Lyndell Johnson v. Cerebral, Inc.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Fernando M Olguin |
Referred: | Maria A Audero |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01901 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2023 |
Terminated: | Apr 17, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2023 2:04 AM PDT |
Defendant
Cerebral, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
DOES
|
|
Plaintiff
Lyndell Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, April 17, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Mon 04/17 12:00 PM
ORDER RE: CONSOLIDATION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details.* (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/04 3:55 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: CONSOLIDATION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details* (gga) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Wed 03/29 1:19 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
order
Transferring Case purs GO 21-01 (Related Case)(CV-34)
Mon 03/20 5:22 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:23-cv-01803 FMO(MAAx). Case transferred from Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue to Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-01901 FMO(MAAx). Signed by Judge Fernando M. Olguin (rn) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Related Case(s)
Mon 03/20 3:11 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Lyndell Johnson. Related Case(s): 2:23-cv-01803; 2:23-cv-01828; 2:23-cv-01919; 2:23-cv-02021; 2:23-cv-02043; 8:23-cv-00493(Wucetich, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 03/20 9:04 AM
Notice of Pending Motion to Consolidate Related Cases Before the Honorable Fernando M. Olguin filed by Plaintiff Lyndell Johnson.(Wucetich, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/16 10:50 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Cerebral, Inc. (jtil) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Wed 03/15 4:23 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 4:22 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 4:22 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (jtil) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 03/14 3:53 PM
CERTIFICATION and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lyndell Johnson, (Wucetich, Jason) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 03/14 3:51 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Lyndell Johnson. (Wucetich, Jason) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Tue 03/14 3:50 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Lyndell Johnson. (Wucetich, Jason) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 3:49 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34955307 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Lyndell Johnson. (Attorney Jason M Wucetich added to party Lyndell Johnson(pty:pla))(Wucetich, Jason) |