Torres v. Lowe's Companies, Inc et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Cristina D Silva |
Referred: | Brenda Weksler |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00399 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2023 |
Case in other court: | District Court Clark County Nevada, A-23-865564-C |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2023 2:52 AM PDT |
Defendant
Lowe's Companies, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lowe's Home Centers LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lowe's Home Improvement LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dorothy Torres
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
10
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Tue 04/02 12:25 PM
ORDER granting17 Stipulation to enlarge Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 10/7/2024. Motions due by 11/8/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/5/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 4/2/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Stipulation
Fri 03/29 4:43 PM
Second STIPULATION and Order to Enlarge Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendants Lowe's Companies, Inc, Lowe's Home Centers LLC, Lowe's Home Improvement LLC. (Cwik, Marc) (other) (discovery) |
|
Friday, January 26, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
4
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Fri 01/26 9:10 AM
ORDER granting15 Stipulated Order of Protection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/26/2024.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT) |
|
Wednesday, January 24, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Stipulation
Wed 01/24 11:41 AM
STIPULATION Agreed Order of Protection by Defendant Lowe's Home Centers LLC. (Cwik, Marc) (other) (protective) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
3
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Thu 11/16 9:04 AM
ORDER granting ECF No.13 Stipulation for Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendants Lowe's Companies, Inc. and Lowe's Home Improvement, LLC. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 11/15/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Stipulation
Wed 11/15 9:16 AM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL Stipulation and Order for Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendants Lowe's Companies, Inc. and Lowe's Home Improvement, LLC by Defendants Lowe's Companies, Inc, Lowe's Home Centers LLC, Lowe's Home Improvement LLC. (Cwik, Marc) (dismissal) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
7
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation Scheduling Order
Tue 10/24 10:48 AM
ORDER Granting11 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Discovery due by 6/7/2024. Motions due by 7/8/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/5/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/23/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RGDG) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Stipulation
Fri 10/20 1:28 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) Stipulation to Enlarge Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order (First Request) by Defendants Lowe's Companies, Inc, Lowe's Home Centers LLC, Lowe's Home Improvement LLC. (Cwik, Marc) (extend) (discovery) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2023 | ||
notice
Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge
Mon 05/08 11:26 AM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (AMMi) |
||
Friday, May 05, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
6
pgs
order
Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order
Mon 05/08 11:26 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER granting8 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 1/8/2024. Motions due by 2/7/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/8/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 5/5/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order
Thu 05/04 8:38 PM
Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendants Lowe's Companies, Inc, Lowe's Home Centers LLC, Lowe's Home Improvement LLC.. (Cwik, Marc) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Status Report
Thu 04/13 2:39 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Lowe's Companies, Inc.. (Cwik, Marc) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Statement in Removal Case
Wed 03/29 3:26 PM
STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Lowe's Companies, Inc, Lowe's Home Centers LLC, Lowe's Home Improvement LLC.. (Cwik, Marc) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Jury Demand
Wed 03/22 12:00 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendants Lowe's Companies, Inc, Lowe's Home Centers LLC, Lowe's Home Improvement LLC. (Cwik, Marc) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
minord
Minute Order Removal Case
Tue 03/14 3:40 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva on 3/14/2023. By Deputy Clerk: L. Ortiz. Statement regarding removed action is due by 3/29/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 4/13/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Tue 03/14 3:24 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Lowe's Companies, Inc, Lowe's Home Centers LLC, Lowe's Home Improvement LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Cwik, Marc) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition Removal
Tue 03/14 12:53 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court Clark County Nevada, Case Number A-23-865564-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7235277) by Lowe's Home Improvement LLC, Lowe's Home Centers LLC, Lowe's Companies, Inc. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/24/2023. (Cwik, Marc) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 9 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Tue 03/14 3:39 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (LOE) |
||
order
Standing Order
Tue 03/14 3:40 PM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva. Judge Silva's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) |