Thomas v. DeJoy
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Miranda M Du |
Referred: | Elayna J Youchah |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00397 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race) |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2023 3:19 AM PDT |
Defendant
Louis DeJoy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Estell L. Thomas
P.O. Box 270247
Las Vegas, NV 89127 |
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, February 27, 2024 | ||
44 | 44
misc
Errata
Wed 02/28 11:54 AM
ERRATA to43 Reply by Plaintiff Estell L. Thomas. (RJDG) |
|
Monday, February 26, 2024 | ||
43 | 43
respm
Reply
Mon 02/26 5:16 PM
REPLY to42 Response to39 Renewed Motion for Judgment by Plaintiff Estell L. Thomas. (ALZ) |
|
Tuesday, February 20, 2024 | ||
42 | 42
respm
Response
Tue 02/20 1:30 PM
RESPONSE to39 Motion for Judgment by Defendant Louis DeJoy. Replies due by 2/27/2024. (Tomova, Virginia) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2024 | ||
40 | 40
motion
Motion Extend/Shorten Time
Wed 01/31 11:00 AM
MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to File a Response to Plaintiffs Renewed Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings re39 Motion for Judgment by Defendant Louis DeJoy. Responses due by 2/14/2024.(Tomova, Virginia) (sumjgm) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
minord
Minute Order Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time
Wed 01/31 4:02 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/31/2024. Good cause appearing, Defendant's motion to extend time (ECF No.40 ) to file a response to Plaintiff's motion for judgment (ECF No.39 ) is granted. Responses due by 2/20/2024. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV) |
||
Saturday, January 20, 2024 | ||
39 | 39
motion
Motion Judgment
Mon 01/22 2:53 PM
RENEWED MOTION for Judgment by Plaintiff Estell L. Thomas. Responses due by 2/3/2024. (ALZ) |
|
Wednesday, January 10, 2024 | ||
minord
Minute Order Order on Motion for Judgment
Wed 01/10 3:54 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/10/2024. The Court denies Plaintiffs countermotion for judgment on the pleadings. (ECF No.23 (Motion)). Plaintiff filed her Motion in response to Defendant's request for extension of time, and before Defendant has responded to the complaint, to argue that Defendant's anticipated affirmative defense of failure to exhaust administrative remedies lacks merit. ( Id. at 6.) Defendant correctly points out in response (ECF No.22 at 2) that a motion for judgment on the pleadings under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(c) may be available after the pleadings are closed but Plaintiff filed her Motion before Defendant responded to the complaint. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GIVM) |
||
Tuesday, October 03, 2023 | ||
37 | 37
respm
Reply
Tue 10/03 6:05 PM
REPLY to26 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Louis DeJoy. (Tomova, Virginia) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2023 | ||
minord
Minute Order Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time
Mon 09/25 4:39 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/25/2023. ORDER granting34 Motion to Extend Time to reply to ECF No.26 Motion to Dismiss Replies due by 10/3/2023. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV) |
||
Saturday, September 23, 2023 | ||
36 | 36
respm
Response
Tue 09/26 10:32 AM
RESPONSE to34 Motion to Extend Time re26 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Estell L. Thomas.(ALZ) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment | ||
Friday, September 22, 2023 | ||
34 | 34
motion
Motion Extend/Shorten Time
Fri 09/22 4:51 PM
MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to File a Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint re26 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Louis DeJoy. Responses due by 10/6/2023.(Tomova, Virginia) (sumjgm) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Thursday, September 21, 2023 | ||
33 | 33
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay Case
Fri 09/22 11:31 AM
ORDER Granting27 Motion to Stay Discovery. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must file a status report no later than fourteen (14) days after the Court issues its decision on the pending Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 9/21/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
respm
Response
Thu 09/21 11:04 AM
RESPONSE to27 Motion to Stay Case or Discovery by Plaintiff Estell L. Thomas. Replies due by 9/27/2023. (ALZ) |
|
Tuesday, September 19, 2023 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Errata
Thu 09/21 10:46 AM
ERRATA30 Response to26 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Estell L. Thomas. (ALZ) |
|
Sunday, September 17, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
respm
Response
Tue 09/19 11:19 AM
RESPONSE to26 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Estell L. Thomas. Replies due by 9/24/2023.(ALZ) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment | ||
Friday, September 08, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
order
Minute Order Klingele
Fri 09/08 8:33 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/8/2023. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to26 Motion to Dismiss. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
order
Minute Order Klingele
Thu 09/07 7:44 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/7/2023. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to ECF No.26 Motion to Dismiss. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Motion Stay Case or Discovery
Wed 09/06 4:30 PM
MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendant Louis DeJoy. Responses due by 9/20/2023. (Tomova, Virginia) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Motion Dismiss
Wed 09/06 4:12 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Louis DeJoy. Responses due by 9/20/2023.(Tomova, Virginia) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A Complainant's Statement | ||
Wednesday, August 23, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time
Thu 08/24 10:04 AM
ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Federal Defendant's Motion to Extend Time to File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No.19 ) is DENIED . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant must file a pleading responsive to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than September 6, 2023 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 8/23/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Reply
Wed 08/23 11:31 AM
REPLY to Response to23 COUNTERMOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Plaintiff Estell L. Thomas. (ALZ) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Response
Mon 08/21 4:26 PM
RESPONSE to20 Response by Defendant Louis DeJoy. (Tomova, Virginia) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Consent for Electronic Service of Documents
Wed 08/16 8:56 AM
Consent for Electronic Service of Documents by Plaintiff Estell L. Thomas. (ALZ) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Response
Tue 08/08 4:06 PM
RESPONSE to19 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time, by Plaintiff Estell L. Thomas. Replies due by 8/14/2023.(ALZ) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Wednesday, August 02, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Motion Extend/Shorten Time
Wed 08/02 4:05 PM
MOTION to Extend Time (Third Request) to File a Response to Plaintiffs Complaint re 17 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time,,,,,,,, Minute Order,,,,,,, by Defendant Louis DeJoy. Responses due by 8/16/2023. (Tomova, Virginia) (answer) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/31 8:35 AM
ERRATA to1 COMPLAINT against Louis DeJoy by Estell L. Thomas. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 8/7/2023. Proof of service due by 10/26/2023. (ALZ) Modified document type and created link on 7/31/2023 - NEF regenerated (CJS) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2023 | ||
minord
Minute Order Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time
Fri 07/21 2:13 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 7/21/2023. By Judicial Assistant: E. Santiago. Pending before the Court is Federal Defendant's Motion to Extend Time to File a Response to Plaintiffs Complaint. ECF No. 16 . Defendant explains that Plaintiff's administrative claim remains pending before the Equal Employment Opportunity Office of Federal Operation and a response before that claim is adjudicated deprives Defendant of potential resolution of Plaintiff's claims on the administrative level. Plaintiff did not definitively object to the requested extension, but said it was unlikely Plaintiff would agree. The Court finds the efforts to resolve this simple and ordinary request was not fully considered before motion practice was commenced. The parties must meet and confer either through a telephone call or videoconference to discuss a potential compromise of Defendant's request, which is not unsound, but may present an initial extension greater than Plaintiff is ready to presently consider. Accordingly, and for this reason only, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Federal Defendant's Motion to Extend Time to File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. 16 ) is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must meet and confer no later than August 2, 2023 to discuss whether a compromise or resolution of Defendants request can reasonably be reached. If no resolution is reached, Defendant may refile its Motion no later than August 9, 2023 . Plaintiff's response will be due August 23, 2023 and must explain why an additional extension of time, given the outcome of her administrative claim remains pending, is prejudicial. No reply is to be filed without leave of court to do so. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES) |
||
Tuesday, July 18, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Motion Extend/Shorten Time
Tue 07/18 3:01 PM
MOTION to Extend Time (Second Request) to File a Response to Plaintiffs Complaint re1 Complaint by Defendant Louis DeJoy. Responses due by 8/1/2023.(Tomova, Virginia) (answer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, June 20, 2023 | ||
minutes
Motion Hearing Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 06/20 3:44 PM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held via video conference on 6/20/2023 before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Crtrm Administrator: T. Renfro ; Pla Counsel: Estell L. Thomas, Pro Se ; Def Counsel: Virginia Tomova ; Recording start and end times: 2:14 - 2:23 PM ; Courtroom: 3D ; The Court makes preliminary remarks and hears representations of parties. IT IS ORDERED that 11 Motion for Exception from Attendance Requirements is DENIED as MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 12 Motion to Reschedule ENE is GRATNED in PART. The ENE scheduled for June 30, 2023 at 10:00 am is VACATED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR) |
||
Thursday, June 15, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 06/16 1:01 PM
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the motion to reschedule Early Neutral Evaluation (ECF No.12 ) is added to the video conference hearing scheduled for 2:00 PM, June 20, 2023. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel/the parties must email the Courtroom Administrator, Tawnee Renfro at Tawnee_Renfro@nvd.uscourts.gov, with an email address to be used for the video conference hearing by noon, June 16, 2023 . The Clerk of Court is directed to call Estell L. Thomas (702-415-4919) to alert him of this order and to ask him for an email address so this order can be emailed to him. (Emailed to rnvgreen@aol.com on 6/16/2023). Please see order for additional specifics. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/15/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Session
Thu 06/15 8:53 AM
ORDER setting motions hearing re11 MOTION for Exception from Attendance Requirements for Early Neutral Evaluation. Motion hearing is set for 06/20/2023 at 2PM via Video Conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel/the parties must email the Courtroom Administrator, Tawnee Renfro at Tawnee_Renfro@nvd.uscourts.gov, with an email address to be used for the video conference hearing by noon, June 16, 2023. IT IS ORDERED that the following Video Conference Instructions be adhered to as follows: INSTRUCTIONS FOR VIDEO CONFERENCE HEARING Instructions to the scheduled hearings will be sent via email thirty (30) minutes prior to the hearing to the participants email provided to the Court. The Clerk of Court is directed to call Estell L. Thomas to alert him of this order and to ask him for an email address so this order can be emailed to him. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/14/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Plaintiff contacted. Order e-mailed to Plaintiff. ALZ) Modified to correct event on 6/15/2023 and NEF Regenerated. (ALZ) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Motion Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 06/14 5:05 PM
MOTION to Reschedule Early Neutral Evaluation re10 Order Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Session,, by Defendant Louis DeJoy. Responses due by 6/28/2023. (Tomova, Virginia) (misc) (settlement) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Motion Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 06/14 2:04 PM
MOTION for Exception from Attendance Requirements for Early Neutral Evaluation re10 Order Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Session,, by Defendant Louis DeJoy. Responses due by 6/28/2023. (Tomova, Virginia) (misc) (settlement) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
3
pgs
order
Order Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Session
Wed 05/24 3:18 PM
ORDER Scheduling Early Neutral Evaluation Session : Early Neutral Evaluation set for 6/30/2023 at 10:00 AM in before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach by video conference. Written evaluation statements to be emailed to chambers not later than 4:00 p.m., June 23, 2023 . DO NOT FILE. DO NOT MAIL THEM TO THE CLERK'S OFFICE. DO NOT SERVE A COPY ON OPPOSING COUNSEL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/24/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Mon 05/22 8:08 AM
ORDER granting ECF No.8 Stipulation : Answer/response to Complaint due 7/21/2023 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 5/19/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Stipulation
Fri 05/19 2:12 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) by Defendant Louis DeJoy. (Tomova, Virginia) (extend) (answer) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Tue 03/21 4:18 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Estell L. Thomas that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (CJS) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Tue 03/21 4:13 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Estell L. Thomas re ECF Nos.3 Summons Issued as to USA,1 Complaint. Louis DeJoy served on 3/21/2023. (CJS) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas
Tue 03/14 8:45 AM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (CJS) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Tue 03/14 8:43 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Louis DeJoy, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General re1 Complaint. (CJS) |
|
notice
ENE Notice
Tue 03/14 12:05 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (TRW) |
||
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Receipt Payment
Tue 03/14 8:40 AM
RECEIPT of Payment: $ 402.00, receipt number 2-3108 (Civil Filing Fee) (CJS) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/14 8:39 AM
COMPLAINT against Louis DeJoy (Filing fee $402 - R 2-3108 by Estell L. Thomas. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/23/2023. Proof of service due by 6/11/2023. (CJS) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |