Bayliss et al v. Clark County School District et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Cristina D Silva |
Referred: | Elayna J Youchah |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00403 |
Nature of Suit | 448 Civil Rights - Education |
Cause | 42:1981 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 2:32 AM PDT |
Defendant
Brian Brill
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gerald Bustamonte
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Clark County School District
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Clark County School District Police Department
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Daniel Ebihara
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jesus Jara
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Deana Jaskolski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Bayliss
520 S. College Dr #614
Henderson, NV 89015 |
Docket last updated: 74 minutes ago |
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
minord
Minute Order
Thu 03/28 8:35 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 3/28/2024. By Law Clerk: C. Denbow The Court notes that the parties have not filed a proposed discovery plan and scheduling order in accordance with United States District Court for the District of Nevada Local Rule 26-1. The Court's review of the docket shows a Motion to Dismiss is pending. This Motion does not effect an automatic stay of discovery. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties must file joint proposed discovery plan and scheduling order or stipulation to stay discovery within 14 days of the date of this Order. If a joint discovery plan and scheduling order cannot be agreed upon, each party may file either a proposed discovery plan and scheduling order or a motion to stay discovery within the same 14-day period. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CMD) |
||
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
minord
Pro Se Correspondence Minute Order
Fri 03/22 10:16 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 3/19/2024. By Deputy Clerk: A. Miller. EVIDENCE SUBMITTED - The court cannot serve as a repository for the parties' evidence. The parties may not file evidence unless the court orders otherwise. Your documents are returned herewith. MOTIONS - A document requesting a court order must be styled as a motion, not a letter. See Local Rule IA 10-2. Letters to a judge will be disregarded. See Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 7. OTHER - Every document you submit to the Court must include your name, address, and telephone number in the upper left-hand corner of the first page. The caption on the first page must include the title of the Court, the title of the action, the case number assigned to this action (including all initials and letters that follow the number), and the title of your document. If you are pursuing more than one action in this Court, you must submit a separate original document with the appropriate case number for each action in which you want the document filed. (Local Rule IA 10-2). (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi) |
|
Wednesday, February 28, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
respm
Reply
Wed 02/28 4:01 PM
REPLY to Response to26 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Brian Brill, Gerald Bustamonte, Clark County School District, Clark County School District Police Department, Daniel Ebihara, Jesus Jara, Deana Jaskolski. (Zastrow, Lisa) |
|
Wednesday, February 21, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
respm
Response
Wed 02/21 10:12 PM
RESPONSE to26 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff James Bayliss. Replies due by 2/28/2024. (Vasquez, Heron) |
|
Wednesday, February 07, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Motion Dismiss
Wed 02/07 4:18 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Brian Brill, Gerald Bustamonte, Clark County School District, Clark County School District Police Department, Daniel Ebihara, Jesus Jara, Deana Jaskolski. Responses due by 2/21/2024. (Zastrow, Lisa) |
|
Friday, February 02, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Fri 02/02 9:47 AM
ORDER granting24 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 2/1/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT) |
|
Thursday, February 01, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Stipulation
Thu 02/01 1:57 PM
First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT re5 Complaint by Defendant Clark County School District. (Zastrow, Lisa) (extend) (answer) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Fri 01/19 4:12 PM
ORDER denying16 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 1/19/2024.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT) |
|
Friday, October 06, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Reply
Fri 10/06 10:02 AM
REPLY to Response to16 Motion to Dismiss,, by Defendants Brian Brill, Gerald Bustamonte, Clark County School District, Clark County School District Police Department, Daniel Ebihara, Jesus Jara, Deana Jaskolski. (Zastrow, Lisa) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
3
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Tue 09/26 3:07 PM
ORDER Granting, nunc pro tunc ,19 Stipulation to Extend Time for Plaintiffs to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 10/6/2023. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 9/26/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JLB) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Response
Fri 09/22 4:14 PM
RESPONSE to16 Motion to Dismiss,, by Plaintiff James Bayliss. Replies due by 9/29/2023. (Vasquez, Heron) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Stipulation
Fri 09/22 4:09 PM
First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) by Plaintiff James Bayliss. (Vasquez, Heron) (extend) (sumjgm) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice Appearance of Counsel
Thu 09/21 9:14 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Heron Vasquez, III on behalf of Plaintiff James Bayliss. (Vasquez, Heron) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Thu 09/07 2:31 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Brian Brill, Gerald Bustamonte, Clark County School District, Clark County School District Police Department, Daniel Ebihara, Jesus Jara, Deana Jaskolski. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Zastrow, Lisa) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Motion Dismiss
Thu 08/31 10:54 AM
MOTION to Dismiss5 Complaint by Defendants Brian Brill, Gerald Bustamonte, Clark County School District, Clark County School District Police Department, Daniel Ebihara, Jesus Jara, Deana Jaskolski. Responses due by 9/14/2023. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 9/10/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/15/2023. (Zastrow, Lisa) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 08/15 10:20 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Bayliss re12 Summons Issued. Brian Brill served on 8/14/2023; Gerald Bustamonte served on 8/14/2023; Clark County School District served on 8/11/2023; Clark County School District Police Department served on 8/14/2023; Daniel Ebihara served on 8/11/2023; Jesus Jara served on 8/11/2023; Deana Jaskolski served on 8/14/2023. (RGDG) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2023 | ||
minord
Minute Order Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 08/04 12:20 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 8/4/2023. By Law Clerk: C. Ponder. Before the Court is Plaintiff's in forma pauperis ("IFP") application and Complaint. ECF Nos. 1 , 1-1. On August 3, 2023, Plaintiff paid the $402 filing fee to commence a civil action. ECF No. 13 . This mooted the need to screen the IFP application and Complaint. The Court also notes that summonses were issued to the seven Defendants on August 3, 2023. ECF No. 12 . Plaintiff is advised to review Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4, which establishes the rules and deadlines for service of parties in a civil lawsuit. Based on the foregoing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's in forma pauperis application (ECF No. 1 ) is DENIED as moot. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CMP) |
||
Thursday, August 03, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Receipt Payment
Fri 08/04 9:54 AM
RECEIPT of Payment: $ 402, receipt number 5120. (ABG) |
|
12 | 12
service
Summons Issued
Thu 08/03 9:28 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gerald Bustamonte, Clark County School District, Clark County School District Police Department, Daniel Ebihara, Jesus Jara, Deana Jaskolski, Brian Brill (ALZ) (ALZ) |
|
Att: 1 (8/3/2023) Summons | ||
Monday, July 10, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
minord
Minute Order
Tue 07/11 1:41 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 7/10/2023. By Deputy Clerk: A.Miller.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi) Modified on 7/11/2023 (attachments sealed: minor's name in full on documents - HAM) |
|
Att: 1 Email, | ||
Att: 2 Email, | ||
Att: 3 Email, | ||
Att: 4 Email, | ||
Att: 5 Email | ||
Friday, July 07, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
minord
Minute Order
Fri 07/07 11:23 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 7/7/2023. By Deputy Clerk: Aaron Blazevich-Gonzalez.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ABG) |
|
Att: 1 Email 1, | ||
Att: 2 Email 2 | ||
Tuesday, June 20, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 06/21 10:48 AM
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Affidavit in Support Requesting Extension of Time to Serve Defendants (ECF No.8 ) is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 6/20/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
Sunday, June 18, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Motion Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 06/20 1:46 PM
MOTION to Request Extension of Time to Serve Defendants by Plaintiff James Bayliss. Responses due by 7/2/2023. (AMMi) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
service
Proposed Summons to be issued
Thu 04/27 3:05 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff James Bayliss.(LOE) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons | ||
Tuesday, March 28, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Tue 03/28 10:36 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by James Bayliss. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (HAM) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
24
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/22 10:12 AM
COMPLAINT by James Bayliss. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/1/2023. Proof of service due by 6/20/2023. (HAM) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
misc
QC Notice
Fri 03/17 2:30 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE. Pro Se Filer's Action Required to Motion for IFP Status and Complaint. ERROR: Documents contain the name of a minor. Pursuant to LR IC 6-1(a)(2): Names of Minor Children - If the involvement of a minor child must be mentioned, only the initials of that child should be used. The court has temporarily restricted access to the document until a corrected image is filed. Please make all necessary redactions and re-file the documents as "Redacted Version of ______________". (no image attached) (DRS) |
||
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
4
pgs
notice
Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas
Wed 03/15 12:56 PM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (HAM) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Consent for Electronic Service of Documents
Wed 03/15 12:53 PM
Consent for Electronic Service of Documents by Plaintiff James Bayliss. (HAM) |
|
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Wed 03/15 9:25 AM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (KF) |