Pacific Premier Bancorp, Inc. v. Continental Insurance Company
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Cormac J Carney |
Referred: | Douglas F Mccormick |
Case #: | 8:23-cv-00470 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2023 |
Terminated: | Feb 27, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 6:57 AM PDT |
Defendant
Continental Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pacific Premier Bancorp, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, February 27, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
order
Dismissing Case
Wed 02/28 10:09 AM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION AND REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE30 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (a) the action is hereby dismissed WITH PREJUDICE as to all claims. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (rolm) |
|
30 | 30
stip
Dismiss Case
Tue 02/27 1:36 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a) filed by Plaintiff Pacific Premier Bancorp, Inc..(Schulz, Harry) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Dismissal | ||
Wednesday, December 20, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Wed 12/20 1:58 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert C Christensen counsel for Defendant Continental Insurance Company. Robert C. Christensen is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Continental Insurance Company. (Christensen, Robert) |
|
Thursday, November 30, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - form only -no proceeding held
Fri 12/01 10:44 AM
ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT PROCEDURES, PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL by Judge Cormac J. Carney. (rrp) |
|
27 | 27
order
Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
Fri 12/01 10:43 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Discovery cut-off 11/7/2024. LAST DATE TO HEAR MOTIONS is 1/6/2025. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 11/21/2024. Pretrial Conference set for 3/10/2025 at 3:00 p.m. Jury Trial set for 3/18/2025 at 8:30 a.m. (rrp) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Mon 11/20 2:16 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 8 days, filed by Plaintiff Pacific Premier Bancorp, Inc... (Schulz, Harry) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Thu 11/16 9:27 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Accordingly, the Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS Plaintiff to show cause in writing no later than November 21, 2023 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution for failure to file a joint Rule 26(f) report. [SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION.] (es) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
order
Stipulation and Order
Mon 09/18 5:18 PM
CLAWBACK ORDER PURSUANT TO F.R.E. 502 by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick: granting Stipulation for Order21 . See order for details. (lom) |
|
23 | 23
order
Protective Order
Mon 09/18 5:13 PM
ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick: granting Stipulation for Protective Order20 . The Court hereby approves the Joint Stipulation For Protective Order. (lom) |
|
Sunday, September 17, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Sun 09/17 1:27 PM
NOTICE OF INTENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on November 16, 2023. (rrp) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
4
pgs
stip
Order
Fri 09/15 1:49 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Order Clawback pursuant to FRE 502 filed by Plaintiff Pacific Premier Bancorp, Inc..(Schulz, Harry) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
20 | 20
stip
Protective Order
Fri 09/15 1:41 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Pacific Premier Bancorp, Inc..(Schulz, Harry) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, September 14, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 09/14 9:19 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Continental Insurance Company, identifying Continental Casualty Company, The Continental Corporation, CNA Financial Corporation, Loews Corporation. (Ventrell, Karen) |
|
18 | 18
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 09/14 9:10 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Continental Insurance Company.(Ventrell, Karen) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Fri 08/04 2:58 PM
ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY MORE THAN 30 DAYS15 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Continental's initial response to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to and including September 15, 2023, which is more than thirty (30) days from the initial deadline. (lom) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 08/04 12:56 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Continental Insurance Company, identifying Continental Casualty Company; The Continental Corporation; CNA Financial Corporation; Loews Corporation. (Ventrell, Karen) |
|
15 | 15
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Fri 08/04 11:30 AM
Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to September 15, 2023 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by defendant Continental Insurance Company.(Attorney Karen Ventrell added to party Continental Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Ventrell, Karen) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, July 06, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Thu 07/06 2:08 PM
Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Parties, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)4 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form8 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form7 , Corporate Disclosure Statement3 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)9 , Notice of Related Case(s)2 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form6 filed by Plaintiff Pacific Premier Bancorp, Inc..(Schulz, Harry) |
|
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Thu 07/06 12:01 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Cormac J. Carney. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 7/10/2023. (twdb) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 06/26 3:44 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Pacific Premier Bancorp, Inc., upon Defendant Continental Insurance Company served on 6/14/2023, answer due 7/5/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daryl Schabinger, Authorized Agent to Accept Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Schulz, Harry) |
|
Saturday, June 24, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Response
Sat 06/24 12:26 PM
[DECLARATION OF HARRY J. SCHULZ, III, filed as] RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Pacific Premier Bancorp, Inc.to Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines,10 (Schulz, Harry) Modified on 6/26/2023 (twdb) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 06/21 1:30 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Here, 90 days have passed since Plaintiff filed the Complaint, yet no proof of service has been filed. Accordingly, the Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS Plaintiff to show cause in writing no later than June 23, 2023 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. See minute order for details. (lom) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/16 1:15 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Continental Insurance Company. (lh) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Thu 03/16 12:53 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 12:53 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 12:52 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (lh) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Summons Request
Wed 03/15 8:13 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)4 , Corporate Disclosure Statement3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Notice of Related Case(s)2 filed by Plaintiff Pacific Premier Bancorp, Inc.. (Schulz, Harry) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/15 8:12 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Pacific Premier Bancorp, Inc.. (Schulz, Harry) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 03/15 8:11 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Pacific Premier Bancorp, Inc. identifying none as Corporate Parent. (Schulz, Harry) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Related Case(s)
Wed 03/15 8:09 AM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Pacific Premier Bancorp, Inc.. (Schulz, Harry) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 8:05 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34957444 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Pacific Premier Bancorp, Inc.. (Attorney Harry J Schulz, III added to party Pacific Premier Bancorp, Inc.(pty:pla))(Schulz, Harry) |