Tiantian Guo v. Alejandro Mayorkas et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Wesley L Hsu |
Referred: | Sheri Pym |
Case #: | 5:23-cv-00429 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2023 |
Terminated: | Aug 15, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2023 2:04 AM PDT |
Defendant
Merrick Garland
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David Radel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tiantian Guo
A 218 124 784 13833 Champion Way
Eastvale, CA 92880 |
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, August 15, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
order
Dismiss Case
Wed 08/16 9:47 AM
ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS CASE9 by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. For the foregoing reasons, the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED with prejudice. See, e.g., Steckman, 143 F.3d at 1298 (explaining that leave to amend is unwarranted where an amendment would be futile). ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (lom) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 08/04 3:06 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CIVIL CASES by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. (hc) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 06/26 3:14 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING MOTION to Dismiss Case (DKT.9 ) by Judge Wesley L. Hsu: The court on its own motion, continues the HEARING from July 7, 2023 to August 18, 2023 at 1:00 p.m. The continuance of the hearing date does not affect the due date for opposition and reply papers, which remain due based on the schedule calculated from the original hearing date. The hearing will proceed in-person at the First Street Courthouse, Courtroom 9B. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (hc) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 05/25 7:58 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REGARDING TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE WESLEY L. HSU by Judge Wesley L. Hsu: Please take notice that this action has been reassigned to the Honorable Wesley L. Hsu, United States District Judge, pursuant to the Order Re Transfer Pursuant to General Order 23-036 filed on May 19, 2023. Judge Hsu hears civil motions on Friday at 1:30 p.m. Therefore, the Court hereby resets the hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss from June 26, 2023 to July 7, 2023 at 1:30 p.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (hc) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss Case
Mon 05/22 2:40 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declarations of John Lafferty and David Radel filed by Defendant Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, David Radel. Motion set for hearing on 6/26/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attorney Jennifer R. Jacobs added to party Merrick Garland(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer R. Jacobs added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer R. Jacobs added to party David Radel(pty:dft)) (Jacobs, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of John Lafferty, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of David Radel, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 4 Proof of Service | ||
Friday, May 19, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
cs_rasgn
Chief District Judge Transferring Case
Fri 05/19 4:22 PM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#23-036) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Wesley L. Hsu, this case is transferred from Judge Jesus G. Bernal to the calendar of Judge Wesley L. Hsu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:23-cv-00429-JGB(SPx). (ap) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Tue 03/14 9:09 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/14 9:08 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (lh) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 03/14 9:07 AM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Tiantian Guo, (lh) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/14 9:06 AM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to Defendant David Radel. (lh) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/14 9:04 AM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to Defendant Merrick Garland. (lh) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/14 9:03 AM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to Defendant Alejandro Mayorkas.(lh) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Tue 03/14 9:01 AM
COMPLAINT against Defendants Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, David Radel.Case assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (Filing Fee $402 PAID), filed by Plaintiff Tiantian Guo. (lh) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |