Otto Archive, LLC v. Quadrille Wallpapers and Fabrics, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Josephine L Staton |
Referred: | Charles F Eick |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01885 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2023 |
Terminated: | Sep 28, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2023 1:42 AM PDT |
Defendant
Quadrille Wallpapers and Fabrics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Otto Archive, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 53 minutes ago |
Thursday, September 28, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Thu 09/28 1:31 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Otto Archive, LLC. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Tue 09/26 1:43 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Counsel and/or the parties are advised that the Court has updated its procedures in civil cases, including procedures encouraging consent to the magistrate judge in ordinary civil cases; setting forth presumptive schedules for class certification motion briefing; simplifying the requirements for substituting named defendants for Doe defendants; clarifying requirements for submission of mandatory chambers copies of voluminous exhibits; substituting compliance with the Local Rule regarding limitations on the number of words in the parties briefing for the Courts previous page limitations on briefing; imposing further limitations on the number of words in reply briefs; updating the Courts procedures in the case of settlement, including procedures for orders imposing stays of proceedings, orders of dismissal, and retention of jurisdiction by the Court; imposing limitations on both the number of and the content of motions in limine; and clarifying trial exhibit preparation, including the requirement to prepare a separate binder of exhibits for each witness. These updates are found on the Courts procedures page, and/or the Courts Initial Standing Order and Civil Trial Order, attached thereto. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cbr) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Mon 09/25 7:18 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiff's counsel, to show cause in writing no later than 9/29/2023, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (See document for further information). (gga) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Tue 07/25 10:59 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Quadrille Wallpapers and Fabrics, Inc. answer now due 8/25/2023, re Order to Show Cause,12 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Otto Archive, LLC.(Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 07/18 2:49 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiff's counsel, to show cause in writing no later than 7/26/2023, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (See document for further information). (jp) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Tue 03/28 2:02 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Otto Archive, LLC, upon Defendant Quadrille Wallpapers and Fabrics, Inc. served on 3/23/2023, answer due 4/13/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Michael N. Bruno c/o Lisa Gifford/Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Sunday, March 19, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Sun 03/19 9:08 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (vv) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 3:32 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Quadrille Wallpapers and Fabrics, Inc. (car) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Wed 03/15 3:25 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 3:25 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 3:24 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (car) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Summons Request
Tue 03/14 11:33 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Otto Archive, LLC. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121)
Tue 03/14 11:31 AM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Otto Archive, LLC.(Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 03/14 11:31 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Otto Archive, LLC, (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 03/14 11:30 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Otto Archive, LLC. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 11:24 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34951662 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Otto Archive, LLC. (Attorney Stephen M. Doniger added to party Otto Archive, LLC(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 to Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 to Complaint |