Jaquelin Estrada v. Kilolo Kijakazi
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Michael R Wilner |
Referred: | Michael R Wilner |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01917 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2023 |
Terminated: | Aug 10, 2023 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, August 17, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
order
Awarding EAJA Fees
Thu 08/17 1:44 PM
ORDER AWARDING EAJA FEES by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Re: Stipulation for Award of EAJA Fees18 . (see document for details) (hr) |
|
18 | 18
stip
Award of EAJA Fees
Thu 08/17 11:03 AM
STIPULATION FOR AWARD of EAJA Fees in the amount of $7,350.00. filed by Plaintiff Jaquelin Estrada.(Benavides, Francesco) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 10, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
judgmentCV
Judgment
Fri 08/11 9:39 AM
JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner, Related to: Stipulation to Remand Case to US Agency15 , Order to Remand Case to US Agency16 . THE COURT ADJUDGES AND DECREES that judgment is entered for Plaintiff. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (hr) |
|
16 | 16
order
Remand Case to US Agency
Fri 08/11 9:15 AM
ORDER OF REMAND by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. THE COURT ORDERS that this case be remanded to the Social Security Administration for further proceedings, consistent with the parties' joint stipulation, and that judgment be entered for Plaintiff. (hr) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
stip
Remand Case to US Agency
Wed 07/12 3:48 PM
STIPULATION to Remand Case to US Agency pursuant to Sentence Four of 42 USC 405g filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi.(Sachelari, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order proposed order, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order proposed judgment | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Wed 07/12 11:47 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael K Marriott counsel for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. Michael Marriott is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Marriott, Michael) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Wed 07/12 11:23 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Paul H. Sachelari counsel for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. Adding Paul Sachelari as counsel of record for Commissioner of Social Security for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Attorney Paul H. Sachelari added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Sachelari, Paul) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Brief (non-motion non-appeal)
Wed 06/14 10:24 AM
BRIEF filed by Plaintiff Jaquelin Estrada. Plaintiff's Opening Brief (Benavides, Francesco) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 05/15 9:42 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 AS LIMITED TO THE ELECTRONIC FILING AND SERVICE OF THE CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD, PURSUANT TO SUPPLEMENTAL FEDERAL RULES FOR SOCIAL SECURITY REVIEW ACTIONS UNDER 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), RULE 4(b) (cu) filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi.(Marriott, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Certification Page, | ||
Att: 2 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 3 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, | ||
Att: 4 Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 5 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 6 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 7 Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 1, | ||
Att: 9 Medical Records Part 2, | ||
Att: 10 Medical Records Part 3, | ||
Att: 11 Medical Records Part 4, | ||
Att: 12 Medical Records Part 5, | ||
Att: 13 Medical Records Part 6, | ||
Att: 14 Medical Records Part 7, | ||
Att: 15 Medical Records Part 8, | ||
Att: 16 Medical Records Part 9, | ||
Att: 17 Medical Records Part 10, | ||
Att: 18 Medical Records Part 11, | ||
Att: 19 Medical Records Part 12, | ||
Att: 20 Medical Records Part 13, | ||
Att: 21 Medical Records Part 14, | ||
Att: 22 Medical Records Part 15, | ||
Att: 23 Medical Records Part 16, | ||
Att: 24 Medical Records Part 17, | ||
Att: 25 Medical Records Part 18 | ||
Friday, April 07, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice from Clerk re Final Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge
Fri 04/07 8:57 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV23-1917 MRW on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only)
Thu 04/06 7:52 AM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attorney Michael K Marriott added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Marriott, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
order
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Wed 03/29 3:41 PM
ORDER GRANTING ON REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (NON-PRISONER CASE)4 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (lc) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA)
Wed 03/15 5:47 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Jaquelin Estrada. (Benavides, Francesco) |
|
6 | 6
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Wed 03/15 4:23 PM
Text Only Entry - IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner: The parties are directed to comply with the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions (effective Dec. 1, 2022). See Judge Wilner's posted procedures at the Court's website for more information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jm) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 9:22 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (lh) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Wed 03/15 7:32 AM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Jaquelin Estrada. (Benavides, Francesco) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/15 7:32 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jaquelin Estrada, (Benavides, Francesco) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/15 7:31 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jaquelin Estrada. (Benavides, Francesco) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 7:31 AM
COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Jaquelin Estrada. (Attorney Francesco P Benavides added to party Jaquelin Estrada(pty:pla))(Benavides, Francesco) |