Shan Wang v. Alejandro Mayorkas et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Jesus G Bernal |
Referred: | Sheri Pym |
Case #: | 5:23-cv-00430 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jun 06, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2023 2:21 AM PDT |
Defendant
Merrick Garland
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David Radel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shan Wang
A 216 018 981 8269 Garden Park Street
Chino, CA 91708 |
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, June 06, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Tue 06/06 3:36 PM
ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Granting Joint Stipulation to Stay Case Pending Adjudication of Application8 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the instant action shall be stayed March 27, 2024. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (twdb) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
stip
Stay Case
Wed 05/31 10:58 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Adjudication of Application filed by Defendants Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, David Radel.(Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party Merrick Garland(pty:dft), Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft), Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party David Radel(pty:dft))(Medrano, Alarice) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Proof of Service | ||
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Tue 03/14 9:30 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/14 9:29 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (lh) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 03/14 9:28 AM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Shan Wang, (lh) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/14 9:27 AM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to Defendant David Radel. (lh) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/14 9:26 AM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to Defendant Merrick Garland. (lh) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/14 9:24 AM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to Defendant Alejandro Mayorkas.(lh) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Tue 03/14 9:22 AM
COMPLAINT against Defendants Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, David Radel.Case assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (Filing Fee $402 PAID), filed by Plaintiff Shan Wang. (lh) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |