Weiqing Li v. Donna P. Campagnolo et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Jacqueline Chooljian |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01910 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2023 |
Terminated: | Aug 18, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2023 2:49 AM PDT |
Defendant
Donna P. Campagnolo
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Merrick B. Garland
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ur Mendoza Jaddou
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Weiqing Li
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, August 18, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Fri 08/18 2:42 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Weiqing Li. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Liu, Jenny) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order Extending Answer Due Deadline
Tue 07/11 3:35 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court hereby GRANTS the Stipulation to Extend Time13 and ORDERS Defendants' deadline to file a response to the Complaint is extended to 8/28/2023. (gk) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Thu 07/06 3:12 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to August 28, 2023 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendants Donna P. Campagnolo, Merrick B. Garland, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas.(Chun, Yujin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, May 26, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Fri 05/26 4:38 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT11 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The Court, having considered the parties' stipulation and finding good cause therefor, hereby GRANTS the stipulation to extend time and ORDERS as follows: Defendants' deadline to file a response to the Complaint is extended to July 14, 2023. (rolm) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Thu 05/25 8:34 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to July 14, 2023 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendants Donna P. Campagnolo, Merrick B. Garland, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas.(Chun, Yujin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, May 04, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Thu 05/04 10:24 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendants Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Donna P. Campagnolo, Merrick B. Garland.(Attorney Yujin Chun added to party Donna P. Campagnolo(pty:dft), Attorney Yujin Chun added to party Merrick B. Garland(pty:dft), Attorney Yujin Chun added to party Ur Mendoza Jaddou(pty:dft), Attorney Yujin Chun added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft))(Chun, Yujin) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
service
Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA
Mon 03/27 6:48 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Weiqing Li, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to C. Veloz.. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Ealy Sase. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to CSC. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached.(Liu, Jenny) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipts, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Campagnolo Return Receipt, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Civil Process Clerk Return Receipt, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Garland Return Receipt | ||
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 03/15 1:05 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (dbe) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 11:09 AM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants Donna P. Campagnolo, Merrick B. Garland, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas. (lh) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Wed 03/15 11:05 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 11:04 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (lh) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 03/14 6:45 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff WEIQING LI, (Liu, Jenny) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Tue 03/14 6:40 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 filed by plaintiff WEIQING LI. (Liu, Jenny) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 03/14 6:25 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff WEIQING LI. (Liu, Jenny) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 6:11 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34956617 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff WEIQING LI. (Attorney Jenny Huixian Liu added to party WEIQING LI(pty:pla))(Liu, Jenny) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit I-829 Receipt Notice, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit USCIS inquiry confirmation, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Case Status Online, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit USCIS historic processing time, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Current USCIS processing time |