Abrigo Castro v. FORD MOTOR COMPANY
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha |
Referred: | Rozella A Oliver |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01891 |
Nature of Suit | 385 Torts - Personal Property - Property Damage Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2023 |
Terminated: | Oct 10, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Jose Abrigo Castro v. Ford Motor Company, 232GDCV00313 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2023 1:46 AM PDT |
Defendant
DOES
|
|
Defendant
Ford Motor Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose I. Abrigo Castro
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, October 20, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Receipt
Mon 10/23 1:18 PM
Receipt of Remand by Los Angeles County Superior Court, Glendale on 10/18/2023. (lc) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form
Wed 10/11 10:36 AM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, GLENDALE, NO. 23GDCV00313. (lc) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
order
Remand Case to State Court
Wed 10/11 10:33 AM
ORDER REMANDING ACTION FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha : The Court remands action to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Glendale, Case number 23GDCV00313. All dates and deadlines in this court are VACATED. The clerk of the court shall close the action administratively. Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (lc) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Response
Wed 09/13 8:22 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Jose I. Abrigo Castroto Order,,,20 (Amarkarian, Allen) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Allen Amarkarian, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Response
Wed 09/13 9:35 AM
RESPONSE filed by Defendant Ford Motor Companyto Order,,,20 (Proudfoot, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration in support of Response to OSC | ||
Wednesday, August 30, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
3
pgs
order
Order
Wed 08/30 1:19 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ACTION SHOULD NOT BE REMANDED FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. The parties are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE, in writing only, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, why this action should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction because the amount in controversy does not exceed the jurisdictional threshold. The parties are encouraged to submit evidence and/or judicially noticeable facts in response to the court's Order. Responses shall be limited to ten (10) pages in length. The parties should consider this Order to be a two-pronged inquiry into the facial and factual sufficiency of Defendant's demonstration of jurisdiction. See order for details. (lom) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 05/11 11:53 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF JOSE I. CASTRO FOR REMOTE APPEARANCE (DKT.12 ) ), AND REQUEST OF DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY FOR REMOTE APPEARANCE (DKT.14 ): In light of the scheduling conference being vacated (Dkt. 16 ), the Requests are denied as MOOT. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 05/10 4:46 PM
ORDER RE: SCHEDULE OF PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES, TRIAL REQUIREMENTS, ANDCONDUCT OF ATTORNEYS AND PARTIES by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/7/2024 01:00 PM ; Jury Trial set for 6/25/2024 08:30 AM ; Motion in Limine set for hearing on 6/7/2024 at 01:00 PM (SEE DOCUMENT FOR ALL SPECIFIED DEADLINES). (lc) |
|
17 | 17
order
Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)
Wed 05/10 4:06 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 05/03/2024. (tf) |
|
16 | 16
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 05/10 4:05 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) Report submitted by the parties, and determines that an in-person Scheduling Conference is unnecessary. Accordingly, the court VACATES the May 12, 2023, Scheduling Conference. Order re Jury/Court Trial to issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Wed 05/10 1:16 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: REQUEST for Leave of Matthew M. Proudfoot to Appear for Scheduling Conference Telephonically 14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or untimely. Filer erroneously set the Request on Judge's Motion calendar for same date as the scheduling conference May 12, 2023 1:00 PM. No hearing date is required for the request format. Other error(s) with document(s): NOTE: Clerk has TERMED ONLY the erroneous hearing and that the REQUEST REMAINS PENDING the Judge's ruling.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Appear
Tue 05/09 2:13 PM
REQUEST for Leave of Matthew M. Proudfoot to Appear for Scheduling Conference Telephonically filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Request set for hearing on 5/12/2023 at 01:00 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (Proudfoot, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, May 05, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Fri 05/05 3:42 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: REQUEST for Leave of Allen Amarkarian, Esq. to Appear for Remote Appearance 12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or untimely. Filer erroneously set the Request on Judge's Motion calendar for same date as the scheduling conference May 12, 2023 1:00 PM. No hearing date is required for the request format. Other error(s) with document(s): NOTE: Clerk has TERMED ONLY the erroneous hearing and that the REQUEST REMAINS PENDING the Judge's ruling. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Appear
Fri 05/05 9:29 AM
REQUEST for Leave of Allen Amarkarian, Esq. to Appear for Remote Appearance filed by plaintiff Jose I. Abrigo Castro. Request set for hearing on 5/12/2023 at 01:00 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (Jacobson, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Request to Appear Remotely | ||
Friday, April 28, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Fri 04/28 11:26 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Plaintiff Jose I. Abrigo Castro.. (Amarkarian, Allen) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Fri 03/17 10:51 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Scheduling Conference set for 5/12/2023 at 01:00 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf) |
|
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 03/17 10:49 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Wed 03/15 4:18 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 4:17 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 4:17 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (jtil) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 03/14 1:21 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY, identifying Ford Motor Company. (Proudfoot, Matthew) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Appearance
Tue 03/14 1:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew M Proudfoot on behalf of Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Proudfoot, Matthew) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Declaration
Tue 03/14 1:20 PM
DECLARATION of Matthew M. Proudfoot re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Proudfoot, Matthew) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 03/14 1:20 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Proudfoot, Matthew) |
|
1 | 1
12
pgs
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 1:19 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 232GDCV00313 Receipt No: ACACDC-34953105 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Attorney Matthew M Proudfoot added to party FORD MOTOR COMPANY(pty:dft))(Proudfoot, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 19 pgs Summons & Complaint - State Court, | ||
Att: 2 Answer to Complaint - State Court | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Wed 03/15 3:00 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Jose I. Abrigo Castro in Los Angeles Superior Court on 2/16/2023, attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Wed 03/15 3:06 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company in Los Angeles Superior Court on 3/10/2023, attached as Exhibit 2. (jtil) |