LaTanya Williams v. Lisa Sui Cheung Li et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Sunshine Suzanne Sykes |
Referred: | Shashi H Kewalramani |
Case #: | 5:23-cv-00438 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2023 |
Terminated: | Dec 13, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2023 3:09 AM PDT |
Defendant
Lisa Sui Cheung Li
|
|
Defendant
DOES
|
|
Plaintiff
Latanya Williams
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 69 minutes ago |
Wednesday, December 13, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
stip
Default Judgment
Fri 12/15 4:59 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT REGARDING PLAINTIFFS DEFAULT JUDGMENT [DKT. 21] for Default Judgment against Defendant Lisa Sui Cheung Li, as Trustee of the Li Family Trust filed by Plaintiff Latanya Williams. It is hereby ordered ad adjudged that: Plaintiff LATANYA WILLIAMS shall have JUDGMENT in her favor in the amount of $1,627.00 against Defendant LISA SUI CHEUNG LI, AS TRUSTEE OF THE LI FAMILY TRUST. Additionally, Defendant LISA SUI CHEUNG LI, AS TRUSTEE OF THE LI FAMILY TRUST, is ORDERED to bring the entrance of the property, located at or about 1017 E. 4th St., Ontario, California, into compliance with the Americans with Disabilities Act Accessibility Guidelines. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Lodging
Mon 11/20 9:00 AM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Order on Motion for Default Judgment,24(Kim, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, November 16, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
order
Default Judgment
Thu 11/16 5:17 PM
GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT [DKT. 21] by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: The Court GRANTS Williams Motion. In accordance with the opinion, Defendant is hereby ORDERED to bring the entrance of their business into compliance with the ADA, and the court also enters a total judgment of $1,627 in favor of Williams against Defendant. Plaintiff shall lodge a proposed judgment in accordance with this opinion on or before November 24, 2023. (shb) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 10/31 3:21 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Sunshine S. Sykes: The Court finds that the Motion for Default Judgment is appropriate for resolution without a hearing. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15. [Dkt. 21]. Accordingly, the Court vacates the hearing set on November 3, 2023. The motion stands submitted on the papers timely filed. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) |
|
Thursday, September 28, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Thu 09/28 9:29 AM
ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ("OSC") by Judge Sunshine S. Sykes: In view of the Motion for Default Judgment [Dkt. 21], filed on September 27, 2023, the Court hereby DISCHARGES the OSC [Dkt. 20], issued on September 13, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) |
|
Wednesday, September 27, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Default Judgment
Wed 09/27 4:45 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant LISA SUI CHEUNG LI, AS TRUSTEE OF THE LI FAMILY TRUST, filed by Plaintiff Latanya Williams. Motion set for hearing on 11/3/2023 at 02:00 PM before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (Kim, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 6 Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, September 13, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Order to Show Cause
Wed 09/13 5:47 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. The Court, on its own motion, hereby orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing on or before September 27, 2023, why this action should not be dismissed, with respect to each defaulted Defendant. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court finds that this matter is appropriate for submission without oral argument. This Order to Show Cause will be discharged if Plaintiff files, before the deadline set forth above, a motionfor the entry of default judgment with respect to the applicable Defendant(s).Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 55(b). (shb) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Wed 08/02 10:51 AM
ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ("OSC") by Judge Sunshine S. Sykes: In view of the Clerk's Entry of Default [Dkt. 18] as to Defendant Lisa Sui Cheung Li, as Trustee of the Li Family Trust, entered on July 28, 2023, the Court hereby DISCHARGES the OSC [Dkt. 16], issued on July 13, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
order
Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form
Fri 07/28 4:04 PM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Lisa Sui Cheung Li as Trustee of the Li Family Trust (shb) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Clerk to Enter Default
Thu 07/27 5:00 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Lisa Sui Cheung Li filed by Plaintiff Latanya Williams. (Kim, Jason) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 07/14 11:14 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: The Court, on its own motion, hereby orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing on or before July 27, 2023, why this action should not be dismissed, with respect to each Defendant who has not filed an answer or otherwise responded to the complaint. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the court finds that this matter is appropriate for submission without oral argument. This Order to Show Cause will be discharged if Plaintiff files, before the deadline set forth above, a request for the entry of default with respect to the applicable Defendant(s). Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 55(a).IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb) |
|
15 | 15
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Thu 07/13 2:53 PM
ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ("OSC") by Judge Sunshine S. Sykes: In view of the Proof of Service [Dkt. 14], filed on July 10, 2023, the Court hereby DISCHARGES the OSC [Dkt. 13], issued on June 26, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 07/10 4:52 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Latanya Williams, upon Defendant Lisa Sui Cheung Li served on 6/15/2023, answer due 7/6/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon LISA SUI CHEUNG LI, AS TRUSTEE OF THE LI FAMILY TRUST, in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kim, Jason) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Order to Show Cause
Mon 06/26 8:48 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. the Court, on its own motion, hereby orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing on or before July 10, 2023, why this action should not be dismissed, with respect to each Defendant who has not been served, for lack of prosecution. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court finds that this matter is appropriate for submission without oral argument. This Order to Show Cause will be discharged if Plaintiff files, before the deadline set forth above, a proof of service of the summons and complaint.IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Hearings
Thu 04/06 8:12 AM
IN CHAMBERS ORDER DECLINING TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PLAINTIFFS UNRUH ACT CLAIM [DKT. 11] by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: The Court, in its discretion, declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction and DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiffs Second Cause of Action (Unruh Act Claim), Third Cause of Action (California Disabled Persons Act), Fourth Cause of Action (California Health & Safety Code § 1995), and Fifth Cause of Action (Negligence). See 28 U.S.C. § 1367(c)(4). Accordingly, the April 7, 2023 hearing on the Courts Order to Show Cause [Dkt. 9] is VACATED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Response
Wed 03/29 1:04 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Latanya Williamsto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,9 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction(Kim, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration | ||
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Mon 03/20 4:16 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 03/15 4:24 PM
MINUTE ORDER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT DENY SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Willaims shall file her response to this order no later than March 29, 2023. The Court further sets a hearing regarding this Order to Show Cause on April 7, 2023, at 1:00 PM via Zoom. (lom) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 5:03 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Lisa Sui Cheung Li. (jtil) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Tue 03/14 4:26 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/14 4:26 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/14 4:25 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (jtil) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Tue 03/14 1:34 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Latanya Williams. (Kim, Jason) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 03/14 1:34 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 03/14 1:33 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Latanya Williams. (Kim, Jason) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 1:33 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34953334 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Latanya Williams(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason) |