Kun Wang et al v. Dir LA Asylum Ofc et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Michael W Fitzgerald |
Referred: | Michael R Wilner |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01887 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2023 |
Terminated: | May 15, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2023 1:56 AM PDT |
Defendant
Dir LA Asylum Ofc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dir LA Dist
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dir USCIS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sec DHS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
US AG
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
USCIS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kun Wang
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Qiangzi Zhang
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Wednesday, January 10, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Wed 01/10 2:36 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiffs Kun Wang, Qiangzi Zhang. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Ye, Ke) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Mon 05/15 2:04 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY CASE PENDING ADJUDICATION OF APPLICATION16 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The instant action shall be stayed until February 26, 2024. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
stip
Stay Case
Fri 05/12 3:48 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending adjudication of plaintiff's 589 application filed by defendants Dir LA Asylum Ofc, Dir LA Dist, Dir USCIS, Sec DHS, US AG, USCIS.(Buchanan, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
15 | 15
notice
Appearance
Fri 05/12 3:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christopher B. Buchanan on behalf of Defendants Dir LA Asylum Ofc, Dir LA Dist, Dir USCIS, Sec DHS, US AG, USCIS (Attorney Christopher B. Buchanan added to party Dir LA Asylum Ofc(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher B. Buchanan added to party Dir LA Dist(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher B. Buchanan added to party Dir USCIS(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher B. Buchanan added to party Sec DHS(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher B. Buchanan added to party US AG(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher B. Buchanan added to party USCIS(pty:dft))(Buchanan, Christopher) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
service
Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA
Mon 03/27 10:40 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Qiangzi Zhang, Kun Wang, upon Defendant US AG served on 3/20/2023, answer due 5/19/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Ye, Ke) |
|
13 | 13
service
Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA
Mon 03/27 10:37 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Qiangzi Zhang, Kun Wang, upon Defendant Sec DHS served on 3/20/2023, answer due 5/19/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Ye, Ke) |
|
12 | 12
service
Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA
Mon 03/27 10:33 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Qiangzi Zhang, Kun Wang, upon Defendant Dir USCIS served on 3/20/2023, answer due 5/19/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Ye, Ke) |
|
11 | 11
service
Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA
Mon 03/27 10:29 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Qiangzi Zhang, Kun Wang, upon Defendant USCIS served on 3/20/2023, answer due 5/19/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Ye, Ke) |
|
10 | 10
service
Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA
Mon 03/27 10:24 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Qiangzi Zhang, Kun Wang, upon Defendant Dir LA Dist served on 3/16/2023, answer due 5/15/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Ye, Ke) |
|
9 | 9
service
Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA
Mon 03/27 10:17 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Qiangzi Zhang, Kun Wang, upon Defendant Dir LA Asylum Ofc served on 3/15/2023, answer due 5/15/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Ye, Ke) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
cs_rasgn
Reassign Case pursuant to GO 21-01 (CV-81)
Wed 03/15 1:25 PM
ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE Pursuant General Order 21-01 (identical case) by Judge Percy Anderson, Case Management and Assignment Committee Chair. Case transferred to the calendar of Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for all further proceedings. All discovery matters are transferred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Case number now reads as 2:23-cv-01887-MWF-MRWx. (aco) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 1:24 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants Dir LA Asylum Ofc, Dir LA Dist, Dir USCIS, Sec DHS, US AG, USCIS. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Tue 03/14 1:15 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/14 1:14 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (ghap) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Tue 03/14 12:04 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by plaintiffs Kun Wang, Qiangzi Zhang. (Ye, Ke) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 03/14 12:03 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Kun Wang, Qiangzi Zhang, (Ye, Ke) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 03/14 12:02 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Kun Wang, Qiangzi Zhang. (Ye, Ke) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 12:00 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34952146 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiffs Qiangzi Zhang, Kun Wang. (Attorney Ke Ye added to party Kun Wang(pty:pla), Attorney Ke Ye added to party Qiangzi Zhang(pty:pla))(Ye, Ke) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit to Complaint |