Anas Adnan Ali v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | David O Carter |
Referred: | Karen E Scott |
Case #: | 8:23-cv-00463 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2023 |
Terminated: | Apr 04, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2023 2:55 AM PDT |
Defendant
Ur Mendoza Jaddou
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kristine R. Crandall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anas Adnan Ali
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 04, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Tue 04/04 11:05 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Anas Adnan Ali. Dismissal is with. (Sullivan, Christina) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
service
Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA
Tue 03/28 6:22 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Anas Adnan Ali, upon Defendant Kristine R. Crandall served on 3/21/2023, answer due 5/22/2023; Ur Mendoza Jaddou served on 3/23/2023, answer due 5/22/2023; United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 3/23/2023, answer due 5/22/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to E Garcia. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Eddie L. Anderson. The officer agency or corporation was NOT served. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached.(Sullivan, Christina) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit USPS RECEIPTS | ||
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 03/21 10:58 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kdu) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 4:36 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Kristine R. Crandall, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Wed 03/15 4:26 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 4:26 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (ghap) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 03/14 1:26 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Anas Adnan Ali, (Sullivan, Christina) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Tue 03/14 1:21 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Anas Adnan Ali. (Sullivan, Christina) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 03/14 1:19 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Anas Adnan Ali. (Sullivan, Christina) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 1:17 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34953069 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Anas Adnan Ali. (Attorney Christina Sullivan added to party Anas Adnan Ali(pty:pla))(Sullivan, Christina) |