Glaspie v. Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Alicia G Rosenberg |
Referred: | Alicia G Rosenberg |
Case #: | 5:23-cv-00445 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2023 |
Terminated: | Aug 14, 2023 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, August 25, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
order
Awarding EAJA Fees
Fri 08/25 2:31 PM
ORDER AWARDING EAJA FEES by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Re: Stipulation for Award of EAJA Fees22 . (see document for details) (hr) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
stip
Award of EAJA Fees
Thu 08/24 3:56 PM
STIPULATION FOR AWARD of EAJA Fees in the amount of $7,400.00. filed by Plaintiff Alondra Marie Glaspie.(Benavides, Francesco) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, August 14, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
judgmentCV
Judgment
Mon 08/14 5:07 PM
JUDGMENT OF REMAND by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg, Related to: Order of Remand20 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the above- captioned action is remanded to the Commissioner of Social Security for further proceedings consistent with the Stipulation of Remand. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (et) |
|
20 | 20
order
Remand Case to US Agency
Mon 08/14 5:03 PM
ORDER OF REMAND by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. IT IS ORDERED that the above-captioned action is remanded to the Commissioner of Social Security for further proceedings consistent with the terms of the Stipulation of Remand19 . (et) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
stip
Remand Case to US Agency
Fri 08/11 4:02 PM
STIPULATION to Remand Case to US Agency Social Security Administration filed by defendant Kilolo Kijakazi.(Sachelari, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, July 13, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 07/13 4:09 PM
ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File17 . Defendant shall have until August 14, 2023, to file her Brief. (hr) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Wed 07/12 1:54 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Brief filed by defendant Kilolo Kijakazi.(Sachelari, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, July 05, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Wed 07/05 12:07 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael K Marriott counsel for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. Michael Marriott is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Marriott, Michael) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Wed 07/05 12:02 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Paul H. Sachelari counsel for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. Adding Paul Sachelari as counsel of record for Commissioner of Social Security for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Attorney Paul H. Sachelari added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Sachelari, Paul) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Brief (non-motion non-appeal)
Wed 06/14 10:31 AM
BRIEF filed by Plaintiff Alondra Marie Glaspie. Plaintiff's Opening Brief (Benavides, Francesco) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 05/15 2:01 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 AS LIMITED TO THE ELECTRONIC FILING AND SERVICE OF THE CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD, PURSUANT TO SUPPLEMENTAL FEDERAL RULES FOR SOCIAL SECURITY REVIEW ACTIONS UNDER 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), RULE 4(b) (cu) filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi.(Marriott, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Certified Administrative Record Part 1, | ||
Att: 2 Certified Administrative Record Part 2, | ||
Att: 3 Certified Administrative Record Part 3, | ||
Att: 4 Certified Administrative Record Part 4, | ||
Att: 5 Certified Administrative Record Part 5 | ||
Friday, May 12, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 05/12 1:04 PM
ORDER TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg, re Stipulation to Extend Time11 . Defendant shall have a first extension of 45 days to serve the Certified Administrative Record, until June 29, 2023. (hr) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Thu 05/11 11:24 AM
First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to June 29, 2023 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi.(Marriott, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, April 07, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice from Clerk re Final Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge
Fri 04/07 9:01 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV23-445 AGR on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only)
Thu 04/06 8:17 AM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attorney Michael K Marriott added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Marriott, Michael) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
3
pgs
order
Order
Mon 03/27 2:01 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER [Social Security] by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. THE COURT'S CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER HAS BEEN REVISED EFFECTIVE DECEMBER 1, 2022. PLEASE REVIEW THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. In accordance with General Order 05-01, this case is designated for electronic filing. A chambers copy is not required unless ordered by the court. In order to facilitate the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of this case, the parties shall comply with the following instructions: (see document for further details). (hr) |
|
Sunday, March 26, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA)
Sun 03/26 11:57 AM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Alondra Marie Glaspie. (Benavides, Francesco) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
order
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Fri 03/24 2:25 PM
ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS4 by Judge John F. Walter. The Request is GRANTED. (iv) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 4:08 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (car) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Wed 03/15 7:47 AM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Alondra Marie Glaspie. (Benavides, Francesco) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/15 7:47 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Alondra Marie Glaspie, (Benavides, Francesco) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/15 7:46 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Alondra Marie Glaspie. (Benavides, Francesco) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 7:46 AM
COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Alondra Marie Glaspie. (Attorney Francesco P Benavides added to party Alondra Marie Glaspie(pty:pla))(Benavides, Francesco) |