United African-Asian Abilities Club et al v. Victory Investment Co., LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Mark C Scarsi |
Referred: | Patricia Donahue |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01915 |
Nature of Suit | 443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations |
Cause | 42:405 Fair Housing Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 29, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2023 3:10 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Victory Investment Co., LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
James Lee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
United African-Asian Abilities Club
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 29, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Wed 03/29 12:46 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs James Lee, United African-Asian Abilities Club. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Wakefield, David) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 03/15 3:34 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 3:34 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Victory Investment Co., LLC. (car) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Wed 03/15 3:30 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 3:30 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 3:29 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (car) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Tue 03/14 9:49 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs James Lee, United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members. (Wakefield, David) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 03/14 9:48 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying VICTORY INVESTMENT CO., LLC. (Wakefield, David) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 03/14 9:48 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs James Lee, United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members. (Wakefield, David) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 9:47 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34957080 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members, James Lee. (Attorney David C Wakefield added to party James Lee(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wakefield added to party United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members(pty:pla))(Wakefield, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Civil Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Civil Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C to Civil Complaint |