Russell Reynolds Associates, Inc. v. Go Maps, Inc.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | George H Wu |
Referred: | Charles F Eick |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01892 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2023 |
Terminated: | Nov 03, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2023 2:12 AM PDT |
Defendant
Go Maps, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Ronald Akasaka
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Russell Reynolds Associates, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, November 03, 2023 | ||
36 | 36
order
Dismissing Case
Fri 11/03 9:34 AM
ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Judge George H. Wu. PURSUANT TO STIPULATION, IT IS SO ORDERED that the above-entitled action by plaintiff Russell Reynolds Associates, Inc. ("RRA") against defendant Go Maps, Inc. ("Go Maps") is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) with the Court retaining jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the settlement agreement. If any party certifies to the Court, with proper notice to the other party, that the payments have not been made and any default not cured, the Court may reopen the case to enforce the terms of the settlement agreement. RE: Stipulation to Dismiss Case,35 . (Case Terminated. Made JS-6.) (aco) |
|
Thursday, November 02, 2023 | ||
35 | 35
stip
Dismiss Case
Thu 11/02 3:53 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Settlement filed by Plaintiff Russell Reynolds Associates, Inc..(Kelly, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
34 | 34
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 11/02 12:37 PM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Counsel may appear telephonically for the order to show cause re settlement hearing set on Monday, November 6, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2023 | ||
33 | 33
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Fri 10/27 8:59 AM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY: IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu: The Court has received the Plaintiffs Settlement Status Report (ECF No.30 ). Base thereon, the OSC re Settlement is continued from October 30, 2023, to November 6, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. The parties are to file a dismissal or a joint status report by November 2. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) |
|
Thursday, October 26, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 10/26 1:07 PM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Counsel may appear telephonically for the order to show cause re settlement hearing set on Monday, October 30, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) |
|
Wednesday, October 25, 2023 | ||
31 | 31
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 10/25 9:29 AM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY: IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu: The Court has received the parties settlement status report (ECF No.30 ) and, based thereon, continues the Order to Show Cause re Settlement from October 26, 2023 to October 30, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) |
|
Tuesday, October 24, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Status Report
Tue 10/24 4:43 PM
STATUS REPORT SETTLEMENT STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiff Russell Reynolds Associates, Inc.. (Kelly, Daniel) |
|
29 | 29
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 10/24 3:02 PM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Counsel may appear telephonically for the order to show cause re settlement hearing set on Thursday, October 26, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 10/11 8:41 AM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: The Court sets an ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT HEARING for 10/26/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. The parties are to file a report or stipulation to dismiss by October 24, 2023. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) |
|
Monday, October 09, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Mon 10/09 1:50 PM
REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Dismissal or Advise re Settlement filed by Plaintiff Russell Reynolds Associates, Inc.. (Kelly, Daniel) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
minutes
Status Conference - optional html form ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 10/02 2:05 PM
MINUTES OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT held before Judge George H. Wu. Counsel for Plaintiff specially appears for Defendant. Court confers with Plaintiff's counsel re Notice of Settlement filed on September 28, 202325 . For reasons stated on the record, the Court vacates all currently set dates with the expectation that parties will file a stipulation and order to dismiss by no later than October 10, 2023. A term of the order will include the Court retaining jurisdiction to reopen the case at the request of any party to enforce the terms of the settlement agreement. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (aco) |
|
Thursday, September 28, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Settlement
Thu 09/28 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Settlement NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND MOTION TO VACATE ALL DEADLINES filed by Plaintiff Russell Reynolds Associates, Inc.. (Kelly, Daniel) |
|
24 | 24
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 09/28 9:36 AM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Counsel may appear telephonically for the post mediation status conference set on Monday, October 2, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
adr
Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) - optional html form
Thu 06/22 10:22 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Ronald Akasaka has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Disclosure
Wed 06/21 5:12 PM
INITIAL DISCLOSURE of Rule 26(a) filed by Defendant Go Maps, Inc. (Ishimatsu, Bruce) |
|
21 | 21
adr
Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2)
Wed 06/21 1:30 PM
STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Ron Akasaka may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. Filed by Plaintiff Russell Reynolds Associates, Inc.(Kelly, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 05/03 11:27 AM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge George H. Wu. As per C.D. Cal. L.R. 7-15, the May 4, 2023 scheduling conference date is taken off calendar. The Joint Request to Continue the Scheduling Conference19 filed on May 2, 2023 is deemed MOOT. The Court sets the following dates: The parties are free to amend pleadings under Fed. R. Civ. P. 15 up to May 26, 2023. The pre-trial conference will be held on February 15, 2024 at 8:30 a.m. Court trial will begin on February 27, 2024 at 9:00 a.m. (See document for additional deadlines and details). (aco) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Continue
Tue 05/02 1:24 PM
Joint REQUEST to Continue Scheduling Conference from May 4, 2023 filed by Plaintiff Russell Reynolds Associates, Inc.. (Kelly, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
18 | 18
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 05/02 12:30 PM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Counsel may appear telephonically for Thursday's 05/04/2023 scheduling conference at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Wed 04/26 10:25 AM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 1 day, filed by Plaintiff Russell Reynolds Associates, Inc... (Kelly, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 04/06 2:24 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for 5/4/2023 at 8:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu; Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed by 4/27/2023. (vdr) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 04/05 7:51 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Go Maps, Inc. Go Maps, Inc., identifying Go Maps, Inc.. (Ishimatsu, Bruce) |
|
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 04/05 7:45 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Go Maps, Inc..(Attorney Bruce L. Ishimatsu added to party Go Maps, Inc.(pty:dft))(Ishimatsu, Bruce) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Refund of Fees (G-124) - Issued
Mon 03/27 8:04 AM
REFUND OF $402.00 made payable on 03/27/2023 to Larry Canziani for payment made on 03/14/2023 Re: APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid Re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 11 . (rdj) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Wed 03/22 11:54 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Russell Reynolds Associates, Inc., upon Defendant Go Maps, Inc. served on 3/17/2023, answer due 4/7/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jackson Yang, Registered Agent Solutions, Inc., authorized to accept served under F.R.C.P. Rule 4. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kelly, Daniel) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Refund of Fees Paid (G-124)
Wed 03/22 10:02 AM
APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid Re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Russell Reynolds Associates, Inc.. (Kelly, Daniel) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
10
pgs
order
Order
Fri 03/17 10:07 AM
STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/16 1:50 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Russell Reynolds Associates, Inc., identifying Russell Reynolds Associates, Inc.. (Kelly, Daniel) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Thu 03/16 11:09 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (jtil) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/16 10:36 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Go Maps, Inc. (jtil) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Wed 03/15 4:20 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) |
|
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 4:20 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 4:19 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (jtil) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Tue 03/14 2:09 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Russell Reynolds Associates, Inc.. (Kelly, Daniel) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 03/14 2:03 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Russell Reynolds Associates, Inc.. (Kelly, Daniel) |
|
1 | 1
4
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 1:50 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: BCACDC-34953227 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Russell Reynolds Associates, Inc.. (Attorney Daniel James Kelly added to party Russell Reynolds Associates, Inc.(pty:pla))(Kelly, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 9 pgs Exhibit Exhibit A - Engagement Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - First Interim Fee Invoice, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Second Interim Fee Invoice, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Third Interim Fee Invoice |