Hoang Minh Le v. Gibraltar Capital Fund, LLC
California Central District Court | |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01894 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 15, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2023 3:51 AM PDT |
Defendant
Gibraltar Capital Fund, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Hoang Minh Le
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
transfer
Intradistrict Transfer - Clerical Error (G-73) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 2:10 PM
NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Eastern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Sheri Pym. New Case Number 5:23-cv-452 SSS (SPx). (ghap) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 03/14 2:10 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Hoang Minh Le, identifying Certificate. (Tsao, Pamela) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Tue 03/14 2:10 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Hoang Minh Le. (Tsao, Pamela) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 03/14 2:09 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Hoang Minh Le. (Tsao, Pamela) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 2:07 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34953814 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Hoang Minh Le. (Attorney Pamela Tsao added to party Hoang Minh Le(pty:pla))(Tsao, Pamela) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Photos |