Marco Diaz v. City of Los Angeles et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Sherilyn Peace Garnett |
Referred: | Maria A Audero |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01916 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2023 3:24 AM PDT |
Defendant
City of Los Angeles
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
LAPD Officer Keleigh Edwards
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LAPD Officer Heriberto Crisantos Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Richard Copeland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marco Diaz
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
56 | 56
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/10 12:12 PM
ORDER GRANTING IN PART PARTIES' STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO CONTINUE EXPERT DISCLOSURES AND RELATED DATES49 by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
55 | 55
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Wed 04/03 12:39 PM
REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Complaint against Defendants 50 filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, Keleigh Edwards, Heriberto Crisantos Garcia. (Ford, Ty) |