear telephonically for Thursday's 04/13/2023 scheduling conference at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 03/23 3:08 PM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER by Judge George H. Wu. The scheduling conference set for April 27, 2023 is advanced to April 13, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. The parties are to file a joint report by noon on April 10, 2023. (aco) |
|
16 | 16
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 03/23 11:06 AM
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge George H. Wu. APPLICATION of Attorney Peter R. Ginsberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants M2B Funding Corp., Odin Associates LLC, designating Dean A. Olson as local counsel.; GRANTING12 Non-Resident Attorney Peter R. Ginsberg. (aco) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Wed 03/22 11:17 AM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for April 27, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than April 20, 2023. See Local Rule 26-1. (aco) |
|
14 | 14
10
pgs
order
Order
Wed 03/22 11:15 AM
STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Counterclaim
Tue 03/21 7:51 PM
ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), with JURY DEMAND M2B Funding Corp.'s and Odin Associates LLC's Verified Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims; Demand for Jury Trial , Eighth COUNTERCLAIM against Natasha Allas, Douglas B. Croxall filed by Defendants Odin Associates LLC, M2B Funding Corp..(Frisch, Wendi) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Tue 03/21 10:09 AM
First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Peter R. Ginsberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants M2B Funding Corp., Odin Associates LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34991632) filed by Defendant M2B Funding Corp., Odin Associates LLC. (Olson, Dean) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
order
Transferring Case purs GO 21-01 (Related Case)(CV-34)
Mon 03/20 2:09 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:23-cv-00606 GW(RAOx). Case transferred from Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-01884 GW(RAOx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu (rn) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Wed 03/15 1:55 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice (Other)5 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is Related Case(s). You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap) |
|
9 | 9
attorney
Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 1:46 PM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Peter R Ginsberg on behalf on Defendants. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Wed 03/15 1:39 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 1:39 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 1:38 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (ghap) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 03/14 4:40 PM
Notice DEFENDANTS M2B FUNDING CORP.S AND ODIN ASSOCIATES LLCS NOTICE OF RELATED CASES filed by Defendants M2B Funding Corp., ODIN ASSOCIATES LLC. (Frisch, Wendi) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 03/14 4:36 PM
Odin Associates LLC's Corporate Disclosure Statement and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant All Defendants, identifying Plaintiff Douglas Croxall; Plaintiff Natasha Allas; Defendant M2BFunding Corp.; Defendant Odin Associates LLC; Daniel Kordash; Yohan Naraine; Nandranie Naraine. (Frisch, Wendi) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 03/14 4:32 PM
M2B Funding Corp.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement and Disc. Cert. of Interested Parties NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant M2B Funding Corp., ODIN ASSOCIATES LLC, identifying Plaintiff Douglas Croxall; Plaintiff Natasha Allas; Defendant M2BFunding Corp.; Defendant Odin Associates LLC; Daniel Kordash; Yohan Naraine; Nandranie Naraine. (Frisch, Wendi) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 03/14 4:23 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants M2B Funding Corp., ODIN ASSOCIATES LLC. (Frisch, Wendi) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 4:09 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County of Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 22SMCV02369 Receipt No: ACACDC-34953734 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant ODIN ASSOCIATES LLC, M2B Funding Corp.. (Attorney Wendi J Frisch added to party M2B Funding Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Wendi J Frisch added to party ODIN ASSOCIATES LLC(pty:dft))(Frisch, Wendi) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Wendi J. Frisch, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Frisch Declaration - Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Frisch Declaration - Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. 3 to Frisch Declaration - Civil Case Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. 4 to Frisch Declaration - Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. 5 to Frisch Declaration - Alternate Dispute Resolution (ADR) Information Package, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex. 6 to Frisch Declaration - Notice of Case Management Conference, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Ex. 7 to Frisch Declaration - Notice of Case Management Conference, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Ex. 8 to Frisch Declaration - Notice of Lis Pendens, | ||
Att: 10 Declaration Declaration of Yohan Naraine, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Yohan Naraine's Declaration (2022 Annual Report), | ||
Att: 12 Declaration Declaration of Nandranie Naraine, | ||
Att: 13 Declaration Declaration of Daniel Kordash, | ||
Att: 14 Declaration Declaration of Monica Dayan Shpilman | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Wed 03/15 1:49 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, M2B Funding Corp., Odin Associates LLC. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Douglas B. Croxall, Natasha Allas. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/18/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1) (ghap) |