GS Holistic, LLC v. Blazers Smoke Shop et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Sunshine Suzanne Sykes |
Referred: | Shashi H Kewalramani |
Case #: | 5:23-cv-00444 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1121 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jun 08, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2023 3:41 AM PDT |
Defendant
Blazers Smoke Shop
|
|
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Plaintiff
GS Holistic, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, July 07, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Fri 07/07 10:15 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Attorney for the Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Leon, Tomas) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 06/08 4:04 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Sunshine S. Sykes: In light of the Notice of Settlement filed June 7, 2023 [Dkt.13 ], indicating that the case has settled, this action is placed in inactive status. By July 10, 2023, the Plaintiff shall file either (1) a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i); or (2) a motion to reopen if settlement has not been consummated. Upon the failure to comply with this Order in a timely manner, this action shall be deemed dismissed as of July 11, 2023. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party. All previously set deadlines and dates are hereby VACATED. (JS-6) THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Settlement
Wed 06/07 4:25 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Attorney for the Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC. (Leon, Tomas) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Tue 05/30 9:13 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC, upon Defendant Blazers Smoke Shop served on 5/27/2023, answer due 6/20/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Vic Doe, an individual who refused to give their name who identified themselves as the person in charge. The individual accepted service with direct delivery. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Leon, Tomas) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/21 4:32 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant John Doe. (shb) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/21 4:31 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Blazers Smoke Shop. (shb) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Summons Request
Thu 04/20 3:19 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only8 filed by Attorney for the Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC.(Leon, Tomas) |
|
Att: 1 Remaining Summons | ||
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Mon 03/27 10:52 AM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Wed 03/15 3:52 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 3:51 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 3:51 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (ghap) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 03/14 6:54 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Attorney for the Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC, identifying Chris Folkerts, GS Holistic, LLC, Leon Law LLP, Tomas Carlos Leon, BLAZERS SMOKE SHOP d/b/a BLAZERS SMOKE SHOP, and JOHN DOE. (Leon, Tomas) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120)
Tue 03/14 6:51 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by GS Holistic, LLC. (Leon, Tomas) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 03/14 6:50 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC. (Leon, Tomas) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 6:49 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34956871 - Fee: $402, filed by Attorney for the Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC. (Attorney Tomas Carlos Leon added to party GS Holistic, LLC(pty:pla))(Leon, Tomas) |