Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company v. Adriana Adams et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Richard F Boulware, II |
Referred: | Daniel J Albregts |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00401 |
Nature of Suit | 380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Property Damage |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2023 |
Terminated: | Apr 18, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Justice Court, Las Vegas Township, 23C001371 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2023 2:34 AM PDT |
Defendant
United States Postal Service (USPS)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Adriana Adams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
As Subrogee of Yolanda C. Arjona-Robles Anderton & Associates 2360 Corporate Circle, Suite 320
Henderson, NV 89074 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, April 18, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation Order Dismissing Case
Tue 04/18 2:25 PM
ORDER Granting9 Stipulation for Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/18/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Status Report
Fri 04/14 3:34 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Adriana Adams, United States Postal Service (USPS).. (Tomova, Virginia) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Stipulation
Wed 04/05 4:21 PM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL with Prejudice by Defendants Adriana Adams, United States Postal Service (USPS). (Tomova, Virginia) (dismissal) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Statement in Removal Case
Thu 03/30 8:41 AM
STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Adriana Adams, United States Postal Service (USPS).. (Tomova, Virginia) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Tue 03/28 3:54 PM
ORDER Granting6 Stipulation for Extension of Time re2 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 4/18/2023. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/28/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Stipulation
Mon 03/27 12:35 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for Plaintiffs to File an Opposition to the Defendants Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction re2 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Adriana Adams, United States Postal Service (USPS). (Tomova, Virginia) (extend) (sumjgm) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/16 11:24 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for4 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendants Adriana Adams, United States Postal Service (USPS).. (Tomova, Virginia) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
minord
Minute Order Removal Case
Wed 03/15 9:58 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/15/2023. Statement regarding removed action is due by 3/30/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 4/14/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) |
|
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Wed 03/15 9:57 AM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (JQC) |
||
order
Standing Order
Wed 03/15 9:58 AM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink:[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) |
||
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Motion Dismiss
Tue 03/14 4:27 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants ADRIANA ADAMS, United States Postal Service (USPS). Responses due by 3/28/2023.(Tomova, Virginia) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition Removal
Tue 03/14 3:06 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Justice Court, Las Vegas Township, Case Number 23C001371, by United States Postal Service (USPS), ADRIANA ADAMS. Proof of service due by 4/17/2023. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/24/2023. (Tomova, Virginia) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A |